County of Newton v. Endo Health Solutions Inc. et al

Plaintiff: County of Newton
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo International plc, Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. and Purdue Pharma Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019op45242
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 13 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Texas Southern. Case number 4:19-cv-00117. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 3, 2019 Interdistrict transfer to Northern District of Ohio. Case transferred electronically. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 12 JPML TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to Northern District of Ohio to be included in MDL Docket No. 2804. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #5 Motion to Remand.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY re: #5 MOTION to Remand by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sibiski, Hannah) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY in Support of #5 MOTION to Remand, filed by County of Newton. (Greenstone, David) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for All Defendants.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition to #5 MOTION to Remand, filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10)(Sibiski, Hannah) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., filed.(Reed, Noelle) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by County of Newton, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit A - County of Hardin Service, #3 Exhibit County of Newton Service, #4 Exhibit C - Remand Orders, #5 Exhibit D - Homestead exemption, #6 Exhibit E - Warranty Deed, #7 Exhibit F - Yarger Homestead exemption, #8 Exhibit G - Grayson county petition, #9 Exhibit H - Nueces county petition, #10 Exhibit I - El Paso county petition, #11 Exhibit J - Bellwether Orders, #12 Exhibit K - Order Regarding Remands, #13 Proposed Order)(Carter, Amy) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to the Complaint by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Sibiski, Hannah) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/13/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. identifying Endo International plc as Corporate Parent, filed.(Sibiski, Hannah) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 152nd Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2019-01047 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21634274) filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sibiski, Hannah) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Newton v. Endo Health Solutions Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: John William Ellis
Represented By: Asher Benjamin Griffin
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: John William Ellis
Represented By: Asher Benjamin Griffin
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Hannah DeMarco Sibiski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Noelle M. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: John William Ellis
Represented By: Asher Benjamin Griffin
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: John William Ellis
Represented By: Asher Benjamin Griffin
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Hannah DeMarco Sibiski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo International plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: Noelle M. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Noelle M. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Newton
Represented By: David C. Greenstone
Represented By: Amy M. Carter
Represented By: Paul Dunford Henderson
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Simon
Represented By: David Dies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?