Warchak v. Allstate Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Allen Warchak
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv02540
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Patricia A Gaughan
Referring Judge: Thomas M Parker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 9 Initial Disclosures filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Morway, Paul)
December 23, 2019 Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker assigned to case, pursuant to consent. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan terminated. Related document(s) #8 . (Y,A)
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 Consent of the parties to this case being transferred to the docket of Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker for further proceedings. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 12/20/19. (LC,S)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 Case Management Order: Case Management Conference was held on 12/20/19. Case is assigned to the standard track. Case is not suitable for Mediation/Settlement Conference at this time. The parties consent to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. Non-expert discovery shall be completed on or before 4/1/20. Expert reports shall be exchanged on or before 4/1/20 for party with burden of proof & 6/1/20 for Rebuttal and Expert Discovery shall be completed on or before 7/1/20. Pleadings shall be amended without leave of Court and new parties shall be joined on or before 12/31/19. Dispositive Motions shall be filed on or before 5/1/20. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 12/20/19. (LC,S) Time: 30 mins.
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Morway, Paul)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Holdings, LLC and The Allstate Corporation for Allstate Insurance Company, filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Morway, Paul)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Morway, Paul)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference set on 12/20/2019 at 08:45 AM to be held telephonically by Hon. Patricia A. Gaughan. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 11/05/19. (D,Ma)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (B,R)
October 30, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (B,R)
October 30, 2019 Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case, (B,R)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County, case number CV-19-922647 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9601469.. Filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons and Complaint/Docket) (Morway, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warchak v. Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Warchak
Represented By: E. Tasso Paris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul R. Morway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?