Reo v. Lindstedt
Plaintiff: Brian Reo and Bryan Anthony Reo
Defendant: Martin Lindstedt
Case Number: 1:2019cv02589
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Referring Judge: Thomas M Parker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order As of January 6, 2020 Judge Christopher Boyko has taken Senior Status. Effective February 3, 2020, Judge Boyko is moving his chambers to the Howard Metzenbaum Courthouse located at 201 Superior Avenue, Cleveland, Ohio 44114. His office will be located in the East Chambers Rm 328. The Court will maintain courtroom facilities at Courtroom 15B of the Carl B. Stokes Courthouse so please consult the docket for the location of any upcoming proceedings. The phone number will remain 216 357-7151 so any telephonic conferences will not be affected by the change in location. (SL) (ADI)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Opinion and Order. The Court adopts the Magistrate Judge's #11 Report & Recommendation; grants Plaintiff's #8 Motion to Strike; denies as moot Plaintiff's #7 Motion for More Definite Answer; and orders Defendant to file a compliant Answer within fourteen days of receipt of this Order. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 1/17/20. (S,HR)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Copy of #16 Opinion and Order mailed to Martin Lindstedt at 338 Rabbit Track Road Granby, MO 64844. (S,HR)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order IMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Motion to strike DEFENDANTS DOCUMENT DOCKET ENTRY 14 DATED 12/30/2019 AND/OR FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Bryan Anthony Reo. Related document(s) #14 , #6 . (Reo, Bryan)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Answer to Bryan Reo's series of ongoing frivolous Motions to Strike, a more definite plain answer against Bryan Reo and Reo Counter-Defendants given as well, filed by Martin Lindstedt. Related document(s) #8 , #7 . (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (L,MI)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Opposition to #12 Motion leave to file amended answer and counterclaimsMotion for appointment of counsel filed by Bryan Anthony Reo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Deed of Lindstedt's South Dakota Real Property)(Reo, Bryan)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Objections to #11 Report and Recommendation, Motion leave to file amended answer and counterclaims, Motion for appointment of counsel filed by Defendant Martin Lindstedt. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(S,SR)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Report and Recommendation that the Court GRANT Plaintiff Reo's motion to strike (ECF Doc. #8 ) and require Defendant Lindstedt to file an answer that complies with Fed. R. Civ. P. 8. Should Defendant Lindstedt not file a proper answer within 14 days of the court's order, an award of default judgment against Defendant Lindstedt may be warranted. Finally, I recommend that the Court DENY, as moot, plaintiff's motion for a more definite statement (ECF Doc. #7 ). Objections to Report & Recommendation due by 12/24/2019. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 12/10/2019. (D,JJ)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Copy of #11 Report and Recommendation, mailed to Martin Lindstedt, 338 Rabbit Track Road, Granby, MO 64844 on 12/10/2019. (D,JJ)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order referring case to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker for pretrial supervision. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 11/26/19. (S,HR)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Copy of #10 Order of Referral mailed to Martin Lindstedt at 338 Rabbit Track Road, Granby, MO 64844. (S,HR)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Supplemental Authority in Support of #8 Motion to strike , Answer and Counterclaim filed by Brian Reo. Related document(s), #6 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplemental Authority Order from Judge Oliver)(Reo, Bryan) Modified text on 12/17/2019 (M,L).
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Motion to strike Answer and Counter-Claim filed by Plaintiff Brian Reo. Related document(s) #6 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reo, Bryan)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Motion for more definite statement filed by Counter-Defendant Brian Reo. Related document(s) #6 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reo, Bryan)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Answer, Counterclaim against Brian Reo filed by Martin Lindstedt. (Attachments: #1 envelope) (S,SR)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Attorney Appearance by Bryan A. Reo filed by on behalf of Brian Reo. (Reo, Bryan)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FILING ERROR....Certificate of Service filed by Martin Lindstedt (Duplicate filing #4 ) . (W,Jo) Modified on 11/8/2019 (W,Jo).
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Certificate of Service filed by Defendant Martin Lindstedt. Related document(s) #1 . (Y,A)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,MI)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (L,MI)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (L,MI)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Court of Common Pleas Lake County, case number 19CV001530 with jury demand, Filing fee paid. 400. Receipt # 14660118694. Filed by Martin Lindstedt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice, #3 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's State Court Complaint) (L,MI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reo v. Lindstedt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Reo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Anthony Reo
Represented By: Bryan A. Reo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Lindstedt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?