City of Alexander City, Alabama v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: City of Alexander City, Alabama
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Cardinal Health Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Noramco Inc and Purdue Pharma Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019op45827
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 22 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Alabama Middle. Case number 3:19-cv-00630. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 25, 2019 Case transferred to Northern District of Ohio; Electronically transferred via CM/ECF transfer to Clerk. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, ) [Transferred from almd on 9/27/2019.]
September 25, 2019 Filing 21 Received certified copy of Conditional Transfer Order entered on 9/25/2019 by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this action to USDC for the Northern District of Ohio. (cnw, ) [Transferred from almd on 9/27/2019.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 20 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Disclosure Statement)(cnw, ) [Transferred from almd on 9/27/2019.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by David Lee Brown, Jr on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Brown, David) [Transferred from almd on 9/27/2019.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by John Patrick Strubel on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Strubel, John) [Transferred from almd on 9/27/2019.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Houston Lanier Brown, II on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Brown, Houston) [Transferred from almd on 9/27/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 16 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Compliant & #4 Summons signed by not signed for Actavis, LLC, Cephalon, Inc., served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019.(cnw, ) [Transferred from almd on 9/27/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 15 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Compliant & #4 Summons signed by Daniel D. Kelley for Cardinal Health, Inc. served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (cnw, ) [Transferred from almd on 9/27/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 14 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Compliant & #4 Summons signed by not signed for Johnson & Johnson served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (cnw, ) [Transferred from almd on 9/27/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 13 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Compliant & #4 Summons signed by not signed for Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC served on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (cnw, ) [Transferred from almd on 9/27/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Compliant & #4 Summons signed by Yvette Grier for The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (cnw, ) [Transferred from almd on 9/27/2019.]
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Compliant & #4 Summons signed by Marlyn P. for Watson Laboratories, Inc. served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (cnw, ) [Transferred from almd on 9/27/2019.]
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Compliant & #3 Summons signed by illegible for Purdue Pharma, Inc. served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. (cnw, ) [Transferred from almd on 9/27/2019.]
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #3 Summons signed by Kelly Webster for Purdue Pharma L.P. served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (cnw, ) [Transferred from almd on 9/27/2019.]
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Compliant & #3 Summons signed by Julie Buckner for Actavis Pharma, Inc. served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. (cnw, ) [Transferred from almd on 9/27/2019.]
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #3 Summons signed by Jennifer Lockwood for Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (cnw, ) [Transferred from almd on 9/27/2019.]
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Compliant & #3 Summons signed by Julie Buckner for TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. (cnw, ) [Transferred from almd on 9/27/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #3 Summons signed by Kelly Webster for McKesson Corporation served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (cnw, ) Modified on 9/12/2019 to clarify docket text (cnw, ). [Transferred from almd on 9/27/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Actavis, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (cnw, ) [Transferred from almd on 9/27/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Actavis Pharma, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (cnw, ) [Transferred from almd on 9/27/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by City of Alexander City, Alabama. (cnw, ) [Transferred from almd on 9/27/2019.]
August 30, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by City of Alexander City, Alabama. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, ) [Transferred from almd on 9/27/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602054741.), filed by City of Alexander City, Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 receipt)(cnw, ) [Transferred from almd on 9/27/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Alexander City, Alabama v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: J. Patrick Strubel
Represented By: David L. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Houston Lanier Brown, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Alexander City, Alabama
Represented By: Richard Douglas Stratton
Represented By: Jon Ryan Kral
Represented By: Rhon Eugene Jones
Represented By: William Robert Sutton
Represented By: Jeffrey Donald Price
Represented By: Jere L. Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?