Rochester v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Nancy Rochester
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv02894
Filed: December 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Referring Judge: William H Baughman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 LAST NOTICE: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. In order to complete our final transition to NextGen, CM/ECF will be offline starting at 12:00 noon on Friday, February 7, 2020, through 11:59 p.m. Sunday, February 9, 2020. Pursuant to General Order 2020-02, we have established an email box, nextgenfilings@ohnd.uscourts.gov, for submitting documents to be filed during this period.Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. Step one was to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your OHND e-filing account in the NextGen CM/ECF system on or after February 10, 2020. # Linking Instructions. You will be unable to e-file until the accounts are linked. If you have any additional questions, please call the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI)
January 10, 2020 IMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI)
January 4, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Attorney General on December 27, 2019 filed on behalf of Nancy Rochester Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Domestic Return Receipt - Attorney General)(Margolius, Marcia)
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Regional Chief Counsel Social Security Administration on December 26, 2019 filed on behalf of Nancy Rochester Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Domestic Return Receipt - Regional Chief Counsel SSA)(Margolius, Marcia)
December 28, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Commissioner of the Social Security Administration through the U.S. Attorney's Office on 12/23/2019 filed on behalf of Nancy Rochester Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Domestic Return Receipt - US Attorney)(Margolius, Marcia)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 12/16/19. (D,Ky)
December 16, 2019 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge John R. Adams on 12/16/2019. (L,MI)
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (L,MI)
December 16, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Commissioner of the Social Security Administration c/o U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General, and Office of the Regional Chief Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (L,MI)
December 16, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (L,MI)
December 16, 2019 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (L,MI)
December 14, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9677710.. Filed by Nancy Rochester. (Attachments: #1 Summons Attorney General, #2 Summons Regional Chief Counsel SSA, #3 Summons US Attorney, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Margolius, Marcia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rochester v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Rochester
Represented By: Marcia W. Margolius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Represented By: Lisa Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?