Litton Loan Servicing, L.P. et al v. Schubert et al
Appellant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Ocwen Financial Corporation and Litton Loan Servicing, L.P.
Appellee: Sue Schubert, Dennis Schubert, Litton Loan Servicing, LP and JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03006
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Bankruptcy Cross-Appeal Record Availability re #5 Bankruptcy Cross-Appeal, (B,R)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order granting the consent Motion to consolidate cases (Related Doc #6 ). The bankruptcy appeals shall be consolidated (1:19CV3005 & 1:19CV3006). Further, a single docket sheet shall be maintained for all matters occurring in these cases. Accordingly, 1:19CV3006 is hereby administratively CLOSED. Judge John R. Adams on 2/3/20. (K,C)
February 3, 2020 LAST NOTICE: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. In order to complete our final transition to NextGen, CM/ECF will be offline starting at 12:00 noon on Friday, February 7, 2020, through 11:59 p.m. Sunday, February 9, 2020. Pursuant to General Order 2020-02, we have established an email box, nextgenfilings@ohnd.uscourts.gov, for submitting documents to be filed during this period.Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. Step one was to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your OHND e-filing account in the NextGen CM/ECF system on or after February 10, 2020. # Linking Instructions. You will be unable to e-file until the accounts are linked. If you have any additional questions, please call the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI)
January 31, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, (B,R)
January 16, 2020 Filing 5 Cross-Appeal from Bankruptcy Court of Order dated December 18, 2019, filed by Dennis Schubert, Sue Schubert. Related document: #1 . (Attachments: #1 Transmission Form, #2 Judgment dated 12/18/2019, #3 USBC Current Docket Sheet, #4 Statement of the Issue on Cross-Appeal) (B,R)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice byAttorney Rudy J. Cerone as to Litton Loan Servicing, L.P. and Ocwen Financial Corporation. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #3 ). Judge John R. Adams on 1/13/20.(K,C)
January 10, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Order Admitting Rudy J. Cerone to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Litton Loan Servicing, L.P., Ocwen Financial Corporation. Related document(s) #3 . (Kostura, Bryan)
January 10, 2020 Filing 3 Motion for attorney Rudy J. Cerone to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9718551, filed by Litton Loan Servicing, L.P., Ocwen Financial Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Rudy J. Cerone, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Kostura, Bryan)
January 10, 2020 IMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (B,R)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal from Bankruptcy Court of Order dated December 18, 2019. Filed by Litton Loan Servicing, L.P., Ocwen Financial Corporation, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Transmission Form, #2 USBC Order, #3 USBC Docket Sheet) (B,R)
December 30, 2019 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case, (B,R)
December 30, 2019 Notice [non-document] to the parties that an appeal from the order of U.S. Bankruptcy Judge Arthur I. Harris, U.S. Bankruptcy Case No. 19-1088, has been filed with the U.S. District Court. All further correspondence and filings relating to the appeal should bear the civil action number of the U.S. District Court. (B,R)
December 30, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (B,R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Litton Loan Servicing, L.P. et al v. Schubert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Nelson M. Reid
Represented By: Daniel C. Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ocwen Financial Corporation
Represented By: Bryan T. Kostura
Represented By: Rudy J. Cerone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Litton Loan Servicing, L.P.
Represented By: Bryan T. Kostura
Represented By: Rudy J. Cerone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Sue Schubert
Represented By: Kenneth P. Frankel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Dennis Schubert
Represented By: Kenneth P. Frankel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Litton Loan Servicing, LP
Represented By: Bryan T. Kostura
Represented By: Rudy J. Cerone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A.
Represented By: Nelson M. Reid
Represented By: Daniel C. Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?