Local 150 International Union of Operating Engineers, et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Chicago Regional Council of Carpenters, Midwest Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150 and Chicago Regional Council of Carpenters Welfare Fund
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Joseph Giacchino, American Geriatric Society, Watson Laboratories Inc., Actavis plc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Allergan PLC, Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, American Pain Society, Inc., Endo International plc, Paul Madison, Noramco Inc, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., American Academy of Pain Medicine, Inc. and Purdue Pharma Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019op45414
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Filing 28 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Illinois Northern. Case number 1:19-cv-00811. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 7, 2019 Filing 27 TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of Ohio the Electronic record. (jh, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/10/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 26 TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to The Northern District of Ohio. Mailed notice (jh, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/10/2019.]
June 6, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (jh, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/10/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing is set for 7/9/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/10/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 24 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 2/21/19 before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Order Number: 33781. Court Reporter Contact Information: TRACEY D. McCULLOUGH, 312-435-5570, tracey_mccullough@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/30/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/10/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/8/2019. (Mccullough, Tracey) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/10/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFIED copy of order dated 3/14/2019 from the 7th Circuit; Appellate case no. : 19-1359; IT IS ORDERED that the petitioners motion for leave to file a reply is granted to the extent that the panel considered the reply. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the petition for writ of mandamus is DENIED. (kp, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/10/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Filing 22 ORIGINAL PROCEEDING CIRCUIT Rule 3(b) Notice (sxb, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/10/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Filing 21 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal ; USCA Case No. 19-1359. (sxb, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/10/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 2/21/2019. Defendant McKesson Corporation's motion to stay proceedings pending possible transfer to multidistrict litigation #15 is granted. Plaintiffs presented their motion to remand to the Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois #12 , which the Court stays pending resolution of the possible transfer to multidistrict litigation. Defendants McKesson Corporation and AmerisourceBergen Corporation's unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint #18 is granted. Defendants McKesson Corporation and AmerisourceBergen Corporation must answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' complaint within 30 days of the later of either (1) this action's remand to state court or (2) the entry of a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation granting a motion to vacate the conditional transfer order covering this action or finally denying transfer of this action to the multidistrict litigation. Mailed notice. (ym, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/10/2019.]
February 20, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel L. Stanner for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #18 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 2/26/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Stanner, Daniel) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/10/2019.]
February 20, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION by Defendant McKesson Corporation for extension of time to file answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' complaint (Stanner, Daniel) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/10/2019.]
February 20, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE by Chicago Regional Council of Carpenters, Chicago Regional Council of Carpenters Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, Midwest Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fundin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant McKesson Corporation to stay proceedings pending likely transfer to MDL #15 (Richman, Benjamin) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/10/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel L. Stanner for presentment of motion to stay, #15 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 2/21/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Stanner, Daniel) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/10/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION by Defendant McKesson Corporation to stay proceedings pending likely transfer to MDL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Stanner, Daniel) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/10/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Benjamin Harris Richman for presentment of motion to remand, #12 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 2/21/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Richman, Benjamin) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/10/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM by Chicago Regional Council of Carpenters, Chicago Regional Council of Carpenters Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, Midwest Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund in support of motion to remand, #12 (Richman, Benjamin) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/10/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Plaintiffs Chicago Regional Council of Carpenters, Chicago Regional Council of Carpenters Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, Midwest Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund to remand to the Circuit Court of Cook County, IL (Richman, Benjamin) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/10/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Chicago Regional Council of Carpenters, Chicago Regional Council of Carpenters Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, Midwest Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund by Rafey S. Balabanian (Balabanian, Rafey) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/10/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Chicago Regional Council of Carpenters, Chicago Regional Council of Carpenters Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, Midwest Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund by Jay Edelson (Edelson, Jay) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/10/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Chicago Regional Council of Carpenters, Chicago Regional Council of Carpenters Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, Midwest Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund by Benjamin Harris Richman (Richman, Benjamin) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/10/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Chicago Regional Council of Carpenters, Chicago Regional Council of Carpenters Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, Midwest Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund by Ari Jonathan Scharg (Scharg, Ari) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/10/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ek, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/10/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (ek, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/10/2019.]
February 8, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/10/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant McKesson Corporation by Kyle Alexander Cooper (Cooper, Kyle) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/10/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McKesson Corporation (Stanner, Daniel) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/10/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant McKesson Corporation by Daniel L. Stanner (Stanner, Daniel) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/10/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stanner, Daniel) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/10/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2019 CH 01548) filed by McKesson Corporation Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15463424. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stanner, Daniel) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/10/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Local 150 International Union of Operating Engineers, et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Giacchino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Geriatric Society
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Daniel L. Stanner
Represented By: Kyle Alexander Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Pain Society, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo International plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Academy of Pain Medicine, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chicago Regional Council of Carpenters
Represented By: Rafey S. Balabanian
Represented By: Jay Edelson
Represented By: Ari Jonathan Scharg
Represented By: Benjamin H. Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midwest Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Rafey S. Balabanian
Represented By: Jay Edelson
Represented By: Ari Jonathan Scharg
Represented By: Benjamin H. Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150
Represented By: Rafey S. Balabanian
Represented By: Jay Edelson
Represented By: Ari Jonathan Scharg
Represented By: Benjamin H. Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chicago Regional Council of Carpenters Welfare Fund
Represented By: Rafey S. Balabanian
Represented By: Jay Edelson
Represented By: Ari Jonathan Scharg
Represented By: Benjamin H. Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?