Darby v. May, et al.
Plaintiff: Arthur Lee Darby
Defendant: Daniel Hall, Opollo Aduse, Captain Adams, Doreen Burkhart, Warden Harold May, Doctor Grandson and Lt. Ceago
Case Number: 1:2019cv02827
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Donald C Nugent
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Filing 3 Medical information to supplement filed by Plaintiff Arthur Lee Darby. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Medical Documents, #3 Envelope)(J,FE)
January 10, 2020 IMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI)
December 5, 2019 Copy of #1 Complaint, mailed to Arthur Lee Darby at P.O. Box 6000, Glenville, WV 26351 on 12/5/19. Related document(s) #1 . (Y,A)
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Arthur Lee Darby. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Inquiry)(Y,A)
December 5, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (Y,A)
December 5, 2019 Judge Donald C. Nugent assigned to case, (Y,A)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Captain Adams, Opollo Aduse, Doreen Burkhart, Lt. Ceago, Doctor Grandson, Daniel Hall, Harold May. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Arthur Lee Darby. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 USM-285) (Y,A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darby v. May, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Opollo Aduse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doreen Burkhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Harold May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Grandson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Ceago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Lee Darby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?