Allen et al v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brinda Bradley, Deatirce Digman, Brenda A. Woods, Cleona Mae Collins, Joann Bevins, NANCY SEALE, George N. Porter, LINDA FINNEY, CYTHINA HURT, Margaret P. Gunther, DONALD MILLSBERG, Ronald Dale Blankenship, Sherine A. Patterson, Frederick Ferriso, Carolyn Clay, Lakeem F. Bryan, LAQUITA MORAN, Alma Delia Aguilar, JUSTIN MAJOR, SAMMIE WINTERS, Linda Allen, A'KERIA NICOLE QUINN, Whitney Hawkins, Wanda A. Yonts, Anthony Atkins, Robert Jackson, VERONIQUE MCCOY, Michael W. Turquitt, Clint Clark, Cedric N. Chatman, JANET KNAFLICH, Merrilyn V. Johnson, Kevin D White, MARY KERNAN, Sandra Marie Carter, David T. Eggen, Amy L. White, Stephanie N. Barton, John Converse, TERRI STOUT, CLARENCE ROUTH, Linda M Taylor, KERI PURSLEY, Treva Lynch, Vince Galli, Angela Korean Hevener, ELIZABETH TISDALE, SHARLENER JOHNSON-RICHARDSON, Michelle Draper, James C. Vaughn, PENNY ROSE and VANESSA WALKER
Defendant: C.R. Bard Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02721
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Order of Case Dismissal without prejudice; parties to bear their own costs. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 12/13/2019. (S,AL)
December 11, 2019 Filing 43 Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ghosh, Sanjay)
November 26, 2019 Notice to Attorney Allison Ng. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (M,TL)
November 26, 2019 Notice to Attorney Pamela J. Marple. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (M,TL)
November 26, 2019 Notice to Attorney Nicole Y. Silver. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (M,TL)
November 26, 2019 Notice to Attorney Lori G. Cohen. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (M,TL)
November 26, 2019 Notice to Attorney Kara T. Stubbs. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (M,TL)
November 26, 2019 Notice to Attorney Angela M. Higgins. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (M,TL)
November 26, 2019 Notice to Attorney John J. Driscoll. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (M,TL)
November 26, 2019 Notice to Attorney Gregory J. Pals. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (M,TL)
November 25, 2019 Copy of #42 Magistrate Consent Form Issued and docket sheet mailed to Pamela J Marple, GREENBERG TRAURIG LLP, 2101 L Street NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC 20037; Allison Ng, GREENBERG TRAURIG, LLP, 3333 Piedmont Rd., NE Suite 2500, Atlanta, GA 30305; Nicole Y Silver, GREENBERG TRAURIG LLP, 2101 L Street NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC 20037; Lori Gail Cohen, GREENBERG TRAURIG, LLP, 3333 Piedmont Rd., NE, Suite 2500, Atlanta, GA 30305; Kara T. Stubbs, Baker, Sterchi, Cowden & Rice, Ste. 500, 2400 Pershing Road, Kansas City, MO 64108; Angela M. Higgins, Baker, Sterchi, Cowden & Rice, Ste. 500, 2400 Pershing Road, Kansas City, MO 64108-2504; Gregory J. Pals, THE DRISCOLL FIRM, P.C., 211 N. Broadway, 40th Floor, St. Louis, MO 63102 on 11/25/2019. (M,TL)
November 20, 2019 Filing 42 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,TL)
November 20, 2019 Notice by Clerk: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.13(b), C.R. Bard Inc. & Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. are reminded of their requirement to file a corporate disclosure statement. (M,TL)
November 20, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,TL)
November 20, 2019 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case per GO 2019-17-1. (M,TL)
November 20, 2019 Filing 41 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Eastern. Case number 4:17-cv-00770. Electronic file, transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion to dismiss plaintiff David Eggen [ #31 ] is granted only to the following extent: the claims of David Eggen are dismissed without prejudice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the sole remaining plaintiff in this case, Linda Finney, shall file her operative complaint in this case with this case caption as previously ordered (Doc. #27 ) by November 25, 2019. If Document 1 is the operative complaint, plaintiffs counsel shall file an affidavit so stating by that same date. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that by November 25, 2019, the parties shall file a joint proposed scheduling plan for disposition of the claims of the remaining plaintiff. This scheduling plan shall include a proposed deadline for early alternative dispute resolution as, absent good cause shown, it is this Court's intention to immediately refer this case to mediation. ( Joint Scheduling Plan due by 11/25/2019.) Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 11/19/2019. (NEP) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF TRANSFER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion to transfer #33 is granted and the claims of Anthony Atkins are severed and transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff Atkins motion to withdraw [ #30 ] is denied without prejudice to being refiled in the Southern District of Florida. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 11/19/2019. (NEP) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF TRANSFER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion to transfer [ #33 ] is granted and the claims of Linda Taylor are severed and transferred to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 11/19/2019. (NEP) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF TRANSFER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion to transfer [ #33 ] is granted and the claims of Janet Knaflich are severed and transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 11/19/2019. (NEP) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF TRANSFER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion to transfer [ #33 ] is granted and the claims of Angela Korean Hevener are severed and transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 11/19/2019. (NEP) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF TRANSFER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion to transfer [ #33 ] is granted and the claims of Clint Clark are severed and transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 11/19/2019. (NEP) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF TRANSFER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion to transfer [ #33 ] is granted and the claims of Linda Allen and Lumas Allen are severed and transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 11/19/2019. (NEP) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
November 15, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Transfer Case to Various Districts, As Detailed Within by Plaintiffs Linda Allen, Anthony Atkins, Clint Clark, David T. Eggen, Angela Korean Hevener, Janet Knaflich, Linda M. Taylor. (Pals, Gregory) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
November 14, 2019 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Dismiss Party Plaintiff David T. Eggen filed by Plaintiff David T. Eggen. (Pals, Gregory) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
November 14, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss Party Plaintiff David T. Eggen by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stubbs, Kara) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
November 14, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as to Anthony Atkins Only ;attorney/firm The Driscoll Firm, P.C.; John J. Driscoll; Gregory J. Pals by Plaintiff Anthony Atkins. (Pals, Gregory) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #28 Consent MOTION to Dismiss Party As to Specified Plaintiffs ONLY by Stipulation, pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), by Plaintiffs Michelle Draper, Frederick Ferriso, LaQuita Moran, James C. Vaughn, Vanessa Walker, Amy L. White, Sammie Winters, Brenda A. Woods. (Pals, Gregory) filed by Michelle Draper, Sammie Winters, LaQuita Moran, Amy L. White, Vanessa Walker, Frederick Ferriso, Brenda A. Woods, James C. Vaughn; ORDERED GRANTED, LaQuita Moran, James C. Vaughn, Vanessa Walker, Amy L. White, Sammie Winters, Brenda A. Woods, Michelle Draper (Individually and as Anticipated Representative of the Estate of Stacy Draper) and Frederick Ferriso terminated. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/23/19. (KEK) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
October 22, 2019 Filing 28 Consent MOTION to Dismiss Party As to Specified Plaintiffs ONLY by Stipulation, pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), by Plaintiffs Michelle Draper, Frederick Ferriso, LaQuita Moran, James C. Vaughn, Vanessa Walker, Amy L. White, Sammie Winters, Brenda A. Woods. (Pals, Gregory) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the status conference set for October 24, 2019 is vacated. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by November 15, 2019, plaintiffs shall notify the Court of their intention to proceed in this forum or request transfer(s) to other district court(s). If plaintiffs elect to proceed in this forum, then they should file in this Court with this case caption their operative complaint by that same date, if the operative complaint is one other than that currently filed as Document #1 in this case. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/22/19. (KEK) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM Regarding Background and Status of Litigation by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment DKT 19444-4, #2 Attachment EXHIBIT 1 - DKT 19444-1)(Stubbs, Kara) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: Status Conference reset for 10/24/2019 01:00 PM in Chambers before District Judge Rodney W. Sippel. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/15/19. (ARL) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM to the Court Re: Removal of Plaintiffs by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stubbs, Kara) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
October 2, 2019 Filing 23 ENTRY of Appearance by Pamela J Marple for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Marple, Pamela) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
September 27, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE Entry of Appearance: by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Silver, Nicole) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
September 25, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Lori G. Cohen. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7483236) by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 List of Bar Memberships, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Cohen, Lori) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #19 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Richard B. North, Jr. by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Stubbs, Kara) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc., Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 9/23/2019. (NEP) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Richard B. North, Jr. by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Stubbs, Kara) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
September 19, 2019 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Kara T. Stubbs for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Stubbs, Kara) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
September 19, 2019 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Allison Ng for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Ng, Allison) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. This case having been remanded by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is set for a status conference on October 24, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. in the chambers of the undersigned. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by October 17, 2019, the parties shall file a joint memorandum with this Court which sets forth a statement of the case, the procedural background of the instant case, and the current status of the instant litigation. This joint memorandum shall also identify all relevant pleadings from the MDL by docket number (including any amended complaints and answers) that should be filed in the instant case. Finally, the joint memorandum shall set out a proposed schedule for the remainder of this case, identifying whether any remaining discovery needs to be conducted, whether any expert or dispositive motions will be filed prior to trial, whether the parties participated in settlement negotiations during the pendency of the MDL proceedings, and the propriety of referral to mediation. If any motions will be filed, the joint memorandum shall set out the expected nature and basis of the motions and include an explanation as to whether the issues were addressed by the MDL court. Any rulings by the MDL court on these issues, whether or not specifically applicable to this case, shall be specifically identified by MDL docket number. (Status Conference set for 10/24/2019 10:30 AM in Chambers before District Judge Rodney W. Sippel. Status Report due by 10/17/2019.) Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 9/6/2019. (CBL) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell. (DLB) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 14 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER FINALIZED regarding multidistrict litigation by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. (Attachments: #1 Allen et al v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al Docket Sheet)(DLB) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 13 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER regarding multidistrict litigation by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel (DLB) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
August 8, 2017 ***REMARK - Case transferred from Missouri Eastern has been opened in DISTRICT OF ARIZONA as case 2:17-cv-02646, filed 08/08/2017. (DLB) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: District of Arizona. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DLB) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Signed by Judge Unassigned on 8/1/17. (CAR) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss Party Without Prejudice -- Specified Plaintiffs ONLY by Plaintiffs Sharlener Johnson-Richardson, Keri Pursley. (Pals, Gregory) filed by Sharlener Johnson-Richardson, Keri Pursley ; ORDERED GRANTED., Sharlener Johnson-Richardson and Keri Pursley terminated.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 7/27/17. (LGK) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
July 26, 2017 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Party Without Prejudice -- Specified Plaintiffs ONLY by Plaintiffs Sharlener Johnson-Richardson, Keri Pursley. (Pals, Gregory) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss Party Without Prejudice pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(2) as to Specified Plaintiffs ONLY, filed by Cythina Hurt, Stephanie N. Barton, Robert Jackson, Sherine A. Patterson, Whitney Hawkins, Alma Delia Aguilar, Cleona Mae Collins, Cedric N. Chatman, Donald Millsberg, Lakeem F. Bryan, Michael W. Turquitt, Brinda Bradley, Justin Major, Ronald Dale Blankenship, Carolyn Clay; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 6/27/17. (CAR) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
June 26, 2017 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Party Without Prejudice pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(2) as to Specified Plaintiffs ONLY Alma Aguilar, Stephanie Barton, Ronald Blankenship, Brinda Bradley, Lakeem Bryan, Cedric Chatman, Carolyn Clay, Cleona Mae Collins, Whitney Hawkins, Cynthia Hurt, Robert Jackson, Individually and As Representative of the Estate of Frances Jackson, Justin Major, Donald Millsberg, Sherine Patterson, and Michael Turquitt ONLY by Plaintiffs Alma Delia Aguilar, Stephanie N. Barton, Ronald Dale Blankenship, Brinda Bradley, Lakeem F. Bryan, Cedric N. Chatman, Carolyn Clay, Cleona Mae Collins, Whitney Hawkins, Cythina Hurt, Robert Jackson, Justin Major, Donald Millsberg, Sherine A. Patterson, Michael W. Turquitt. (Pals, Gregory) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
June 5, 2017 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. Parent companies: C. R. Bard, Inc., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: C. R. Bard, Inc.,. (Higgins, Angela) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
June 5, 2017 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant C.R. Bard, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Higgins, Angela) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
May 22, 2017 Filing 4 Special Appearance, ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, and Affirmative Defenses by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc..(Higgins, Angela) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
February 23, 2017 Summons Issued as to defendant All Defendants. The summons was emailed to John J. Driscoll. (MFG) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
February 22, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Alma Delia Aguilar, Linda Allen, Anthony Atkins, Stephanie N. Barton, Joann Bevins, Ronald Dale Blankenship, Brinda Bradley, Lakeem F. Bryan, Sandra Marie Carter, Cedric N. Chatman, Clint Clark, Carolyn Clay, Cleona Mae Collins, John Converse, Deatirce Digman, Michelle Draper, David T. Eggen, Frederick Ferriso, Linda Finney, Vince Galli, Margaret P. Gunther, Whitney Hawkins, Angela Korean Hevener, Cythina Hurt, Robert Jackson, Merrilyn V. Johnson, Sharlener Johnson-Richardson, Mary Kernan, Janet Knaflich, Treva Lynch, Justin Major, Veronique Mccoy, Donald Millsberg, LaQuita Moran, Sherine A. Patterson, George N. Porter, Keri Pursley, A'Keria Nicole Quinn, Penny Rose, Clarence Routh, Nancy Seale, Terri Stout, Linda M. Taylor, Elizabeth Tisdale, Michael W. Turquitt, James C. Vaughn, Vanessa Walker, Amy L. White, Kevin D. White, Sammie Winters, Brenda A. Woods, Wanda A. Yonts Process Server: Valley Wide Process Service (Driscoll, John) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
February 22, 2017 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Rodney W. Sippel. (MFG) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
February 21, 2017 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Gregory J. Pals for Plaintiffs Alma Delia Aguilar, Linda Allen, Lumus Allen, Anthony Atkins, Stephanie N. Barton, Joann Bevins, Ronald Dale Blankenship, Brinda Bradley, Lakeem F. Bryan, Sandra Marie Carter, Cedric N. Chatman, Clint Clark, Carolyn Clay, Cleona Mae Collins, John Converse, Deatirce Digman, Michelle Draper, Stacy Draper, David T. Eggen, LINDA FINNEY, Frederick Ferriso, Rose Galli, Vince Galli, Margaret P. Gunther, CYTHINA HURT, Whitney Hawkins, Ethel Lorrina Hedrick, Angela Korean Hevener, ROBERT JACKSON, MERRILYN V JOHNSON, RONALD D JOHNSON, SHARLENER JOHNSON-RICHARDSON, Frances Jackson, MARY KERNAN, JANET KNAFLICH, Martrie King, Treva Lynch, JUSTIN MAJOR, VERONIQUE MCCOY, DONALD MILLSBERG, LAQUITA MORAN, SHERINE A PATTERSON, GEORGE N PORTER, KERI PURSLEY, A'KERIA NICOLE QUINN, PENNY ROSE, CLARENCE ROUTH, NANCY SEALE, TERRI STOUT, LINDA M TAYLOR, ELIZABETH TISDALE, MICHAEL W TURQUITT, JAMES C VAUGHN, VANESSA WALKER, AMY L WHITE, KEVIN D WHITE, SAMMIE WINTERS, BRENDA A WOODS, WANDA A YONTS. (Pals, Gregory) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]
February 21, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. with receipt number 0865-5821863, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by SHARLENER JOHNSON-RICHARDSON, RONALD D JOHNSON, Vince Galli, Ronald Dale Blankenship, Ethel Lorrina Hedrick, Michelle Draper, Alma Delia Aguilar, Stephanie N. Barton, Stacy Draper, ROBERT JACKSON, Deatirce Digman, A'KERIA NICOLE QUINN, KEVIN D WHITE, Treva Lynch, Angela Korean Hevener, Frances Jackson, BRENDA A WOODS, LAQUITA MORAN, Frederick Ferriso, Cleona Mae Collins, Martrie King, LINDA M TAYLOR, Whitney Hawkins, Sandra Marie Carter, MERRILYN V JOHNSON, LINDA FINNEY, Cedric N. Chatman, VANESSA WALKER, TERRI STOUT, GEORGE N PORTER, Rose Galli, CLARENCE ROUTH, Carolyn Clay, Margaret P. Gunther, CYTHINA HURT, Joann Bevins, ELIZABETH TISDALE, DONALD MILLSBERG, JANET KNAFLICH, Linda Allen, MICHAEL W TURQUITT, Lakeem F. Bryan, WANDA A YONTS, SHERINE A PATTERSON, Clint Clark, NANCY SEALE, John Converse, JAMES C VAUGHN, VERONIQUE MCCOY, Brinda Bradley, Lumus Allen, MARY KERNAN, SAMMIE WINTERS, PENNY ROSE, JUSTIN MAJOR, KERI PURSLEY, David T. Eggen, AMY L WHITE, Anthony Atkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons BPV, Inc., #3 Summons C.R. Bard, Inc.)(Driscoll, John) [Transferred from moed on 11/20/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen et al v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brinda Bradley
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deatirce Digman
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda A. Woods
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleona Mae Collins
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Bevins
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NANCY SEALE
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George N. Porter
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA FINNEY
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CYTHINA HURT
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret P. Gunther
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD MILLSBERG
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Dale Blankenship
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherine A. Patterson
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Ferriso
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Clay
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakeem F. Bryan
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAQUITA MORAN
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alma Delia Aguilar
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN MAJOR
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMMIE WINTERS
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Allen
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A'KERIA NICOLE QUINN
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whitney Hawkins
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda A. Yonts
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Atkins
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Jackson
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VERONIQUE MCCOY
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael W. Turquitt
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clint Clark
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedric N. Chatman
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANET KNAFLICH
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merrilyn V. Johnson
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin D White
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY KERNAN
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Marie Carter
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David T. Eggen
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy L. White
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie N. Barton
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Converse
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRI STOUT
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLARENCE ROUTH
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda M Taylor
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KERI PURSLEY
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Treva Lynch
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vince Galli
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Korean Hevener
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH TISDALE
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARLENER JOHNSON-RICHARDSON
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Draper
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James C. Vaughn
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PENNY ROSE
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VANESSA WALKER
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard Inc.
Represented By: Pamela J Marple
Represented By: Nicole Y Silver
Represented By: Allison Ng
Represented By: Lori Gail Cohen
Represented By: Angela M. Higgins
Represented By: Kara T. Stubbs
Represented By: Lori G. Cohen
Represented By: Sanjay Ghosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Pamela J Marple
Represented By: Nicole Y Silver
Represented By: Allison Ng
Represented By: Lori Gail Cohen
Represented By: Angela M. Higgins
Represented By: Kara T. Stubbs
Represented By: Lori G. Cohen
Represented By: Sanjay Ghosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?