Board of County Commissioners of the County of Adams, et al v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Board of County Commissioners of the County of Fremont, City of Northglenn, Board of County Commissioners of the County of Arapahoe, Board of County Commissioners of the County of Teller, Board of County Commissioners of the County of Boulder, City of Black Hawk, Tri-County Health Department, City and County of Broomfield, City of Commerce City, Board of County Commissioners of the County of Adams, City of Westminster, Board of County Commissioners of the County of Larimer, Town of Hudson, City of Aurora and City and County of Denver
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt PLC, Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Johnson & Johnson, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., SpecGX LLC, Purdue Pharma Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, CVS RX Services, Inc., Smith Drug Company, Impax Generics, Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC, Omnicare Distribution Center LLC, Walgreen Co., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Omnicare, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., KVK-Tech, Inc., Impax Laboratories, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Walmart, Inc., Smiths Food & Drug Centers, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Richard S. Sackler, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., Theresa Sackler, David A. Sackler, Beverly Sackler, Rhodes Technologies Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Kathe A. Sackler, Jonathan D. Sackler, Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, Rhodes Technologies and Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Case Number: 1:2019op45036
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2019 Filing 15 Amended complaint Short Form for Supplementing Complaint and Amending Defendants against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) Richard S. Sackler; Jonathan D. Sackler; Mortimer D.A. Sackler; Kathe A. Sackler; Ilene Sackler Lefcourt; Beverly Sackler; Theresa Sackler; David A. Sackler; Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family; Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.; Rhodes Technologies Inc.; Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.; and Rhodes Technologies. Filed by City of Commerce City, Board of County Commissioners of the County of Arapahoe, Board of County Commissioners of the County of Adams, City of Westminster, Town of Hudson, Board of County Commissioners of the County of Larimer, Board of County Commissioners of the County of Teller, City and County of Broomfield, City of Aurora, Board of County Commissioners of the County of Fremont, City of Northglenn, Tri-County Health Department, City and County of Denver, City of Black Hawk, Board of County Commissioners of the County of Boulder. (Ko, David)
April 11, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by KVK-Tech, Inc.. (Rice, Thomas)
April 11, 2019 Filing 13 Attorney Appearance by Thomas E. Rice, Jr filed by on behalf of KVK-Tech, Inc.. (Rice, Thomas)
March 15, 2019 Filing 12 Amended complaint Short Form for Supplementing Complaint and Amending Defendants against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc., Cephalon Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt PLC, Mallinckrodt, LLC, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., SpecGX LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp., Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Impax Generics, Impax Laboratories, Inc., KVK-Tech, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Walmart, Inc., Smiths Food & Drug Centers, Inc., Smith Drug Company, Omnicare Distribution Center LLC, Omnicare, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc., CVS RX Services, Inc. and adding new party defendant(s) Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.; Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.; Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.; Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC; Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC; Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Impax Generics; Impax Laboratories, Inc.; KVK-Tech, Inc.; Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc. a/k/a Walgreen Co; Walmart, Inc.; Smiths Food & Drug Centers, Inc. d/b/a/ Peytons Phoenix; Smith Drug Company; Omnicare Distribution Center LLC; Omnicare, Inc.; CVS Health Corporation; CVS Pharmacy Inc.; & CVS RX Services, Inc.. Filed by City of Commerce City, Board of County Commissioners of the County of Arapahoe, Board of County Commissioners of the County of Adams, City of Westminster, Town of Hudson, Board of County Commissioners of the County of Larimer, Board of County Commissioners of the County of Teller, City and County of Broomfield, City of Aurora, Board of County Commissioners of the County of Fremont, City of Northglenn, Tri-County Health Department, City and County of Denver, City of Black Hawk, Board of County Commissioners of the County of Boulder. (Ko, David)
January 28, 2019 Filing 11 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Colorado. Case number 1:19-cv-00114. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 25, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFIED COPY OF THE CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-76) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado, 19-cv-00114 NYW, to the Northern District of Ohio, to become part of MDL 2804, by Clerk on 1/25/2019. (evana, ) [Transferred from cod on 1/28/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (evana, ) [Transferred from cod on 1/28/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 CASE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to #7 Memorandum Returning Case This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00114 NYW. (Text Only Entry) (evana, ) [Transferred from cod on 1/28/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE for reassignment by Senior Judge David E. Ebel (evana, ) [Transferred from cod on 1/28/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Amy White Naes attempted to enter her appearance in this case by affixing her "s/ " signature to the complaint. Ms. Naes does not appear on the Court's attorney roll as a member of the bar of this court. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a)(5), her purported appearance, therefore, will not be recognized. (Text Only Entry) (mfred) [Transferred from cod on 1/28/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued, Summons must include all parties in the caption and cannot include "et al". (rroge, ) [Transferred from cod on 1/28/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge David M. Ebel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (rroge, ) [Transferred from cod on 1/28/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, filed by attorneyStephen C. Peters, Patricia W. Gilbert, and Kristin M. Bronson. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (rroge, ) [Transferred from cod on 1/28/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Cases by Plaintiffs Board Of County Commissioners Of The Of The County Of Adams, Board of County Commissioners of the County of Arapahoe, The, Board of County Commissioners of the County of Boulder, Board of County Commissioners of the County of Fremont, The, Board of County Commissioners of the County of Larimer, Board of County Commissioners of the County of Teller, City and County of Broomfield, City and County of Denver, City of Aurora, City of Black Hawk, City of Commerce City, City of Northglenn, City of Westminster, Town of Hudson, Tri-County Health Department (Loeser, Derek) [Transferred from cod on 1/28/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., John and Jane Does 1-100, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt PLC, Mallinckrodt, LLC, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., SpecGX LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6481034)Attorney Derek William Loeser added to party Board Of County Commissioners Of The Of The County Of Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Derek William Loeser added to party Board of County Commissioners of the County of Arapahoe, The(pty:pla), Attorney Derek William Loeser added to party Board of County Commissioners of the County of Boulder(pty:pla), Attorney Derek William Loeser added to party Board of County Commissioners of the County of Fremont, The (pty:pla), Attorney Derek William Loeser added to party Board of County Commissioners of the County of Larimer(pty:pla), Attorney Derek William Loeser added to party Board of County Commissioners of the County of Teller(pty:pla), Attorney Derek William Loeser added to party City and County of Broomfield(pty:pla), Attorney Derek William Loeser added to party City and County of Denver(pty:pla), Attorney Derek William Loeser added to party City of Aurora(pty:pla), Attorney Derek William Loeser added to party City of Black Hawk(pty:pla), Attorney Derek William Loeser added to party City of Commerce City(pty:pla), Attorney Derek William Loeser added to party City of Northglenn(pty:pla), Attorney Derek William Loeser added to party City of Westminster(pty:pla), Attorney Derek William Loeser added to party Town of Hudson(pty:pla), Attorney Derek William Loeser added to party Tri-County Health Department(pty:pla), filed by City of Commerce City, Board of County Commissioners of the County of Arapahoe, The, Board Of County Commissioners Of The Of The County Of Adams, City of Westminster, Town of Hudson, Board of County Commissioners of the County of Larimer, Board of County Commissioners of the County of Teller, City and County of Broomfield, City of Aurora, Board of County Commissioners of the County of Fremont, The, City of Northglenn, Tri-County Health Department, City and County of Denver, City of Black Hawk, Board of County Commissioners of the County of Boulder. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Loeser, Derek) [Transferred from cod on 1/28/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of County Commissioners of the County of Adams, et al v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS RX Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Drug Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Generics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omnicare Distribution Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omnicare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVK-Tech, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas E. Rice, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smiths Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of County Commissioners of the County of Fremont
Represented By: David J. Ko
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Daniel P. Mensher
Represented By: Brenda L. Jackson
Represented By: Stephen C. Peters
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Alison S Gaffney
Represented By: Gabriel Verdugo
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Alison S. Gaffney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Northglenn
Represented By: David J. Ko
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Daniel P. Mensher
Represented By: Corey Yaron Hoffmann
Represented By: Stephen C. Peters
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Alison S Gaffney
Represented By: Gabriel Verdugo
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Alison S. Gaffney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of County Commissioners of the County of Arapahoe
Represented By: David J. Ko
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Daniel P. Mensher
Represented By: Stephen C. Peters
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Ronald Alan Carl
Represented By: Alison S Gaffney
Represented By: Gabriel Verdugo
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Alison S. Gaffney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of County Commissioners of the County of Teller
Represented By: David J. Ko
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Represented By: Paul W. Hurcomb
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Daniel P. Mensher
Represented By: Stephen C. Peters
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Alison S Gaffney
Represented By: Gabriel Verdugo
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Alison S. Gaffney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of County Commissioners of the County of Boulder
Represented By: David J. Ko
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Daniel P. Mensher
Represented By: Stephen C. Peters
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Alison S Gaffney
Represented By: Gabriel Verdugo
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Alison S. Gaffney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Black Hawk
Represented By: David J. Ko
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Daniel P. Mensher
Represented By: Corey Yaron Hoffmann
Represented By: Stephen C. Peters
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Alison S Gaffney
Represented By: Gabriel Verdugo
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Alison S. Gaffney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tri-County Health Department
Represented By: David J. Ko
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Daniel P. Mensher
Represented By: Stephen C. Peters
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Alison S Gaffney
Represented By: Adrian LaVerne Overton
Represented By: Gabriel Verdugo
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Alison S. Gaffney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City and County of Broomfield
Represented By: David J. Ko
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Patricia Wonsiewicz Gilbert
Represented By: Daniel P. Mensher
Represented By: Stephen C. Peters
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Alison S Gaffney
Represented By: Gabriel Verdugo
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Alison S. Gaffney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Commerce City
Represented By: David J. Ko
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Daniel P. Mensher
Represented By: Stephen C. Peters
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Alison S Gaffney
Represented By: Gabriel Verdugo
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Alison S. Gaffney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of County Commissioners of the County of Adams
Represented By: David J. Ko
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Daniel P. Mensher
Represented By: Stephen C. Peters
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Alison S Gaffney
Represented By: Heidi M. Miller
Represented By: Gabriel Verdugo
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Alison S. Gaffney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Westminster
Represented By: David J. Ko
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: David Robert Frankel
Represented By: Daniel P. Mensher
Represented By: Stephen C. Peters
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Alison S Gaffney
Represented By: Gabriel Verdugo
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Alison S. Gaffney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of County Commissioners of the County of Larimer
Represented By: Jeannine Sue Haag
Represented By: David J. Ko
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Daniel P. Mensher
Represented By: Stephen C. Peters
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Alison S Gaffney
Represented By: Gabriel Verdugo
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: David Patrick Ayraud
Represented By: Alison S. Gaffney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town of Hudson
Represented By: David J. Ko
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Daniel P. Mensher
Represented By: Corey Yaron Hoffmann
Represented By: Stephen C. Peters
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Alison S Gaffney
Represented By: Gabriel Verdugo
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Alison S. Gaffney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Aurora
Represented By: David J. Ko
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Daniel P. Mensher
Represented By: Stephen C. Peters
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Alison S Gaffney
Represented By: Gabriel Verdugo
Represented By: Nancy Cornish Rodgers
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Isabelle Sabra Evans
Represented By: Alison S. Gaffney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City and County of Denver
Represented By: Edward James Gorman
Represented By: Renee A. Goble
Represented By: David J. Ko
Represented By: Kristin M. Bronson
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Daniel P. Mensher
Represented By: Stephen C. Peters
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Alison S Gaffney
Represented By: Gabriel Verdugo
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Mulbarger
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Alison S. Gaffney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?