Oxford, Alabama, City of v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Oxford, City of
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis LLC, Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc f/k/a Actavis Inc, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLS and Noramco, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019op45774
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 12 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Alabama Northern. Case number 1:19-cv-01401. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of Ohio Northern for inclusion in MDL; certified copy of docket entries and documents requested by transferee clerk electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in District of Ohio Northern. (KEK) [Transferred from alnd on 9/18/2019.]
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Oxford, City of. Actavis, LLC served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019; Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019; Cephalon, Inc. served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019; Noramco, Inc. served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (KAM) [Transferred from alnd on 9/18/2019.]
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Oxford, City of. Cardinal Health, Inc. served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019; Johnson & Johnson served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019; The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019; Watson Laboratories, Inc. served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (KEK) [Transferred from alnd on 9/18/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Oxford, City of. McKesson Corporation served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019; Purdue Pharma L.P. served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. (KEK) [Transferred from alnd on 9/18/2019.]
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Oxford, City of as to Mallinckrodt LLC. No date or signature on green card. (KEK) [Transferred from alnd on 9/18/2019.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Oxford, Alabama. Purdue Pharma, Inc. served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (green card signed but undated) (KAM) [Transferred from alnd on 9/18/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Oxford, Alabama. Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc. served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (JLC) [Transferred from alnd on 9/18/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc f/k/a Actavis Inc. via certified U.S. Mail on this the 4th day of September, 2019. (JLC) [Transferred from alnd on 9/18/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3424012, NDAL receipt #B4601100225. (Sutton, William) Modified on 8/30/2019 (JLC). [Transferred from alnd on 9/18/2019.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement by City of Oxford, Alabama. (JLC) [Transferred from alnd on 9/18/2019.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by City of Oxford, Alabama. (JLC) [Transferred from alnd on 9/18/2019.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by City of Oxford, Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC) [Transferred from alnd on 9/18/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oxford, Alabama, City of v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc f/k/a Actavis Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oxford, City of
Represented By: Jere L. Beasley
Represented By: Jeffrey Donald Price
Represented By: William Robert Sutton
Represented By: Jon Ryan Kral
Represented By: Rhon Eugene Jones
Represented By: Richard Douglas Stratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?