Peck v. Graphic Packaging International LLC
Plaintiff: Jason Peck
Defendant: Graphic Packaging International LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02197
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:2661
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 Certified copy of state court documents received from Cuyahoga County Commona Pleas. (S,SR)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 Marginal Entry Order granting Defendant's stipulated Motion for leave to plead (Related Doc #4 ). Defendant Graphic Packaging International, LLC is ordered to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 10/21/19. Judge John R. Adams on 10/1/19.(K,C)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 Answer to Complaint (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Graphic Packaging International LLC. (Orr, Jennifer - s/ by James P. Smith) Modified on 10/17/2019 (W,K).
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 Motion Stipulated and Unopposed Motion for Leave to Plead filed by Defendant Graphic Packaging International LLC. (Orr, Jennifer)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (Y,A)
September 23, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (Y,A)
September 23, 2019 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case, (Y,A)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Graphic Packaging International Partners, LLC, other affiliate International Paper Company, other affiliate GPI Holding III, LLC, other affiliate Graphic Packaging Holding Company for Graphic Packaging International LLC filed by Graphic Packaging International LLC. (Orr, Jennifer)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Common Pleas Court, case number CV-19-920112 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $400, receipt number 0647-9536789. Filed by Graphic Packaging International LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Jennifer B. Orr, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of E. Jewelle Johnson, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Orr, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peck v. Graphic Packaging International LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Peck
Represented By: Michael T. Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graphic Packaging International LLC
Represented By: James P. Smith
Represented By: Jennifer B. Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?