C M G H Minden L L C v. Purdue Pharma L P et al
Plaintiff: C M G H Minden L L C
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Richard S. Sackler, Rhodes Pharma, Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Beverly Sackler, Mallinckrodt PLC, Rhodes Pharmaceutical, L.P., Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Theresa Sackler, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., David A. Sackler, Actavis LLC, Rhodes Technologies, P F Laboratories Inc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Coropration, Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis PLC, Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Ilene Sackler, Rhodes Technologies Inc., Raymond Sackler Family Members Benefit Trust, Cardinal Health Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mortimer D. A. Sackler, McKesson Corp., Kathe A. Sackler, Rhodes Pharma Inc, Noramco Inc, Jonathan D. Sackler, Actavis Inc, Purdue Frederick Co Inc, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. and Purdue Pharma Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019op45593
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 20 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by C M G H Minden L L C. Noramco Inc waiver sent on 8/8/2019, answer due 10/7/2019 filed on behalf of C M G H Minden L L C (Stein, Mark)
September 6, 2019 Filing 19 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by C M G H Minden L L C. Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 9/5/2019, answer due 11/4/2019 filed on behalf of C M G H Minden L L C (Stein, Mark)
August 29, 2019 Filing 18 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by C M G H Minden L L C. Cardinal Health Inc. waiver sent on 8/27/2019, answer due 10/28/2019 filed on behalf of C M G H Minden L L C (Stein, Mark)
August 23, 2019 Filing 17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by C M G H Minden L L C. Cephalon Inc. waiver sent on 8/8/2019, answer due 10/7/2019 filed on behalf of C M G H Minden L L C (Stein, Mark)
August 23, 2019 Filing 16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by C M G H Minden L L C. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 8/8/2019, answer due 10/7/2019 filed on behalf of C M G H Minden L L C (Stein, Mark)
August 23, 2019 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by C M G H Minden L L C. Actavis Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 8/8/2019, answer due 10/7/2019 filed on behalf of C M G H Minden L L C (Stein, Mark)
August 23, 2019 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by C M G H Minden L L C. Watson Laboratories Inc. waiver sent on 8/8/2019, answer due 10/7/2019 filed on behalf of C M G H Minden L L C (Stein, Mark)
August 23, 2019 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by C M G H Minden L L C. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 8/8/2019, answer due 10/7/2019 filed on behalf of C M G H Minden L L C (Stein, Mark)
August 16, 2019 Filing 12 Stipulated Proposed Stipulation Waiver of Service filed by C M G H Minden L L C. (Stein, Mark)
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by C M G H Minden L L C. Rhodes Pharma Inc waiver sent on 8/12/2019, answer due 10/11/2019 filed on behalf of C M G H Minden L L C (Stein, Mark)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by C M G H Minden L L C. Rhodes Pharmaceutical, L.P. waiver sent on 8/9/2019, answer due 10/8/2019 filed on behalf of C M G H Minden L L C (Stein, Mark)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by C M G H Minden L L C. Rhodes Technologies Inc. waiver sent on 8/9/2019, answer due 10/8/2019 filed on behalf of C M G H Minden L L C (Stein, Mark)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by C M G H Minden L L C. Rhodes Technologies waiver sent on 8/9/2019, answer due 10/8/2019 filed on behalf of C M G H Minden L L C (Stein, Mark)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Louisiana Western. Case number 5:19-cv-00750. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR MULTI-DISTRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER CTO # 99, directing transfer to Northern District of Ohio, In Re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation, MDL # 2804. Record electronically transmitted to receiving court. Case Terminated. All future pleadings should be filed with the newly assigned court. (crt,Whidden, C) [Transferred from lawd on 7/9/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE received via email from Clerk of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transmitting Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-99) in MDL No.2804, IN RE: National Prescription Opiate Litigation advising case shall be transferred to the Northern District of Ohio upon request of the record. (crt,Whidden, C) [Transferred from lawd on 7/9/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C M G H Minden L L C. (aty,Stein, Mark) [Transferred from lawd on 7/9/2019.]
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint sent to Michael R Allweiss on behalf of C M G H Minden L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/2/2019. (crt,Putch, A) [Transferred from lawd on 7/9/2019.]
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Actavis Inc, Actavis L L C, Actavis P L C, Actavis Pharma Inc, Allergan P L C, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt L L C, Mallinckrodt P L C, McKesson Corp, Noramco Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, P F Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc, Purdue Frederick Co Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L P, Raymond Sackler Family Members Benefit Trust, Rhodes Pharma, Rhodes Pharma Inc, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L P, Rhodes Technologies, Rhodes Technologies Inc, Beverly Sackler, David A Sackler, Ilene Sackler, Jonathan D Sackler, Kathe A Sackler, Mortimer D A Sackler, Richard S Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Teva Pharmaceuticals U S A Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc (crt,Putch, A) [Transferred from lawd on 7/9/2019.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Purdue Pharma L P, Purdue Frederick Co Inc, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Teva Pharmaceuticals U S A Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Noramco Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Allergan P L C, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Actavis L L C, Actavis Pharma Inc, Mallinckrodt P L C, Mallinckrodt L L C, McKesson Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp, Richard S Sackler, Kathe A Sackler, Jonathan D Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Mortimer D A Sackler, Ilene Sackler, Beverly Sackler, David A Sackler, Rhodes Pharma, Rhodes Technologies, Rhodes Technologies Inc, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L P, Rhodes Pharma Inc, Raymond Sackler Family Members Benefit Trust, P F Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Actavis Inc and Actavis P L C with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3972186) filed by C M G H Minden L L C. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Michael R Allweiss added to party C M G H Minden L L C)(aty,Allweiss, Michael) Modified on 6/13/2019 to edit text (Putch, A). [Transferred from lawd on 7/9/2019.]
June 13, 2019 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Putch, A) [Transferred from lawd on 7/9/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C M G H Minden L L C v. Purdue Pharma L P et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceutical, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P F Laboratories Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Coropration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Sackler Family Members Benefit Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D. A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C M G H Minden L L C
Represented By: Lucien H. Marioneaux, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Richard Allweiss
Represented By: Glenn B. Adams
Represented By: Ralph R. Alexis, III
Represented By: Craig L. Williams
Represented By: Mark S. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?