City of Chesapeake, Virginia v. Actavis, LLC et al
Plaintiff: City of Chesapeake, Virginia
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Purdue Pharma L.P., Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Insys Therapeutics Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Insource, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Impax Laboratories, LLC, Cardinal Health Inc., CVS TN Distribution, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, AbbVie Inc., KVK-Tech Inc, Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Caremark, L.L.C., Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Allergan Finance LLC, Optum, Inc., Caremark Rx, L.L.C., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Barr Laboratories, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Does 1-100, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Par Pharmaceutical Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Henry Schein Inc., SpecGX LLC, Walgreen Co., Express Scripts, Inc., McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Actavis LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P. and General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019op45712
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 34 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Virginia Eastern. Case number 2:19-cv-00183. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 1, 2019 Case transferred to District of Northern Ohio. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet electronically sent. (dcou, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/22/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 33 CERTIFIED COPY of MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER In Re: NATIONAL PRESCRIPTION OPIATE LITIGATION, MDL No. 2804, transferring specified actions to the Northern District of Ohio by the Clerk of the Panel. Certified copy received in EDVA on August 1,2018. Signed by Clerk of the Panel on 8/1/2019. (dcou, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/22/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: ADJUDGED, ORDERED and DECREED that Lauren Tallent Rogers, Esquire ispermitted to withdraw from the case and is hereby deemed WITHDRAWN. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 7/31/2019. (dcou, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/22/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Memorandum in Support by City of Chesapeake, Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 8/22/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jacqueline Cook Hedblom terminated. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 7/15/2019. (dcou, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/22/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Jacqueline C. Hedblom by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vaed on 8/22/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Notice of Correction re #28 NOTICE : Unfortunately, when you filed document number 28 the document should have been in the form of a motion. Please refile the document and attach a proposed order. (dcou, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/22/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. Hedblom Withdrawal of Counsel (Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vaed on 8/22/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Munro Scott on behalf of Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vaed on 8/22/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER that all litigation in this case is hereby STAYED until further notice of this Court. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 4/24/19. (bpet, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/22/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand filed by City of Chesapeake, Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 8/22/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 24 Memorandum in Support re #23 MOTION to Stay filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15)(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vaed on 8/22/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Stay by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vaed on 8/22/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Notice of Correction re #22 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by William Jordan, #21 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kimberly Chemerinsky and #20 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Boone and Certification of Local Counsel Turner Broughton. The motions do not contain the signatures of the applicants. Local counsel should file corrected motions that include the written signatures of the applicants. Counsel should not pay a second fee. (tlev, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/22/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 22 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by William Jordan and Certification of Local Counsel Turner Broughton by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 8/22/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 21 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kimberly Chemerinsky and Certification of Local Counsel Turner Broughton by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 8/22/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 20 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Boone and Certification of Local Counsel Turner Broughton by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 8/22/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Notice of Correction re #16 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kimberly Chemerinsky and #15 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by William Jordan and Certification of Local Counsel Turner Broughton: Counsel is advised that the court has a preferred filing method and provides a fillable form for Pro Hac Vice motions. The form can be found on the Court's website under attorney forms. Counsel should re-file the motion using the correct form. Counsel should not pay a second filing fee. (tlev, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/22/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 19 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Boone and Certification of Local Counsel Turner Broughton Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6595204. by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 8/22/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by City of Chesapeake, Virginia of Motion to Consolidate Related Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 8/22/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand filed by Actavis, LLC. (Fee, James) [Transferred from vaed on 8/22/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 16 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kimberly Chemerinsky and Certification of Local Counsel Turner Broughton Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6593753. by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 8/22/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 15 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by William Jordan and Certification of Local Counsel Turner Broughton Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6593747. by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 8/22/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Optum, Inc.. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 8/22/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OptumRX, Inc.. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 8/22/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 8/22/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Turner A. Broughton on behalf of Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 8/22/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts Holding Company. (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vaed on 8/22/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vaed on 8/22/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand by City of Chesapeake, Virginia. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 8/22/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 7 Supplemental MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by City of Chesapeake, Virginia. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 8/22/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by City of Chesapeake, Virginia. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 8/22/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Cook Hedblom on behalf of Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vaed on 8/22/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Supplemental Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vaed on 8/22/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Actavis, LLC. (Fee, James) [Transferred from vaed on 8/22/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Notice of Correction re #1 Notice of Removal. Filing user has been requested to refile D.E. 1-4 separately, using the Corporate Disclosure Statement event. (epri, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/22/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/22/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/22/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6584098.), filed by Actavis LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Lower Court Filings), #2 (State Court Notice), #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 (Corporate Disclosure Statement))(Fee, James) [Transferred from vaed on 8/22/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Chesapeake, Virginia v. Actavis, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Holding Company
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Represented By: Jacqueline Cook Hedblom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insource, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRX, Inc.
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS TN Distribution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AbbVie Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVK-Tech Inc
Represented By: Thomas E. Rice, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark Rx, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barr Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Represented By: Jacqueline Cook Hedblom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: James Kevin Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Chesapeake, Virginia
Represented By: Chanel Ann Gray
Represented By: Richard Johan Conrod, Jr.
Represented By: Jacob Paul Stroman, IV
Represented By: Patrick Hugh O'Donnell
Represented By: Grant Edward Morris
Represented By: William Edgar Spivey
Represented By: Dana English Sanford
Represented By: Lauren Tallent Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?