Fauquier County, Virginia v. Mallinckrodt LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Fauquier County Virginia
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Barr Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Insys Therapeutics Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Insource, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Impax Laboratories, LLC, Cardinal Health Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, AbbVie Inc., KVK-Tech Inc, Cephalon Inc., Caremark Rx, L.L.C., CVS TN Distribution Center, LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Par Pharmaceutical Inc., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Allergan Finance LLC, Optum, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Purdue Pharma L P, Mallinckrodt PLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Does 1-100, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Henry Schein Inc., Caremark LLC, SpecGX LLC, Walgreen Co., Express Scripts, Inc., McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P. and General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019op45686
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2019 Filing 47 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by KVK-Tech Inc. (Rice, Thomas)
August 24, 2019 Filing 46 Attorney Appearance by Thomas E. Rice, Jr filed by on behalf of KVK-Tech Inc. (Rice, Thomas)
August 2, 2019 Filing 45 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Virginia Eastern. Case number 1:19-cv-00364. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 1, 2019 Filing 44 Certified Copy of Transfer Order Entered by The Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (aott) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #41 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Tallent Rogers terminated. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 7/31/2019. (lcre, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 42 Waiver of re #41 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Memorandum in Support Notice of Waiver of Hearing by Fauquier County Virginia (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Memorandum in Support by Fauquier County Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. Hedblom Withdrawal of Counsel (Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Munro Scott on behalf of Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Fauquier County Virginia. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Pro hac vice Brian Boone. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 4/18/2019. (lcre, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Pro hac vice of William Jordan. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 4/18/2019. (lcre, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Pro hac vice of Kimberly Chemerinsky. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 4/18/2019+. (lcre, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Cases)(Miller, Sarah) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 17, 2019 ***Motion Hearing terminated (lcre, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDERED that this action is stayed until the MDL Panel has had an opportunity to resolve the objection to transfer. The hearing scheduled for Wednesday, April 24, 2019 be and is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 4/17/2019. (lcre, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 32 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by William Jordan and Certification of Local Counsel Turner Broughton by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 31 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kimberly Chemerinsky and Certification of Local Counsel Turner Broughton by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 30 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Boone and Certification of Local Counsel Turner Broughton by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Notice of Correction: The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument re #28 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Incorporated Memorandum of Law (lcre, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 29 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Boone and Certification of Local Counsel Turner Broughton Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6595214. by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Fauquier County Virginia. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 27 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kimberly Chemerinsky and Certification of Local Counsel Turner Broughton Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6593782. by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 26 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by William Jordan and Certification of Local Counsel Turner Broughton Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6593775. by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Johan Conrod, Jr on behalf of Fauquier County Virginia (Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Cook Hedblom on behalf of Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by William Edgar Spivey on behalf of Fauquier County Virginia (Spivey, William) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Pro hac vice of Conor Brendan O'Croinin. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 4/11/2019. (lcre, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OptumRX, Inc.. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Optum, Inc.. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand filed by Fauquier County Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Turner A. Broughton on behalf of Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 16 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Conor Brendan O'Croinin and Certification of Local Counsel Shannan M. Fitzgerald Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6583699. by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., Caremark RX L.L.C., Caremark, L.L. C, CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.. (Fitzgerald, Shannan) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Miller, Sarah) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand filed by Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Miller, Sarah) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #11 Supplemental MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #10 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (lcre, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #12 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand is GRANTED. Oral argument on plaintiffs Motion and Supplemental Motion toRemand be and is SCHEDULED for Wednesday, April 24, 2019 at 10:00 AM. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 4/4/2019. (lcre, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand by Fauquier County Virginia. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 11 Supplemental MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Fauquier County Virginia. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Fauquier County Virginia. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 9 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C.. (Fitzgerald, Shannan) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 8 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Fitzgerald, Shannan) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 7 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.. (Fitzgerald, Shannan) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 6 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Caremark RX L.L.C.. (Fitzgerald, Shannan) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 5 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Caremark, L.L. C. (Fitzgerald, Shannan) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., Caremark RX L.L.C., Caremark, L.L. C, CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C. Supplemental Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Fitzgerald, Shannan) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannan Marie Fitzgerald on behalf of CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., Caremark RX L.L.C., Caremark, L.L. C, CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C. (Fitzgerald, Shannan) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (lcre, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Removal Amended Notice of Removal, filed by Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 - State Court Filings, #2 Exhibit A-2 - State Court Filings, #3 Exhibit A-3 - State Court Filings, #4 Exhibit A-4 - State Court Filings, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miller, Sarah) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Notice of Correction: Attorney has been notified to clarify parties in this action. Plaintiff listed does not match party name in Notice of Removal or in Case Caption re #1 Notice of Removal, (lcre, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6566964.), filed by Mallinckrodt LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 State Court Filings, #2 Exhibit A-2 State Court Filings, #3 Exhibit A-3 State Court Filings, #4 Exhibit A-4 State Court Filings, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miller, Sarah) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fauquier County, Virginia v. Mallinckrodt LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Holding Company
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Represented By: Jacqueline Cook Hedblom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Sarah Byer Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barr Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insource, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRX, Inc.
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AbbVie Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVK-Tech Inc
Represented By: Thomas E. Rice, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark Rx, L.L.C.
Represented By: Shannon Marie Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS TN Distribution Center, LLC
Represented By: Shannon Marie Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.
Represented By: Shannon Marie Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L P
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark LLC
Represented By: Shannon Marie Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Represented By: Sarah Byer Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Represented By: Jacqueline Cook Hedblom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Represented By: Shannon Marie Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fauquier County Virginia
Represented By: William Edgar Spivey
Represented By: Richard Johan Conrod, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin John Burke
Represented By: Lauren Tallent Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?