Nagy v. Forest City Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cassandra Nagy
Defendant: Technifab, Inc., Forest City Technologies, Inc. and John Cloud
Case Number: 1:2019cv02290
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Defendants Technifab, Inc. and John Cloud's Motion for leave to File an Answer Instanter (Related Doc #7 ). Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 11/19/2019.(L,Ja)
November 18, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Technifab, Inc.. (Secrest, Jonathan)
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Forest City Technologies, Inc.. (Secrest, Jonathan)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 12/18/2019 at 02:30 PM at Chambers 16A.. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 11/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting)(L,Ja)
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Consent Package Issued by Courtroom Deputy (L,Ja)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for leave to File an Answer Instanter filed by John Cloud, Forest City Technologies, Inc., Technifab, Inc. Related document(s) #6 . (Secrest, Jonathan)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by John Cloud, Forest City Technologies, Inc., and Technifab, Inc. (Secrest, Jonathan)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order to Show Cause Defendants, Technifab, Inc. and John Cloud each were served with a copy of the Complaint on October 9, 2019, by certified mail. A review of the docket demonstrates that no answer on behalf of either of the Defendants has been filed. Accordingly, the Plaintiff shall submit an appropriate motion or request for entry of default, an affidavit in support thereof, and a proposed order for default judgment by December 2, 2019, or show cause why said Defendants should not be dismissed for want of prosecution.(Related Document #3 ). Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 11/18/2019. (L,Ja)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #4 Defendant Forest City Technologies, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Forest City Technologies, Inc.'s answer due 11/20/2019. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 10/29/2019.(L,Ja)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 11/20/2019 to answer or otherwise move in response to Plaintiff's complaint filed by Defendant Forest City Technologies, Inc. (Secrest, Jonathan)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon John Cloud on 10/9/2019; Forest City Technologies, Inc. on 10/9/2019; Technifab, Inc. on 10/9/2019, filed on behalf of Cassandra Nagy Related document(s) #2 . (B,R)
October 4, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to John Cloud Receipt # 70183090000011001326, Forest City Technologies, Inc. Receipt # 70183090000011001333, Technifab, Inc. Receipt # 70183090000011001364 placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (B,R)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,SR)
October 1, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (S,SR)
October 1, 2019 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case, (S,SR)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 Class and Collective Action Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9552135. Filed by Cassandra Nagy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Forest City Technologies, Inc., #3 Summons to Technifab, Inc., #4 Summons to John Cloud, #5 Cassandra Nagy Consent Form) (McDermott, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nagy v. Forest City Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra Nagy
Represented By: Kevin M. McDermott, II
Represented By: Ryan A. Winters
Represented By: Joseph F. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Technifab, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan R. Secrest
Represented By: Sara Hutchins Jodka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest City Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan R. Secrest
Represented By: Sara Hutchins Jodka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Cloud
Represented By: Jonathan R. Secrest
Represented By: Sara Hutchins Jodka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?