Henderson v. Williams
Appellant: Ronald E. Henderson
Appellee: Robert L. Williams
Case Number: 1:2019cv02679
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 IMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (B,R)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order: A Notice of Appeal from the bankruptcy court Order of November 1, 2019, has been filed with this Court (Doc. #1 ). Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8018(a), appellant's brief is due within 30 days after the docketing of notice that the record has been transmitted or is available electronically. The appellee must serve and file a brief within 30 days after service of the appellant's brief. The appellant may serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the appellee's brief. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 11/18/2019. (L,Ja)
November 15, 2019 Notice [non-document] to the parties that an appeal from the order of U.S. Bankruptcy Judge Arthur I. Harris, U.S. Bankruptcy Case No. 19-12682, has been filed with the U.S. District Court. All further correspondence and filings relating to the appeal should bear the civil action number of the U.S. District Court. (B,R)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (B,R)
November 15, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (B,R)
November 15, 2019 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case, (B,R)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal from Bankruptcy Court of Order dated 11/1/2019. Filed by Ronald E. Henderson. (Attachments: #1 Transmission Form, #2 USBC Order, #3 USBC Docket Sheet) (B,R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ronald E. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Robert L. Williams
Represented By: Kathleen Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?