Hickey v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Hickey
Defendant: Dr. Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler, jonathan Sackler, Purdue Pharma L.P., Karen Sackler, David Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt and Purdue Pharma Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019op45796
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Massachusetts. Case number 1:19-cv-11806. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 Copy re #7 MDL Conditional Transfer Order Received, 8 Case Transferred Out - District Transfer mailed to Thomas Hickey on 9/16/2019. (Belmont, Kellyann) [Transferred from mad on 9/20/2019.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred to the Northern District of Ohio pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 9/16/2019. Case transferred electronically to the Clerk in that district. (Belmont, Kellyann) [Transferred from mad on 9/20/2019.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 110 in MDL Case 2804 received from District of Northern District of Ohio requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings (Belmont, Kellyann) [Transferred from mad on 9/20/2019.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 Informational copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 110 in MDL Case 2804 received from the mdl panel requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from mad on 9/20/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Thomas Hickey.(Belmont, Kellyann) [Transferred from mad on 9/20/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ORDER entered denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If plaintiff elects to proceed with this action, no later than Monday, September 16, 2019, he either must (1) pay the $400.00 filing and administrative fees ; or (2) file a renewed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by his certified prison account statement. Failure of plaintiff to comply with this directive may result in a dismissal of this action without prejudice. (PSSA, 3) [Transferred from mad on 9/20/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary) [Transferred from mad on 9/20/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Thomas Hickey.(Castilla, Francis) [Transferred from mad on 9/20/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Thomas Hickey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Castilla, Francis) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/22/2019) (Castilla, Francis). [Transferred from mad on 9/20/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hickey v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Richard Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jonathan Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Hickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?