Zeev Friedman v. Brother International Corporation
Plaintiff: Zeev Friedman, Esq.
Defendant: Brother International Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv02546
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's #12 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until January 10, 2020 to File Replies (Related documents #3 , #4 ). Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 12/18/2019.(K,K)
December 18, 2019 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. On December 18, 2019, the Court held a scheduled teleconference by Plaintiff Zeev Friedman, Plaintiffs Counsel Patrick J. Perotti, Defendants representative Michael Lynch, and Defendants counsel Michael D. Adams and Nathan P. Nasrallah. The Court discussed the status of the case and Defendants motion to dismiss. The Court determined that the case cannot be resolved on the pleadings without knowing whether Defendant discloses that their printers will stop printing before the ink cartridge is fully depleted. Accordingly, the Court dismissed Defendants motion to dismiss (Doc #: #3 ) and request for judicial notice (Doc #: #4 ) without prejudice. The Parties agreed to suspend briefing and conduct informal discovery for 45 days on what disclosures Defendant makes regarding when the printer prohibits the further use of an ink cartridge. The Court scheduled a follow-up teleconference for February 11, 2020 at 1:30 PM. Counsel and parties are required to attend. The parties are to use the same dial-in instructions. The parties are to email to the Court a joint status report by February 6, 2019 at 12 PM (Court Reporter: n/a.) Time: 15 minutes. (W,CM)
December 17, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until January 10, 2020 to File Replies filed by Defendant Brother International Corporation. Related document(s) #4 , #3 , #10 , #11 . (Nasrallah, Nathan)
December 17, 2019 Notice [non-document] of Telephone Conference set for 12/18/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 18B before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. (K,K)
December 13, 2019 Filing 11 Opposition to #3 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Zeev Friedman, Esq.. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 13, 2019 Filing 10 Response in Opposition to Defendant Brother International Corporation's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of its Motion to Dismiss filed by Zeev Friedman, Esq.. Related document(s) #4 . (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's #9 Unopposed Motion for extension of Plaintiff's responses to Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice and Defendant's Motion to Dismiss until December 13, 2019. Entered on behalf of Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 11/7/2019.(K,K)
November 7, 2019 Utility Event set/reset motion and R&R deadlines/hearings as to Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim . Related document(s) #3 . (K,K)
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion for extension of Plaintiff's responses to Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice and Defendant's Motion to Dismiss until December 13, 2019 filed by Plaintiff Zeev Friedman, Esq.. Related document(s) #4 , #3 . (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 Certified copy of Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas records. (Y,A)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Michael D. Adams for Brother International Corporation. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #5 ). Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 10/31/2019.(K,K)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,MI)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 Supplement to Notice of Removal, - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Brother International Corporation. Related document(s) #1 . (Fiorella, Andrew)
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 Motion for attorney Michael D. Adams to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9601843, filed by Defendant Brother International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Michael D. Adams in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Fiorella, Andrew)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss filed by Brother International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - User Guide, #2 Exhibit 2 - Staples Screenshot, #3 Exhibit 3 - Office Depot Capture)Related document(s) #3 .(Fiorella, Andrew)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant Brother International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Defendant Brother International Corporation's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of its Motion to Dismiss)(Fiorella, Andrew)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Brother Industries, Ltd. for Brother International Corporation filed by Brother International Corporation. (Fiorella, Andrew)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV 19 922736 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9601653. Filer has indicated that case may be related to terminated civil action 1:18-cv-02373. Filed by Brother International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Class Action Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Pleadings) (Fiorella, Andrew)
October 30, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (L,MI)
October 30, 2019 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case. (L,MI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zeev Friedman v. Brother International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zeev Friedman, Esq.
Represented By: Patrick J. Perotti
Represented By: Frank A. Bartela
Represented By: Nicole T. Fiorelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brother International Corporation
Represented By: Nathan P. Nasrallah
Represented By: Andrew G. Fiorella
Represented By: Michael D. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?