Washington County v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: Washington County
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Douglas J. Jorgensen, McKesson Corporation, Insys Therapeutics Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Mark E. Cieniawski, Watson Laboratories Inc., Rite Aid of Maine, Inc., Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Michael B. Bruehl, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Rite Aid Corporation, Purdue Frederick Company, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Walgreen Co., Purdue Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Walmart Inc., Johnson & Johnson, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, CVS Pharmacy Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Case Number: 1:2019op45185
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 60 Attorney Appearance by Joseph L. Ciaccio filed by on behalf of Washington County. (Ciaccio, Joseph)
April 5, 2019 Filing 59 Attorney Appearance by Shayna Erin Sacks filed by on behalf of Washington County. (Sacks, Shayna)
April 5, 2019 Filing 58 Attorney Appearance by Salvatore C. Badala filed by on behalf of Washington County. (Badala, Salvatore)
March 27, 2019 Filing 57 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Maine. Case number 1:19-cv-00024. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 26, 2019 Filing 56 MDL CERTIFIED ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER AND VACATING THE MARCH 28, 2019, HEARING SESSION ORDER (mnw) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 55 MDL ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER AND VACATING THE MARCH 28, 2019, HEARING SESSION ORDER (mnw) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES M. CAMPBELL on behalf of JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC (CAMPBELL, JAMES) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 53 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Charles C. Lifland filed by MICHELLE I. SCHAFFER on behalf of JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1976721.) (SCHAFFER, MICHELLE) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 52 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (SCHAFFER, MICHELLE) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHELLE I. SCHAFFER on behalf of JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC (SCHAFFER, MICHELLE) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Reset Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due from JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC & JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC by 2/19/2019. (mnw) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Reset Deadlines : Pro Hac Vice Certificate due from CHARLES C. LIFLAND by 2/19/2019. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (mnw) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 50 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark S. Cheffo filed by RITCHIE E. BERGER on behalf of PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA INC, PURDUE PHARMA LP (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1972489.) (BERGER, RITCHIE) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 49 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA INC, PURDUE PHARMA LP. (BERGER, RITCHIE) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by RITCHIE E. BERGER on behalf of PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA INC, PURDUE PHARMA LP (BERGER, RITCHIE) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting without objection #44 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Time is extended for all Defendants to (1) 30 days after this Court rules on any motion to remand that might be filed, or (2) 30 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation issues a final decision as to whether to transfer the case to the Multidistrict Litigation, whichever date is later. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Reset Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due from PURDUE PHARMA LP, PURDUE PHARMA INC, PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC & JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC by 2/8/2019. (mnw) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Reset Deadlines : Pro Hac Vice Certificate due from MARK CHEFFO & CHARLES C. LIFLAND by 2/8/2019. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (mnw) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Filing 44 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by DOUGLAS J JORGENSEN, DO Responses due by 2/20/2019. (STURTEVANT, MAUREEN) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting without objection #42 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Time is extended to (1) 30 days after this Court rules on any motion to remand that might be filed, or (2) 30 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation issues a final decision as to whether to transfer the case to the Multidistrict Litigation, whichever date is later. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Filing 42 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION Responses due by 2/19/2019. (DUNLAP, JOSHUA) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Filing 41 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC. (SCHUTZ, SIGMUND) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Filing 40 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Donna M. Welch, P.C. filed by SIGMUND D. SCHUTZ on behalf of ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1963327.) (SCHUTZ, SIGMUND) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Pro Hac Vice Certificate due from MARK CHEFFO, CHARLES C. LIFLAND, DONNA WELCH, by 1/30/2019. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (slg) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due from PURDUE PHARMA LP, PURDUE PHARMA INC, PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC by 1/30/2019. (slg) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT of Service by WASHINGTON COUNTY. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service-Janssen Pharmaceutica, #2 Affidavit of Service-Ortho-McNeil-Janssen, #3 Affidavit of Service-Rite Aid of Maryland)(BELLEAU, JAMES) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 38 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to AmerisourceBergen, Cardinal, Dr. Cieniawski, Dr. Bruehl, Dr. Jorgensen and McKesson. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance of Service-AmerisourceBergen, #2 Acceptance of Service-Cardinal, #3 Acceptance of Service-Dr. Bruehl and Dr. Cieniawski, #4 Acceptance of Service-Dr. Jorgensen, #5 Acceptance of Service-McKesson)(BELLEAU, JAMES) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WASHINGTON COUNTY. (Attachments: #1 Summons served on Actavis LLC, #2 Summons served on Actavis Pharma, #3 Summons served on Allergan Finance, #4 Summons served on Cephalon, #5 Summons served on CVS, #6 Summons served on Endo Health, #7 Summons served on Endo Pharm, #8 Summons served on Insys, #9 Summons served on Janssen Pharmaceuticals, #10 Summons served on Johnson & Johnson, #11 Summons served on Mallinckrodt, #12 Summons served on Purdue Frederick, #13 Summons served on Purdue Pharma Inc., #14 Summons served on Purdue Pharma LP, #15 Summons served on Rite Aid Corp., #16 Summons served on Rite Aid of Maine, #17 Summons served on Teva, #18 Summons served on Walgreens, #19 Summons served on Walmart, #20 Summons served on Watson Lab)(BELLEAU, JAMES) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 36 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC. (HAWKINS, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 35 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by INSYS THERAPEUTICS INC. (PERRY, KATHARINE) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting without objection #28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Time is extended to (1) 30 days after this Court rules on any motion to remand that might be filed, or (2) 30 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation issues a final decision as to whether to transfer the case to the Multidistrict Litigation, whichever date is later. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 33 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WALMART INC. (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 32 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher Lovrien filed by DANIEL R. MAWHINNEY on behalf of WALMART INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1961477.) (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL) Modified on 1/18/2019 to add name of PHV attorney (slg). [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 31 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Madeleine K. Rodriguez filed by JOSHUA D. HADIARIS on behalf of MICHAEL B BRUEHL, MD, MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1961445.) (HADIARIS, JOSHUA) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David R. Geiger filed by JOSHUA D. HADIARIS on behalf of MICHAEL B BRUEHL, MD, MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1961443.) (HADIARIS, JOSHUA) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 29 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of K. Neil Austin filed by JOSHUA D. HADIARIS on behalf of MICHAEL B BRUEHL, MD, MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1961439.) (HADIARIS, JOSHUA) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by CVS PHARMACY INC, RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID OF MAINE INC, RITE AID OF MARYLAND INC, WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC, WALMART INC Responses due by 2/7/2019. (SANCHEZ, GERALDINE) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of 2 filed by TIMOTHY C. WOODCOCK on behalf of MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC (Attachments: #1 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice - AJ O'Connor)(WOODCOCK, TIMOTHY) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC. (WOODCOCK, TIMOTHY) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #17 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #15 Corporate Disclosure Statement: These docket entries were modified to indicate the documents were filed in the wrong case and are to be refiled in 1:19-cv-00025-NT. (mtm) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC. (CAHOON, JOSEPH) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by MAUREEN M. STURTEVANT on behalf of DOUGLAS J JORGENSEN, DO (STURTEVANT, MAUREEN) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 47 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION re #21 State Court Record. Main Document: Cardinal Health 110 LLC's Assented to Motion to Extend Time. (Attachments: #1 Entry of Appearance Hawkins, #2 Letter from Attorney Hawkins filing Entry of Appearance, Motion and Proposed Order, #3 Unsigned Order on Cardinal Health 110 LLC's Assented to Motion, #4 Moving Defendants' Assented to Motion to Extend Deadline, #5 Entry of Appearance Cahoon, #6 Retail Pharmacy Defendants' Assented to Motion to Extend Deadlines, #7 Bruehl and Cieniawski's Consented to Motion to Extend Deadline, #8 Order Granting AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp's Consent Motion (Copy 2), #9 Order Granting AmerisourceBergen Drug Crop's Consent Motion, #10 Order Granting Cardinal Health 110 LLC's Assented to Motion (Copy 2), #11 Order Granting Cardinal Health 110 LLC's Assented to Motion, #12 Order Granting Moving Defendants' Assented to Motion (Copy 2), #13 Order Granting Moving Defendants' Assented to Motion, #14 Order Granting Bruehl and Cieniawski's Consented to Motion, #15 Order Granting Retail Pharmacy Defendants' Assented to Motion, #16 Service List (Copy 2), #17 Service List, #18 Unisgned Order on Bruehl and Cieniawski's Consented to Motion, #19 Unsigned Order on Moving Defendants' Assented to Motion, #20 Unsigned Order on Retail Pharmacy Defendants' Assented to Motion)(mnw) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 46 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION re #21 State Court Record. Main Document: Docket Record for Washington County Superior Court Case. No. MACSC-CV-2018-00027. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1 to Complaint - Demand Letter to AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp, #3 Exhibit 2 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Actavis LLC, #4 Exhibit 3 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Actavis Pharma Inc, #5 Exhibit 4 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Allergan PLC, #6 Exhibit 5 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Dr. Burehl, #7 Exhibit 6 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Cardinal Health 110 LLC, #8 Exhibit 7 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Cephalon Inc, #9 Exhibit 8 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Dr. Cieniawski, #10 Exhibit 9 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Endo Health Solutions Inc, #11 Exhibit 10 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, #12 Exhibit 11 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Insys Therapeutics Inc, #13 Exhibit 12 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, #14 Exhibit 13 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, #15 Exhibit 14 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Johnson & Johnson, #16 Exhibit 15 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Dr. Jorgensen, #17 Exhibit 16 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, #18 Exhibit 17 to Complaint - Demand Letter to McKesson Corp, #19 Exhibit 18 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, #20 Exhibit 19 to Complaint - Demand Letter to The Purdue Frederick Co, #21 Exhibit 20 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Purdue Pharma Inc, #22 Exhibit 21 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Purdue Pharma LP, #23 Exhibit 22 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, #24 Exhibit 23 to Complaint - Demand Letter to Watson Laboratories Inc, #25 AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp's Consent Motion for Extension of Time, #26 Letter from Attorney Dunlap filing Motion with Proposed Order, #27 Unsigned Order on AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp's Consent Motion, #28 Entry of Appearance Petruccelli)(mnw) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY C. WOODCOCK on behalf of MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC (WOODCOCK, TIMOTHY) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 21 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION. (DUNLAP, JOSHUA) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID OF MAINE INC, RITE AID OF MARYLAND INC. (PETRUCCELLI, GERALD) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD F. PETRUCCELLI on behalf of RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID OF MAINE INC, RITE AID OF MARYLAND INC (PETRUCCELLI, GERALD) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan Zane Watts filed by KAREN FRINK WOLF on behalf of ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1959794.) (WOLF, KAREN) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 17 **FILED IN ERROR**CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brien T. O'Connor and Andrew J. O'Connor filed by TIMOTHY C. WOODCOCK on behalf of MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC (Total admission fee $ 200 receipt number 0100-1959772.) (Attachments: #1 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice - AJ O'Connor)(WOODCOCK, TIMOTHY) Modified on 1/17/2019 to indicate filed in wrong case (mtm). [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA INC, CEPHALON INC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC, WATSON LABORATORIES INC. (GOLDMAN, JEFF) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 15 **FILED IN ERROR**CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC. (WOODCOCK, TIMOTHY) Modified on 1/17/2019 to indicate filed in wrong case (mtm). [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 15, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline per Order #14: Answer due by 3/4/2019 from PURDUE PHARMA LP, PURDUE PHARMA INC, PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC, CEPHALON INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC, ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC, WATSON LABORATORIES INC, ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA INC, ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC, INSYS THERAPEUTICS INC, MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC, AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, CVS PHARMACY INC, WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC, WALMART INC, RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID OF MARYLAND INC, RITE AID OF MAINE INC, DOUGLAS J JORGENSEN, DO, MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD, and MICHAEL B BRUEHL, MD. (slg) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 11 Motion to Extend Time to File Answer. Time is extended to March 4, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 15, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA D. HADIARIS & MARK G. LAVOIE on behalf of MICHAEL B BRUEHL, MD, MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD (HADIARIS, JOSHUA) Modified on 1/16/2019 to add text to reflect that the appearance is also on behalf of Mark G. Lavoie (mnw). [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 15, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WASHINGTON COUNTY. (BELLEAU, JAMES) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 15, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (WOLF, KAREN) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM R. LEE on behalf of All Plaintiffs (LEE, ADAM) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MCKESSON CORPORATION. (HANLON, MELISSA) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CVS PHARMACY INC. (SANCHEZ, GERALDINE) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Conor B. O'Croinin filed by GERALDINE G. SANCHEZ on behalf of CVS PHARMACY INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1958420.) (SANCHEZ, GERALDINE) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 1/18/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Stacey Graf. (slg) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk's Office to MDL Panel. (slg) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Set Deadlines: Pro Hac Vice Certificate due from MARK CHEFFO, CHARLES C. LIFLAND, DONNA WELCH, CONOR B. O'CROININ by 1/18/2019. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (slg) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Set Deadlines: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement from PURDUE PHARMA LP, PURDUE PHARMA INC, PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC, CEPHALON INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC, ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC, WATSON LABORATORIES INC, ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA INC, ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC, INSYS THERAPEUTICS INC, MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC, CVS PHARMACY INC, WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC, WALMART INC, RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID OF MARYLAND INC, RITE AID OF MAINE INC due by 1/18/2019. (slg) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1957074.), filed by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION.(DUNLAP, JOSHUA) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION to Extend Time for all defendants to File Answer until March 4, 2019 filed by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION. No pdf document attached. See ECF #1. (slg) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION. (sfw) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (sfw) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Pleadings Complaint from Washington County Superior Court, case number CV-18-27. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION. (Service of Process Deadline 4/10/2019) Fee due by 1/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua Dunlap, #2 Exhibit A to Dunlap Declaration - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit 1 to Complaint Demand Letter to Americsource Bergen Drug Corporation, #4 Exhibit 2 to Complaint Demand Letter to Actavis LLC, #5 Exhbit 3 to Complaint Demand Letter to Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., #6 Exhibit 4 to Complaint-Demand letter to Allergan plc f/k/a Actavis plc, #7 Exhibit 5 to Complaint - Demand letter to Dr. Bruehl, #8 Exhibit 6 to Complaint - Demand letter to Cardinal Health 110, LLC, #9 Exhibit 7 to Complaint - Demand letter to Cephalon, Inc., #10 Exhibit 8 to Complaint - Demand letter to Dr. Cieniawski, #11 Exhibit 9 to Complaint - Demand letter to Endo Health Solutions Inc., #12 Exhibit 10 to Complaint - Demand letter Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #13 Exhibit 11 to Complaint - Demand letter to Insys Therapeutics, Inc., #14 Exhibit 12 to Complaint - Demand letter to Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., #15 Exhibit 13 to Complaint - Demand letter to Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #16 Exhibit 14 to Complaint - Demand letter to Johnson & Johnson, #17 Exhibit 15 to Complaint - Demand letter to Dr. Jorgensen, #18 Exhibit 16 to Complaint - Demand letter to Mallinckrodt Enterprises, LLC, #19 Exhibit 17 to Complaint - Demand letter to Mckesson Corporation, #20 Exhibit 18 to Complaint - Demand letter to Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #21 Exhibit 19 to Complaint - Demand letter to The Purdue Frederick Company, #22 Exhibit 20 to Complaint - Demand letter to Purdue Pharma Inc., #23 Exhibit 21 to Complaint - Demand letter to Purdue Pharma L.P., #24 Exhibit 22 to Complaint - Demand letter to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., #25 Exhibit 23 to Complaint - Demand letter to Watson Laboratories, Inc.)(sfw) [Transferred from med on 3/27/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington County v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Represented By: Joseph L. Cahoon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: James M. Campbell
Represented By: Michelle I. Schaffer
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Represented By: Ritchie E. Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas J. Jorgensen
Represented By: Maureen M. Sturtevant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Melissa M. Hanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics Inc.
Represented By: Katharine S. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Represented By: Sigmund D. Schutz
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark E. Cieniawski
Represented By: Madeleine K. Rodriguez
Represented By: David R. Geiger
Represented By: Mark G. Lavoie
Represented By: K. Neil Austin
Represented By: Joshua D. Hadiaris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: Jeff Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maine, Inc.
Represented By: Gerald F. Petruccelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Jeff Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael B. Bruehl
Represented By: Madeleine K. Rodriguez
Represented By: David R. Geiger
Represented By: Mark G. Lavoie
Represented By: K. Neil Austin
Represented By: Joshua D. Hadiaris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: James M. Campbell
Represented By: Michelle I. Schaffer
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Jeff Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Represented By: Gerald F. Petruccelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Represented By: Ritchie E. Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Jeff Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Represented By: Gerald F. Petruccelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Joseph L. Cahoon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Represented By: Ritchie E. Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Represented By: Jeff Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Karen Frink Wolf
Represented By: Ryan Zane Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 110, LLC
Represented By: Christopher D. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Lovrien
Represented By: Daniel R. Mawhinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: James M. Campbell
Represented By: Michelle I. Schaffer
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Joshua D. Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Timothy C. Woodcock
Represented By: Andrew J. O'Connor
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Represented By: Conor B. O'Croinin
Represented By: Geraldine G. Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: James M. Campbell
Represented By: Michelle I. Schaffer
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Karen Frink Wolf
Represented By: Ryan Zane Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Washington County
Represented By: Adam R. Lee
Represented By: James E. Belleau
Represented By: Joseph L. Ciaccio
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?