County of Ventura v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: County of Ventura
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Allergan Sales, LLC, Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Actavis Totowa LLC, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Allergan PLC, Watson Laboratories Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Allergan U.S.A., Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis Kadian LLC, Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Cardinal Health Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Walgreens Co., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson and Johnson, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Jane Does, SpecGX LLC and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Case Number: 1:2019op45747
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 42:1396
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 35 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Ventura. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 8/30/2019, answer due 10/29/2019 filed on behalf of County of Ventura (Singer, Linda)
October 9, 2019 Filing 34 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Ventura. Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 8/30/2019, answer due 10/29/2019 filed on behalf of County of Ventura (Singer, Linda)
October 9, 2019 Filing 33 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Ventura. Johnson and Johnson waiver sent on 8/30/2019, answer due 10/29/2019 filed on behalf of County of Ventura (Singer, Linda)
October 4, 2019 Filing 32 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Ventura. Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc waiver sent on 8/30/2019, answer due 10/29/2019 filed on behalf of County of Ventura (Singer, Linda)
October 4, 2019 Filing 31 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Ventura. SpecGX LLC waiver sent on 8/30/2019, answer due 10/29/2019 filed on behalf of County of Ventura (Singer, Linda)
October 4, 2019 Filing 30 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Ventura. Mallinckrodt LLC waiver sent on 8/30/2019, answer due 10/29/2019 filed on behalf of County of Ventura (Singer, Linda)
October 4, 2019 Filing 29 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Ventura. Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc waiver sent on 8/30/2019, answer due 10/29/2019 filed on behalf of County of Ventura (Singer, Linda)
October 4, 2019 Filing 28 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Ventura. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 8/30/2019, answer due 10/29/2019 filed on behalf of County of Ventura (Singer, Linda)
October 1, 2019 Filing 27 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Ventura. Endo Health Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 8/30/2019, answer due 10/29/2019 filed on behalf of County of Ventura (Singer, Linda)
September 23, 2019 Filing 26 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Ventura. Walgreens Co. waiver sent on 8/30/2019, answer due 10/29/2019 filed on behalf of County of Ventura (Singer, Linda)
September 10, 2019 Filing 25 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Ventura. Actavis South Atlantic LLC waiver sent on 8/30/2019, answer due 10/29/2019 filed on behalf of County of Ventura (Singer, Linda)
September 10, 2019 Filing 24 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Ventura. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 8/30/2019, answer due 10/29/2019 filed on behalf of County of Ventura (Singer, Linda)
September 10, 2019 Filing 23 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Ventura. Warner Chilcott Company, LLC waiver sent on 8/30/2019, answer due 10/29/2019 filed on behalf of County of Ventura (Singer, Linda)
September 10, 2019 Filing 22 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Ventura. Watson Laboratories Inc. waiver sent on 8/30/2019, answer due 10/29/2019 filed on behalf of County of Ventura (Singer, Linda)
September 10, 2019 Filing 21 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Ventura. Actavis Totowa LLC waiver sent on 8/30/2019, answer due 10/29/2019 filed on behalf of County of Ventura (Singer, Linda)
September 9, 2019 Filing 20 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Ventura. Cephalon Inc. waiver sent on 8/30/2019, answer due 10/29/2019 filed on behalf of County of Ventura (Singer, Linda)
September 9, 2019 Filing 19 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Ventura. Actavis Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 8/30/2019, answer due 10/29/2019 filed on behalf of County of Ventura (Singer, Linda)
September 9, 2019 Filing 18 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Ventura. Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC waiver sent on 8/30/2019, answer due 10/29/2019 filed on behalf of County of Ventura (Singer, Linda)
September 9, 2019 Filing 17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Ventura. Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc. waiver sent on 8/30/2019, answer due 10/29/2019 filed on behalf of County of Ventura (Singer, Linda)
September 9, 2019 Filing 16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Ventura. Actavis Kadian LLC waiver sent on 8/30/2019, answer due 10/29/2019 filed on behalf of County of Ventura (Singer, Linda)
September 9, 2019 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Ventura. Actavis Elizabeth LLC waiver sent on 8/30/2019, answer due 10/29/2019 filed on behalf of County of Ventura (Singer, Linda)
September 4, 2019 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Ventura. Cardinal Health Inc. waiver sent on 8/30/2019, answer due 10/29/2019 filed on behalf of County of Ventura (Singer, Linda)
August 30, 2019 Filing 13 First Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons Mallinckrodt PLC. & Allergan PLC. filed by County of Ventura. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons of defendants listed in Attachment A, #2 Supplement List of defendants to be summoned)(Singer, Linda)
August 29, 2019 Filing 12 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central. Case number 2:19-cv-06799. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 Conditional Transfer Order - 107 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2804, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of Ohio and assigned to Honorable Dan A. Polster. Case transferred electronically on 8/22/2019. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (mrgo) [Transferred from cacd on 8/29/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff County of Ventura. (Wolter, Martha) [Transferred from cacd on 8/29/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo) [Transferred from cacd on 8/29/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-06799 GW(FFMx). (rn) [Transferred from cacd on 8/29/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Sara D. Aguiniga. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 8/29/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Elizabeth Smith. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 8/29/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Linda Singer. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 8/29/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 8/29/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 8/29/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 8/29/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24209677 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff County of Ventura. (Attorney Martha Jennifer Wolter added to party County of Ventura(pty:pla))(Wolter, Martha) [Transferred from cacd on 8/29/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Ventura v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Totowa LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Elizabeth LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis South Atlantic LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Kadian LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson and Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Ventura
Represented By: Leroy Smith
Represented By: Martha Jennifer Wolter
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?