AT&T Mobility Services, LLC v. Boyd
Plaintiff: AT&T Mobility Services, LLC
Defendant: Robert Boyd
Case Number: 1:2019cv02539
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 IMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI)
December 6, 2019 Filing 14 Attorney Appearance by Caryn Groedel filed by on behalf of Robert Boyd. (Groedel, Caryn)
December 5, 2019 Filing 13 Reply in support of #3 Motion to Compel Arbitration and for Preliminary Injunction filed by AT&T Mobility Services, LLC. (Gage, Kenneth)
November 29, 2019 Filing 12 Answer to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Robert Boyd. (Groedel, Caryn)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #11 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for extension of Reply Brief until 12-6-19 in support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and for Preliminary Injunction. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 11/25/2019.(L,Ja)
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed Motion for extension of Time to File Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Arbitration and for Preliminary Injunction until 12-6-19 ,filed by Plaintiff AT&T Mobility Services, LLC. (Orr, Jennifer)
November 22, 2019 Filing 10 Opposition to #3 Motion to Compel Arbitration and for Preliminary Injunction of State Court Action filed by Robert Boyd. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Robert Boyd In Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Arbitration and for Preliminary Injunction)(Groedel, Caryn)
November 8, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service by regular mail and by email executed upon Robert Boyd on 11/7/2019, filed on behalf of AT&T Mobility Services, LLC Related document(s) #1 . (Orr, Jennifer)
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 Attorney Appearance by Jennifer B. Orr filed by on behalf of AT&T Mobility Services, LLC. (Orr, Jennifer)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Plaintiff AT&T Mobility Services, LLC's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Kenneth W. Gage for AT&T Mobility Services, LLC. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #7 ). Judge Pamela A. Barker on 11/8/2019.(L,Ja)
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for attorney Kenneth W. Gage to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9618242, filed by Plaintiff AT&T Mobility Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Kenneth W. Gage, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing)(Wentz, Amy)
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Robert Boyd. Summons sent out 10/30 were blank. (Y,A)
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Robert Boyd. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A)
October 30, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (Y,A)
October 30, 2019 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case, (Y,A)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Order filed by AT&T Mobility Services, LLC. Related document(s) #3 . (Wentz, Amy)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 Motion to Compel Arbitration and for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff AT&T Mobility Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Wentz, Amy)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate AT&T Teleholdings, Inc., Other Affiliate New Cingular Wireless Services, Inc., Other Affiliate AT&T Inc., Other Affiliate Leap Wireless International, Inc., Other Affiliate Cricket Holdco Inc., Other Affiliate LWI Holdco, Inc., Other Affiliate AT&T NCWS Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate SBC Telecom, Inc., Other Affiliate BellSouth Mobile Data, Inc. for AT&T Mobility Services, LLC filed by AT&T Mobility Services, LLC. (Wentz, Amy)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Robert Boyd. Filing fee paid $400, receipt number 0647-9601367. Filed by AT&T Mobility Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Deirdre L. Scott, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Brandy Giordano, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Gerald W. Cummings, #5 Exhibit E - Declaration of Jeremy Dunlap, #6 Exhibit F - Declaration of Jeff Nahlik, #7 Exhibit G - Declaration of Amy Ryder Wentz, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons) (Wentz, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AT&T Mobility Services, LLC v. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Boyd
Represented By: Alanna B. Klein Fischer
Represented By: Cynthia L. Sands
Represented By: Caryn M. Groedel
Represented By: Matthew S. Grimsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AT&T Mobility Services, LLC
Represented By: Amy Ryder Wentz
Represented By: Jennifer B. Orr
Represented By: Kenneth W. Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?