City of Salem, Virginia v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al

Plaintiff: City of Salem, Virginia
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Purdue Pharma L.P., Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Barr Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Insys Therapeutics Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc., Insource, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Cardinal Health Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Express Scripts Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, AbbVie Inc., KVK-Tech Inc, Caremark, L.L.C., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., CVS TN Distribution Center, LLC, Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Allergan Finance LLC, Optum, Inc., Caremark Rx, L.L.C., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Does 1-100, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Par Pharmaceutical Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Henry Schein Inc., Impax Laboratories, Inc., SpecGX LLC, Walgreen Co., McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P. and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Case Number: 1:2019op45697
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 37 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Virginia Western. Case number 7:19-cv-00273. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 1, 2019 Filing 36 Notice of MDL Transfer Order from District of Northern Ohio; MDL No. 2804. (aab) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Tallent Rogers terminated. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 08/01/2019. (aab) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Memorandum in Support by City of Salem, Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. Hedblom Withdrawal of Counsel (Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Munro Scott on behalf of Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Stay Case and denying as moot #6 Motion to Expedite. This case is STAYED temporarily pending a decision by the JPML as to whether the case will be transferred to the Opiate MDL. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 5/16/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE by City of Salem, Virginia re #5 , #4 Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Stay . filed by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated re #18 , #19 of Supplemental Authorities (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Stay . filed by City of Salem, Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 Supplemental MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by City of Salem, Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by City of Salem, Virginia. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORAL ORDER granting #17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Brian David Boone for Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc. and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated added. Entered by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 4/19/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORAL ORDER granting #16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vic. Attorney Kimberly Kisabeth Chemerinsky for Optum, Inc.,OptumRx, Inc. and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated added. Entered by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 4/19/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORAL ORDER granting #15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney William Herman Jordan for Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc. and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated added. Entered by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 4/19/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 21 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #5 Supplemental MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Cases)(Miller, Sarah) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 19 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #18 MOTION to Stay . filed by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit A, #17 Text of Proposed Order)(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Stay by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Brian Boone to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3122739. by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Kimberly Chemerinsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3122083. by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for William Jordan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3122081. by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Cook Hedblom on behalf of Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 13 Paper State Court Records received from Circuit Court, City of Salem, CL19-113, (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.) (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 12 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by OptumRx, Inc. (Broughton, Turner) Modified on 4/12/2019 to add corporate parents UnitedHealth Group Incorporated and OptumRX Holdings, LLC (sas). [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 11 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Optum, Inc. (Broughton, Turner) Modified on 4/12/2019 to add corporate parents United HealthCare Services, Inc. and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (sas). [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 10 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 9 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC (Miller, Sarah) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Filing Requirement to Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (sas) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Briefing Order. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 4/4/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand by City of Salem, Virginia. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 5 Supplemental MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by City of Salem, Virginia. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by City of Salem, Virginia. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from City of Salem Circuit Court. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 4/2/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated Supplemental Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from City of Salem Circuit Court, case number CL19000113-00. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, receipt #0423-3108847), filed by Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-State Court Records)(ck) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Salem, Virginia v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Holding Company
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Represented By: Jacqueline Cook Hedblom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Sarah Byer Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barr Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insource, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRX, Inc.
Represented By: William H. Jordan
Represented By: Kimberly K. Chemerinsky
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Represented By: Brian D. Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Inc.
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Represented By: Jacqueline Cook Hedblom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AbbVie Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVK-Tech Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS TN Distribution Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Represented By: William H. Jordan
Represented By: Kimberly K. Chemerinsky
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Represented By: Brian D. Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark Rx, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Represented By: Sarah Byer Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By: William H. Jordan
Represented By: Kimberly K. Chemerinsky
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Represented By: Brian D. Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Salem, Virginia
Represented By: Stephen Michael Yost
Represented By: Richard Johan Conrod, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick Hugh O'Donnell
Represented By: Grant Edward Morris
Represented By: William Edgar Spivey
Represented By: Lauren Tallent Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?