City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, Actavis Totowa LLC, Mylan Institutional, Inc., McKesson Specialty Care Distribution Corporation, Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Rite Aid of Maryland, Value Specialty Pharmacy, LLC, Stuart D. Baker, H.D. Smith LLC, Walgreen Co., Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, CVS Indiana L.L.C., Walmart Inc., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Anda Inc, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Jonathan D. Sackler, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., John Doe Corporation, John Doe, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., Rite Aid of Pennsylvania, Inc., Theresa Sackler, Actavis LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, David A. Sackler, Rosebay Medical Company, Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co. Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Rosebay Medical Company L.P., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Generics Holding, Inc., Cardinal Health 110, LLC, BR Holdings Associates L.P., CVS RX Services, Inc., McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, Purdue Pharma Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., Actavis Laboratories NY, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Value Drug Company, Cephalon Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East L.P., Beacon Company, Pharmaceutical Research Associates L.P., Allergan Finance LLC, BR Holdings Associates Inc., PLP Associates Holdings L.P., #1-10 John Does, Indivior Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Inc., Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, Kathe A. Sackler, West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., SpecGX LLC, DEPOMED, INC., Sandoz Inc., Beverly Sackler, Allergan Sales, LLC, Richard S. Sackler, Actavis Kadian LLC, Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc, McKesson Specialty Distribution, LLC, Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan U.S.A., Inc., Mallinckrodt Enterprises Holdings, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., CVS TN Distribution Center, LLC, Rhodes Technologies Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Omnicare of New York, LLC, Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, H.D Smith Holdings, LLC, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, CVS Pharmacy Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. and H.D. Smith Holding Company
Case Number: 1:2019op45724
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 77 Return of Service by Personal Service executed upon Endo Generics Holding, Inc. on 11/5/19 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 8, 2019 Filing 76 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Bellco Drug Corp. waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 6, 2019 Filing 75 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Value Drug Company waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 6, 2019 Filing 74 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Value Specialty Pharmacy, LLC waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 6, 2019 Filing 73 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Sandoz Inc. waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 6, 2019 Filing 72 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 6, 2019 Filing 71 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. McKesson Specialty Distribution, LLC waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 6, 2019 Filing 70 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. McKesson Specialty Care Distribution Corporation waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 6, 2019 Filing 69 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc. waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 3, 2019 Filing 68 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) Def Actavis Laboratories NY, Inc. (f/k/a Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Copiague)) filed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. (Pearlman, Eva)
November 3, 2019 Filing 67 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Omnicare Distribution Center, LLC waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 3, 2019 Filing 66 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Omnicare, Inc. waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 3, 2019 Filing 65 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 3, 2019 Filing 64 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 3, 2019 Filing 63 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 3, 2019 Filing 62 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 3, 2019 Filing 61 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 3, 2019 Filing 60 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 3, 2019 Filing 59 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Mallinckrodt Enterprises Holdings, Inc. waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 3, 2019 Filing 58 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 3, 2019 Filing 57 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. SpecGX LLC waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 3, 2019 Filing 56 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Mallinckrodt PLC waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 3, 2019 Filing 55 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Mallinckrodt LLC waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 3, 2019 Filing 54 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Mylan Institutional, Inc. waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 3, 2019 Filing 53 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 3, 2019 Filing 52 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Par Pharmaceutical Inc. waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 3, 2019 Filing 51 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc. waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 3, 2019 Filing 50 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 3, 2019 Filing 49 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Endo Health Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 3, 2019 Filing 48 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Rite Aid of Maryland waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 3, 2019 Filing 47 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Rite Aid of Pennsylvania, Inc. waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 26, 2019 Filing 46 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Wal-Mart Stores East L.P. waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 26, 2019 Filing 45 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Walmart Inc. waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 26, 2019 Filing 44 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Allergan Finance LLC waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 26, 2019 Filing 43 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Allergan U.S.A., Inc. waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 26, 2019 Filing 42 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Allergan Sales, LLC waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 26, 2019 Filing 41 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Allergan PLC waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 26, 2019 Filing 40 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. CVS Indiana L.L.C. waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 26, 2019 Filing 39 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. CVS Pharmacy Inc. waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 26, 2019 Filing 38 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. CVS RX Services, Inc. waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 26, 2019 Filing 37 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. CVS TN Distribution Center, LLC waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 26, 2019 Filing 36 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Omnicare of New York, LLC waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 26, 2019 Filing 35 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 26, 2019 Filing 34 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 26, 2019 Filing 33 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 21, 2019 Filing 32 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 12, 2019 Filing 31 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. DEPOMED, INC. waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 12, 2019 Filing 30 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Indivior Inc. waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 12, 2019 Filing 29 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc. waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 12, 2019 Filing 28 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc. waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 12, 2019 Filing 27 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Actavis Kadian LLC waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 12, 2019 Filing 26 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Actavis Elizabeth LLC waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 12, 2019 Filing 25 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Watson Laboratories Inc. waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 12, 2019 Filing 24 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Warner Chilcott Company, LLC waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 12, 2019 Filing 23 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 12, 2019 Filing 22 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Cephalon Inc. waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 12, 2019 Filing 21 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Actavis Totowa LLC waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 12, 2019 Filing 20 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Actavis South Atlantic LLC waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 12, 2019 Filing 19 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Actavis Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 12, 2019 Filing 18 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 12, 2019 Filing 17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 12, 2019 Filing 16 Stipulated Service Acknowledged by Defendant Stuart D. Baker on 10/7/19 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 12, 2019 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. H.D. Smith LLC waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 12, 2019 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. H.D Smith Holdings, LLC waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 12, 2019 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. H.D. Smith Holding Company waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 12, 2019 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 12, 2019 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 12, 2019 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Walgreen Co. waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 12, 2019 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Walgreen Eastern Co. Inc. waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 12, 2019 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 12, 2019 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Anda Inc waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 12, 2019 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Cardinal Health 110, LLC waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
October 12, 2019 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. Cardinal Health Inc. waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 filed on behalf of City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Pennsylvania Middle. Case number 3:19-cv-01398. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 16, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: MINUTE ORDER - TO INVOLVED CLERKS - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-110) Finalized on 9/16/19. (ao) [Transferred from pamd on 9/18/2019.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-110) MDL. No. 2804 TRANSFERRING CASE to the Northern District of Ohio. (ao) [Transferred from pamd on 9/18/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ao) [Transferred from pamd on 9/18/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4841826), filed by City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jw) [Transferred from pamd on 9/18/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Totowa LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Institutional, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Specialty Care Distribution Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Elizabeth LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis South Atlantic LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Value Specialty Pharmacy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart D. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Indiana L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Pennsylvania, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosebay Medical Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosebay Medical Company L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Generics Holding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 110, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BR Holdings Associates L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS RX Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories NY, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Value Drug Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beacon Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmaceutical Research Associates L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BR Holdings Associates Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLP Associates Holdings L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: #1-10 John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPOMED, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Kadian LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Specialty Distribution, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Enterprises Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS TN Distribution Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omnicare of New York, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D Smith Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith Holding Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Hazleton, Pennsylvania
Represented By: Bruce J. Phillips
Represented By: Eva Brindisi Pearlman
Represented By: John C. Cherundolo
Represented By: John Petrone
Represented By: Robert F. Julian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?