Franklin County, Virginia v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al

Plaintiff: Franklin County, Virginia
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Purdue Pharma L.P., Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Barr Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Insys Therapeutics Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Insource, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Cardinal Health Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Express Scripts Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, AbbVie Inc., KVK-Tech Inc, Caremark, L.L.C., Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., CVS TN Distribution Center, LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., OptumRX, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Allergan Finance LLC, Optum, Inc., Caremark Rx, L.L.C., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Does 1-100, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Par Pharmaceutical Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Henry Schein Inc., Impax Laboratories, Inc., SpecGX LLC, Walgreen Co., McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P. and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Case Number: 1:2019op45701
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 40 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Virginia Western. Case number 7:19-cv-00302. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Order transferring case to Northern Ohio. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 08/01/2019. (aab) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 38 Notice of MDL Transfer Order from District of Northern Ohio; MDL No. 2804. (aab) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Tallent Rogers terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 07/31/2019. (aab) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Memorandum in Support by Franklin County, Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. Hedblom Withdrawal of Counsel (Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Munro Scott on behalf of Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Stay Case. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 5/1/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Stay . filed by Franklin County, Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. re #20 Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. re #20 Notice of Supplemental Authorities (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 29 Paper State Court Records received from Franklin County Circuit Court, CL19-2880, (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.) (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 Supplemental MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by Franklin County, Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by Franklin County, Virginia. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jessalyn H. Zeigler for Mallinckrodt LLC,and Specgx LLC added. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 4/22/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Jessalyn H. Zeigler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3126654. by Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Sarah) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney William Herman Jordan for Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc. and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated added. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 4/22/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 23 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #6 Supplemental MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Cases)(Miller, Sarah) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 21 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #20 MOTION to Stay . filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15)(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Stay by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Brian David Boone for Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated added. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 4/17/19. (sas) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Kimberly Kisabeth Chemerinsky for Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated added. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 4/16/19. (sas) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Brian Boone to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3122719. by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 16 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts Holding Company identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation for Express Scripts Holding Company. (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 15 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation, Corporate Parent Express Scripts Holding Company for Express Scripts, Inc.. (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Kimberly Chemerinsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3122057. by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for William Jordan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3122054. by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 12 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Optum, Inc. identifying Corporate Parents United HealthCare Services, Inc. and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Broughton, Turner) Modified on 4/19/2019 to update docket text to match pdf (ck). [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 11 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by OptumRx, Inc. identifying Corporate Parents OptumRX Holdings LLC, and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Broughton, Turner) Modified on 4/19/2019 to update docket text to match pdf(ck). [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 10 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Turner Anderson Broughton on behalf of Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER regarding MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law #5 filed by Franklin County, Virginia and Supplemental MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law #6 filed by Franklin County, Virginia ( Responses due by 4/18/2019, Replies due by 4/25/2019.). Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 4/15/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand by Franklin County, Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 Supplemental MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Franklin County, Virginia. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Franklin County, Virginia. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. re #1 Supplemental Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mallinckrodt PLC for Mallinckrodt LLC. (Miller, Sarah) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Frankin County Circuit Court. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 4/12/2019. (ssm) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Circuit Court, case number CL19-2880. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400), filed by Specgx LLC, Mallinckrodt LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ssm) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin County, Virginia v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Holding Company
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Represented By: Jacqueline Cook Hedblom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Sarah Byer Miller
Represented By: Jessalyn H. Zeigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barr Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insource, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By: Kimberly K. Chemerinsky
Represented By: William H. Jordan
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Represented By: Brian D. Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Inc.
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Represented By: Jacqueline Cook Hedblom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AbbVie Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVK-Tech Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS TN Distribution Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRX, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly K. Chemerinsky
Represented By: William H. Jordan
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Represented By: Brian D. Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly K. Chemerinsky
Represented By: William H. Jordan
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Represented By: Brian D. Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark Rx, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Represented By: Sarah Byer Miller
Represented By: Jessalyn H. Zeigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin County, Virginia
Represented By: Jim H. Guynn, Jr.
Represented By: Richard Johan Conrod, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick Hugh O'Donnell
Represented By: Grant Edward Morris
Represented By: William Edgar Spivey
Represented By: Lauren Tallent Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?