Moapa Band of Paiute Indians v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Moapa Band of Paiute Indians
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Noramco Inc, Actavis Inc, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Purdue Pharma Inc., Indivior, Inc., CVS, Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Wal-Mart, Meadow Valley Pharmacy, Walgreen Company, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. and SpecGX LLC
Case Number: 1:2019op45650
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 43 Attorney Appearance by Sara E. Silva filed by on behalf of Indivior, Inc.. (Silva, Sara)
August 26, 2019 Filing 42 Attorney Appearance by Maria R. Durant filed by on behalf of Indivior, Inc.. (Durant, Maria)
August 26, 2019 Filing 41 Attorney Appearance by Safa W. Osmani filed by on behalf of Indivior, Inc.. (Osmani, Safa)
August 21, 2019 Filing 40 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon CVS, Indivior, Inc., Meadow Valley Pharmacy, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc, SpecGX LLC, Wal-Mart, Walgreen Company, West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. (P,R)
August 13, 2019 Filing 39 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Moapa Band of Paiute Indians. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Flaherty, Yvonne)
August 12, 2019 Filing 38 Amended complaint Short Form Complaint against Actavis Pharma, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc., McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., CVS, Indivior, Inc., Meadow Valley Pharmacy, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc, SpecGX LLC, Walgreen Company, Wal-Mart, West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. and adding new party defendant(s) CVS; Indivior, Inc.; Meadow Valley Pharmacy; Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Par Pharmaceuticals; SpecGX LLC; Walgreen Company; Wal-Mart; West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.. Filed by Moapa Band of Paiute Indians. (Flaherty, Yvonne)
July 22, 2019 Filing 37 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Nevada. Case number 2:19-cv-01059. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 10, 2019 Filing 36 TRANSMITTAL of case to the Northern District of Ohio. Case and docket sheet transferred electronically. (no image attached) (SLD) [Transferred from nvd on 7/22/2019.]
July 10, 2019 Filing 35 Certified MDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-101) transferring case to the Northern District of Ohio. Signed by MDL. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) [Transferred from nvd on 7/22/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 34 MDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-101) transferring case to the Northern District of Ohio. Signed by MDL on 7/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) [Transferred from nvd on 7/22/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 33 Text only MDL Minute Order re CTO-101 transferring case to the Northern District of Ohio. (SLD) [Transferred from nvd on 7/22/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 32 Summons Issued as to Actavis Pharma, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Watson Laboratories, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (SLD) [Transferred from nvd on 7/22/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 31 Summons Issued as to Actavis, LLC, Allergan PLC, Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (SLD) [Transferred from nvd on 7/22/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 30 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation by Plaintiff Moapa Band of Paiute Indians. (DiRaimondo, Anthony) [Transferred from nvd on 7/22/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 29 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Cardinal Health, Inc. by Plaintiff Moapa Band of Paiute Indians. (DiRaimondo, Anthony) [Transferred from nvd on 7/22/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 28 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued McKesson Corporation by Plaintiff Moapa Band of Paiute Indians. (DiRaimondo, Anthony) [Transferred from nvd on 7/22/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 27 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Mallinckrodt LLC by Plaintiff Moapa Band of Paiute Indians. (DiRaimondo, Anthony) [Transferred from nvd on 7/22/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 26 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Mallinckrodt plc by Plaintiff Moapa Band of Paiute Indians. (DiRaimondo, Anthony) [Transferred from nvd on 7/22/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 25 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Watson Laboratories, Inc. by Plaintiff Moapa Band of Paiute Indians. (DiRaimondo, Anthony) [Transferred from nvd on 7/22/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 24 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Actavis Pharma, Inc. fda Watson Pharma, Inc. by Plaintiff Moapa Band of Paiute Indians. (DiRaimondo, Anthony) [Transferred from nvd on 7/22/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 23 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Actavis, LLC by Plaintiff Moapa Band of Paiute Indians. (DiRaimondo, Anthony) [Transferred from nvd on 7/22/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 22 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. by Plaintiff Moapa Band of Paiute Indians. (DiRaimondo, Anthony) [Transferred from nvd on 7/22/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 21 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. nka Actavis, Inc. by Plaintiff Moapa Band of Paiute Indians. (DiRaimondo, Anthony) [Transferred from nvd on 7/22/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 20 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Allergan PLC fka Actavis PLS by Plaintiff Moapa Band of Paiute Indians. (DiRaimondo, Anthony) [Transferred from nvd on 7/22/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 19 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Plaintiff Moapa Band of Paiute Indians. (DiRaimondo, Anthony) [Transferred from nvd on 7/22/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 18 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Noramco, Inc. by Plaintiff Moapa Band of Paiute Indians. (DiRaimondo, Anthony) [Transferred from nvd on 7/22/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 17 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Endo Health Solutions Inc. by Plaintiff Moapa Band of Paiute Indians. (DiRaimondo, Anthony) [Transferred from nvd on 7/22/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 16 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Plaintiff Moapa Band of Paiute Indians. (DiRaimondo, Anthony) [Transferred from nvd on 7/22/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Ortho McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Plaintiff Moapa Band of Paiute Indians. (DiRaimondo, Anthony) [Transferred from nvd on 7/22/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 14 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Johnson & Johnson by Plaintiff Moapa Band of Paiute Indians. (DiRaimondo, Anthony) [Transferred from nvd on 7/22/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc. by Plaintiff Moapa Band of Paiute Indians. (DiRaimondo, Anthony) [Transferred from nvd on 7/22/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Cephalon, Inc. by Plaintiff Moapa Band of Paiute Indians. (DiRaimondo, Anthony) [Transferred from nvd on 7/22/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD. by Plaintiff Moapa Band of Paiute Indians. (DiRaimondo, Anthony) [Transferred from nvd on 7/22/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., and The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (SLD) [Transferred from nvd on 7/22/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #5 Proposed Summons to be issued by Plaintiff Moapa Band of Paiute Indians. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (DiRaimondo, Anthony) [Transferred from nvd on 7/22/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #4 Proposed Summons to be issued by Plaintiff Moapa Band of Paiute Indians. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (DiRaimondo, Anthony) [Transferred from nvd on 7/22/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #3 Proposed Summons to be issued by Plaintiff Moapa Band of Paiute Indians. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (DiRaimondo, Anthony) [Transferred from nvd on 7/22/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #3 , #4 , #5 Proposed Summonses. ERROR: Incorrect form used. Counsel is advised to download the approved summons form from the www.nvd.uscourts.gov and refile as a Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #4 , #3 , #5 . (no image attached) (EDS) [Transferred from nvd on 7/22/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 View Corrected Image #9 as to PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Moapa Band of Paiute Indians. (DiRaimondo, Anthony) [Transferred from nvd on 7/22/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 View Corrected Image #8 as to PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Moapa Band of Paiute Indians. (DiRaimondo, Anthony) [Transferred from nvd on 7/22/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 View Corrected Image #7 as to PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Moapa Band of Paiute Indians. (DiRaimondo, Anthony) [Transferred from nvd on 7/22/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel David W. Asp, Richard A. Lockridge, Yvonne M. Flaherty to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 8/5/2019. (no image attached) (SLD) [Transferred from nvd on 7/22/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (SLD) [Transferred from nvd on 7/22/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., an Israeli corporation, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Actavis, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5596285) by Moapa Band of Paiute Indians. Proof of service due by 9/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(DiRaimondo, Anthony) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. [Transferred from nvd on 7/22/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moapa Band of Paiute Indians v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior, Inc.
Represented By: Maria R. Durant
Represented By: Safa W. Osmani
Represented By: Sara E. Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meadow Valley Pharmacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moapa Band of Paiute Indians
Represented By: Yvonne M. Flaherty
Represented By: David W Asp
Represented By: Anthony J. DiRaimondo
Represented By: David A. Carroll
Represented By: Richard A. Lockridge
Represented By: Robert Edward Opdyke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?