United States of America v. $45,000.00 in U.S. Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $35,000.00 in U.S. Currency and $45,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Claimant: Noelia Dones
Case Number: 1:2019cv02292
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 Marshal's Return. $45,000 in USC and $35,000 in USC taken in USM custody on 10/11/2019 filed by United States of America. (S,SR)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Case Management Conference with case management conference to be held on 1/3/2020 at 2:00 PM in Chambers 15B. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 10/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties Planning Meeting, #2 Consent Package)(S,HR)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Noelia Dones on 10/4/2019, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of United States of America. Related document(s) #1 .
October 1, 2019 Service by Clerk. Notice and Complaint addressed to Noelia Dones placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70140150000158886330. (B,R)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 Warrant of Arrest in Rem for $45,000.00 in U.S. Currency and $35,000.00 in U.S. Currency issued to U.S. Marshal on 10/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (S,SR)
October 1, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (S,SR)
October 1, 2019 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case, (S,SR)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint in Forfeiture against All Defendants.. Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Praecipe, #3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem, #4 USP Process & Return, #5 Notice to Potential Claimant) (DeBaggis, Henry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $45,000.00 in U.S. Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Noelia Dones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $35,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $45,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Henry F. DeBaggis, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?