Noco Company v. Doe
Plaintiff: Noco Company
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv02123
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Marginal Order of Case Dismissal. Plaintiff NOCO Company's notice of voluntarily dismissal with prejudice is approved. (Related Document #7 ). Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 10/11/2019. (L,Ja)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Noco Company. (Malone, Sean)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 11/20/2019 at 02:15 PM at Chambers 16A. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 10/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties Planning Meeting)(L,Ja)
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Consent Package Issued by Courtroom Deputy (L,Ja)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 Attorney Appearance by Carrie A. Shufflebarger filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Shufflebarger, Carrie)
September 17, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to John Doe D/B/A Patriot Buick GMC, c/o Patriot Buick Patriot Buick Pontiac GMC, Inc. placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7018 3090 0000 3224 8373. (S,AN)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A)
September 16, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (Y,A)
September 16, 2019 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case, (Y,A)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Noco Company. (Pinney, Jon)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against John Doe. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9523088.. Filed by Noco Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reseller Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Internet Sales, #3 Exhibit C - Cease and Desist Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons) (Pinney, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noco Company v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noco Company
Represented By: Jon J. Pinney
Represented By: Sean P. Malone
Represented By: David R. Posteraro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Represented By: Carrie A. Shufflebarger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?