Abell et al v. Golden Hawk Transportation Co. et al
Plaintiff: Jessica Connell and Bradley Abell
Defendant: Kenneth Sexton and Golden Hawk Transportation Co.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02912
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service by Clerk unexecuted upon Kenneth Sexton. Service attempted by certified on 1/21/2020 filed on behalf of Bradley Abell, Jessica Connell Related document(s) #5 . (J,FE)
February 3, 2020 LAST NOTICE: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. In order to complete our final transition to NextGen, CM/ECF will be offline starting at 12:00 noon on Friday, February 7, 2020, through 11:59 p.m. Sunday, February 9, 2020. Pursuant to General Order 2020-02, we have established an email box, nextgenfilings@ohnd.uscourts.gov, for submitting documents to be filed during this period.Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. Step one was to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your OHND e-filing account in the NextGen CM/ECF system on or after February 10, 2020. # Linking Instructions. You will be unable to e-file until the accounts are linked. If you have any additional questions, please call the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI)
January 29, 2020 As of January 6, 2020 Judge Christopher Boyko has taken Senior Status. Effective February 3, 2020, Judge Boyko is moving his chambers to the Howard Metzenbaum Courthouse located at 201 Superior Avenue, Cleveland, Ohio 44114. His office will be located in the East Chambers Rm 328. The Court will maintain courtroom facilities at Courtroom 15B of the Carl B. Stokes Courthouse so please consult the docket for the location of any upcoming proceedings. The phone number will remain 216 357-7151 so any telephonic conferences will not be affected by the change in location. (SL) (ADI)
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Bradley Abell. Golden Hawk Transportation Co. waiver sent on 12/19/2019, answer due 2/18/2020 filed on behalf of Bradley Abell (Tuttle, Craig)
January 10, 2020 IMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI)
January 9, 2020 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Kenneth Sexton placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 9489009000276088789543. (J,FE)
January 9, 2020 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Golden Hawk Transportation Co. placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 9489009000276088789536. (J,FE)
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Golden Hawk Transportation Co., Kenneth Sexton. (W,CM)
January 3, 2020 Filing 4 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Bradley Abell. (Attachments: #1 Pleading, #2 Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Tuttle, Craig)
January 3, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR. NO SUMMONS ATTACHED. Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Bradley Abell. (Attachments: #1 Pleading Request for Service, #2 Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tuttle, Craig) Modified on 1/3/2020 (W,CM).
December 31, 2019 Notice to Attorney Craig P. Scott. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not provided, and were not issued. (L,MI)
December 18, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (L,MI)
December 18, 2019 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (L,MI)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9682635. Filed by Bradley Abell, Jessica Connell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Tuttle, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abell et al v. Golden Hawk Transportation Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Connell
Represented By: Craig P. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Abell
Represented By: Gerald S. Leeseberg
Represented By: Craig S. Tuttle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Hawk Transportation Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?