Business Development Corporation of South Carolina v. Rutter & Russin, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Business Development Corporation of South Carolina
Defendant: Justin Rudin, Robert P. Rutter, Mark H. Gams, Gallagher, Gams, Tallen, Barnes & Littrell, LLP, Rutter & Russin, LLC and State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv02609
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 12 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Harrison, Gregory)
December 5, 2019 Filing 11 Marginal Entry Order granting #9 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company answer or responsive pleading due 12/20/2019. Judge John R. Adams on 12/5/19.(L,J)
December 4, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Harrison, Gregory)
December 4, 2019 Filing 9 Consent Motion for extension of time until December 20, 2019 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Related document(s) #1 . (Harrison, Gregory)
December 3, 2019 Filing 8 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Gallagher, Gams, Tallen, Barnes & Littrell, LLP, Mark H. Gams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Email Correspondence, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Motion, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Motion, #5 Exhibit E - State Court Order)(Witkowski, Richard)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Justin Rudin, Robert P. Rutter, Rutter & Russin, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas Docket, #3 Exhibit C - Motion to Enforce Settlement, #4 Exhibit D - Defendant State Farm's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce Settlement, #5 Exhibit E - Court Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce Settlement)(Wilson, Holly)
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon State Farm Fire and Casualty Company on 11/13/2019, filed on behalf of Business Development Corporation of South Carolina. Related document(s) #2 . (T,Je)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Gallagher, Gams, Tallen, Barnes & Littrell, LLP on 11/13/2019; Mark H. Gams on 11/13/2019; Justin Rudin on 11/13/2019; Robert P. Rutter on 11/13/2019; Rutter & Russin, LLC on 11/13/2019, filed on behalf of Business Development Corporation of South Carolina. Related document(s) #2 . (T,Je)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Service of Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Business Development Corporation of South Carolina. Related document(s) #3 .(Weisensell, John)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent BB&T Corporation, Corporate Parent Wells Fargo Bank, NA for Business Development Corporation of South Carolina filed by Business Development Corporation of South Carolina. (Weisensell, John)
November 8, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Gallagher, Gams, Tallen, Barnes & Littrell, LLP (rcpt # 7017 2620 0000 9116 7089), Mark H. Gams (rcpt # 7017 2620 0000 9116 7096), Justin Rudin (rcpt # 7017 2620 0000 9116 7072), Robert P. Rutter (rcpt # 7017 2620 0000 9116 7041), Rutter & Russin, LLC (rcpt # 7017 2620 0000 9116 7027), State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (rcpt # 7017 2620 0000 9116 7102)placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (M,TL)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel over the counter for service upon Gallagher, Gams, Tallen, Barnes & Littrell, LLP, Mark H. Gams, Justin Rudin, Robert P. Rutter, Rutter & Russin, LLC, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (B,R)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Gallagher, Gams, Tallen, Barnes & Littrell, LLP, Mark H. Gams, Justin Rudin, Robert P. Rutter, Rutter & Russin, LLC, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Filing fee paid. $400.00. Receipt # 14660118777. Filed by Business Development Corporation of South Carolina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. State Farm Certified Policy Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (B,R)
November 7, 2019 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case, (B,R)
November 7, 2019 Notice by Clerk that Business Development Corporation of South Carolina failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (B,R)
November 7, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (B,R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Business Development Corporation of South Carolina v. Rutter & Russin, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Rudin
Represented By: Holly M. Wilson
Represented By: Andrew J. Dorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert P. Rutter
Represented By: Holly M. Wilson
Represented By: Andrew J. Dorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark H. Gams
Represented By: Nicholas J. Dertouzos
Represented By: Richard G. Witkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gallagher, Gams, Tallen, Barnes & Littrell, LLP
Represented By: Nicholas J. Dertouzos
Represented By: Richard G. Witkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rutter & Russin, LLC
Represented By: Holly M. Wilson
Represented By: Andrew J. Dorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Gregory A. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Business Development Corporation of South Carolina
Represented By: John C. Weisensell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?