Holland et al v. DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bonnie Holland and George Holland
Defendant: DePuy Inc., DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International and Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019dp20063
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick(MDL2197)
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Suggestion of Death filed by Bonnie Holland, George Holland. (Emison, Brett)
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Johnson & Johnson on 9/23/2019, filed on behalf of George Holland; Bonnie Holland (Emison, Brett)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. on 9/23/2019, filed on behalf of George Holland; Bonnie Holland (Emison, Brett)
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Johnson & Johnson International on 9/23/2019, filed on behalf of George Holland; Bonnie Holland (Emison, Brett)
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon DePuy Inc. on 9/23/2019, filed on behalf of George Holland; Bonnie Holland (Emison, Brett)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. on 9/20/2019, filed on behalf of George Holland; Bonnie Holland (Emison, Brett)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon All Defendants. (P,R)
September 12, 2019 Request to Clerk for refund of erroneous or duplicate on-line filing fee payment. Reason for refund request: Duplicate charge. Receipt #: 26K1A9M3, filed by Bonnie Holland, George Holland. Related document(s) #1 . (Emison, Brett)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Bonnie Holland, George Holland. (Emison, Brett)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand Short Form Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9510281.. Filed by George Holland, Bonnie Holland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Emison, Brett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holland et al v. DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Inc.
Represented By: Susan M. Sharko
Represented By: Kristen L. Mayer
Represented By: Zoha Barkeshli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy International Limited
Represented By: Susan M. Sharko
Represented By: Kristen L. Mayer
Represented By: Zoha Barkeshli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.
Represented By: Susan M. Sharko
Represented By: Kristen L. Mayer
Represented By: Zoha Barkeshli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Susan M. Sharko
Represented By: Kristen L. Mayer
Represented By: Zoha Barkeshli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson International
Represented By: Susan M. Sharko
Represented By: Kristen L. Mayer
Represented By: Zoha Barkeshli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.
Represented By: Susan M. Sharko
Represented By: Kristen L. Mayer
Represented By: Zoha Barkeshli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Holland
Represented By: Brett A. Emison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Holland
Represented By: Brett A. Emison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?