Amark Logistics, Inc. v. UPS Ground Freight, Inc.
Plaintiff: Amark Logistics, Inc.
Defendant: UPS Ground Freight, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02642
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Referring Judge: Thomas M Parker
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 IMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI)
January 9, 2020 Filing 12 Reply in support of #5 Motion to dismiss Counts One and Three of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by UPS Ground Freight, Inc.. (Pitchford, Marshal)
January 8, 2020 Filing 11 Case Management Conference Notice and Order: Case management conference to be held on 2/5/2020 at 11:00 AM at Chambers 11B before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 1/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Position Statement, #2 Attachment B - Preliminary Estimate/Budget). (D,JJ)
January 6, 2020 Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker assigned to case, pursuant to consent. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr terminated. (B,R)
January 6, 2020 Consent of the parties to this case being transferred to the docket of Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker for further proceedings. Related Document #10 . Magistrate Judge Parker will reset the CMC for a date and time convenient to his court and the parties. The CMC set for 1/10/2020 before Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. is hereby canceled. Approved by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 1/6/2020. (R,Sh)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's #9 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until January 9, 2020 to file Reply in Support of the Partial Motion to Dismiss. Approved by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 12/31/2019.(R,Sh)
December 30, 2019 Filing 10 Joint Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by UPS Ground Freight, Inc.. (Pitchford, Marshal)
December 27, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until January 9, 2020 to file Reply in Support of the Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant UPS Ground Freight, Inc. Related document(s) #5 , #8 . (Pitchford, Marshal)
December 18, 2019 Filing 8 Opposition to #5 Motion to dismiss Counts One and Three of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Amark Logistics, Inc.. (Weiss, Eric)
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (R,Sh)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 1/10/2020 at 03:00 PM in Chambers 17A before Judge Solomon Oliver Jr. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 11/19/2019. (R,Sh)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to dismiss Counts One and Three of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant UPS Ground Freight, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Counts One and Three)(Pitchford, Marshal)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 Answer to Complaint and Defenses as to Count II Pursuant to the Carmack Amendment to the Interstate Commerce Act (Related Doc #1 ) filed by UPS Ground Freight, Inc.. (Pitchford, Marshal)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,MI)
November 12, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (L,MI)
November 12, 2019 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case. (L,MI)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent United Parcel Service, Inc. for UPS Ground Freight, Inc. d/b/a UPS Freight LTL Transportation filed by UPS Ground Freight, Inc. d/b/a UPS Freight LTL Transportation. (Pitchford, Marshal)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV 19 923257 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9623569. State Court Complaint was attached to the Notice of Removal, filed by UPS Ground Freight, Inc. d/b/a UPS Freight LTL Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Pitchford, Marshal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amark Logistics, Inc. v. UPS Ground Freight, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPS Ground Freight, Inc.
Represented By: Marshal M. Pitchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amark Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Eric J. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?