County of Blanco v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al

Plaintiff: County of Blanco
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Pharmaceutical Research Associates, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. and Purdue Pharma Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019op45237
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 19 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Texas Southern. Case number 4:18-cv-04705. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 3, 2019 Interdistrict transfer to Northern District of Ohio. Case transferred electronically. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 4/12/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 18 JPML TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to Northern District of Ohio to be included in MDL Docket No. 2804. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 4/12/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Joint MOTION for Continuance of Deadlines. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(gclair, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 4/12/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #13 MOTION for Reconsideration of #12 Order on Motion to Remand filed by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.. (Reed, Noelle) [Transferred from txsd on 4/12/2019.]
March 6, 2019 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER re: #13 MOTION for Reconsideration of #12 Order on Motion to Remand, filed.(Greenstone, David) [Transferred from txsd on 4/12/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Continuance of Deadlines by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Reed, Noelle) [Transferred from txsd on 4/12/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Reconsideration of #12 Order on Motion to Remand by County of Blanco, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/25/2019. (Greenstone, David) [Transferred from txsd on 4/12/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #4 Motion to Remand.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 4/12/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER re: #4 MOTION to Remand, filed.(Greenstone, David) [Transferred from txsd on 4/12/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition to #4 MOTION to Remand, filed by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Reed, Noelle) [Transferred from txsd on 4/12/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., filed.(Ellis, John) [Transferred from txsd on 4/12/2019.]
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 4/12/2019.]
December 31, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., filed.(Reed, Noelle) [Transferred from txsd on 4/12/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., filed.(Sibiski, Hannah) [Transferred from txsd on 4/12/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reed, Noelle) [Transferred from txsd on 4/12/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand by County of Blanco, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Continuation Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit A - POS for Purdue in Blanco and Jasper counties, #3 Exhibit B - POS for Purdue in Angelina county, #4 Exhibit C - Remand Orders, #5 Exhibit D - Homestead exemption, #6 Exhibit E - Warranty Deed, #7 Exhibit F - Yarger Homestead exemption, #8 Exhibit G - Grayson county petition, #9 Exhibit H - Nueces county petition, #10 Exhibit I - El Paso county petition)(Greenstone, David) [Transferred from txsd on 4/12/2019.]
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/15/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 4/12/2019.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc. identifying Pharmaceutical Research Associates, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Reed, Noelle) [Transferred from txsd on 4/12/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 152nd Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2018-87885 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21467958) filed by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reed, Noelle) [Transferred from txsd on 4/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Blanco v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: Asher Benjamin Griffin
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: John William Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmaceutical Research Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Asher Benjamin Griffin
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: John William Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Hannah DeMarco Sibiski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Noelle M. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Hannah DeMarco Sibiski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Asher Benjamin Griffin
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: John William Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Asher Benjamin Griffin
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: John William Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: Noelle M. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Noelle M. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Blanco
Represented By: John F. Walker
Represented By: David C. Greenstone
Represented By: Deborah F Earley
Represented By: Amy M. Carter
Represented By: Reid W. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?