City of Auburn v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: The City of Auburn and City of Auburn
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Eveready Wholsale Drugs Ltd., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, Kinray, LLC, Stuart D. Baker, Navitus Health Solutions, LLC, Bellco Drug Corp., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Anda Inc, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Henry Schein Inc., Noramco Inc, Jonathan D. Sackler, Actavis Inc, Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Blenheim Pharmacal Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., Theresa Sackler, Actavis LLC, RHODES TECHNOLOGIES, David A. Sackler, PSS World Medical Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Optum, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Prime Therapeutics, LLC, Miami-Luken Inc, CaremarkPCS, L.L.C., MORTIMER SACKLER FAMILY, Darby Group Companies, Inc., Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, Purdue Pharma Inc., The Kroger Co., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., American Medical Distributors, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Walgreen Co, Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Smith Drug Company, West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp, HBC Service Company, Allergan PLC, Navitus Holdings, LLC, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Value Drug Company, Cephalon Inc., Caremark Rx, L.L.C., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Kathe A. Sackler, SpecGX LLC, Sandoz Inc., Beverly Sackler, Richard S. Sackler, Discount Drug Mart, Inc., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., Insys Therapeutics Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Wal-Mart Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Caremark LLC, SAJ Distributors, TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Henry Schein Medical Systems, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc., Raymond Sackler Family, Rhodes Technologies Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Publix Supermarkets, Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Express Scripts Inc., Rite Aid Corp., JOHN N KAPOOR and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2019op45843
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 55 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) against Defendant Discount Drug Mart, Inc. filed by City of Auburn. (Badala, Salvatore)
October 7, 2019 Filing 54 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New York Eastern. Case number 2:19-cv-03800. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 2, 2019 Case transferred to the Northern District of Ohio. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Florio, Lisa)[Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
October 2, 2019 Filing 53 Certified JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order IN RE: NATIONAL PRESCRIPTION OPIATE LITIGATION MDL No. 2804. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions listed on Schedule A are transferred to the Northern District of Ohio and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Florio, Lisa) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
October 2, 2019 Filing 52 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order IN RE: NATIONAL PRESCRIPTION OPIATE LITIGATION MDL No. 2804. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions listed on Schedule A are transferred to the Northern District of Ohio and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio (Ortiz, Grisel) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Court denies Plaintiff's Motion to Expedite its Motion to Remand #19 . This case is hereby temporarily stayed pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's decision regarding its transfer to the Northern District of Ohio MDL. The Moving Defendants' are directed to provide a status report within seven (7) days of the September 26, 2019 hearing. The deadline for all defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is hereby stayed until the Court directs otherwise. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 9/6/2019. (Gallagher, Erin) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian W. Park on behalf of Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Park, Julian) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER granting in part and denying in part DE #49 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including 10/4/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 9/5/2019. (Georgescu, Dora) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Adriana Riviere-Badell on behalf of Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Riviere-Badell, Adriana) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 49 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Wilkinson, Phoebe) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 48 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mylan Inc., Corporate Parent Mylan N.V. for Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Wilkinson, Phoebe) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Phoebe Anne Wilkinson on behalf of Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Wilkinson, Phoebe) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER granting in part and denying in part DE #46 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including 10/4/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 9/3/2019. (Georgescu, Dora) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER granting in part and denying in part DE #35 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including 10/4/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 9/3/2019. (Georgescu, Dora) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER granting in part and denying in part DE #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including 10/4/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 9/3/2019. (Georgescu, Dora) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER granting in part and denying in part DE #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including 10/4/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 9/3/2019. (Georgescu, Dora) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by John N. Kapoor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Mullen, Kurt) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 45 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Navitus Health Solutions, LLC, Navitus Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dean Health Systems, Inc., Corporate Parent FPP, Inc., Corporate Parent SSM Health Care Corporation for Navitus Health Solutions, LLC, Navitus Holdings, LLC. (Davis, Nicholas) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Shea Davis on behalf of Navitus Health Solutions, LLC, Navitus Holdings, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Davis, Nicholas) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Health Corporation (Naunton, Shawn) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.. (Naunton, Shawn) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 41 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CaremarkPCS, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for CaremarkPCS, L.L.C.. (Naunton, Shawn) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caremark Rx, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for Caremark Rx, L.L.C.. (Naunton, Shawn) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caremark, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for Caremark, L.L.C.. (Naunton, Shawn) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER granting DE #30 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF; registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that she receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 8/28/2019. (Georgescu, Dora) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER granting DE #29 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF; registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that she receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 8/28/2019. (Georgescu, Dora) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 38 Notice of Related Case indicated on the civil cover sheet in case number 19cv4891. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE OF HEARING SESSION filed before the US Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 36 STIPULATION regarding Service of the Summons and Complaint by CVS Health Corporation, Caremark Rx, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C. (Naunton, Shawn) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer requesting that the Court grant this application on consent and enter an order extending the time for Value Drug Company to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint and to conduct the Rule 26(f) planning conference until 60 days following: (1) a final decision by the JPML on transfer of this action to the Opiate MDL; or (2) this Courts ruling on Plaintiffs motion to remand, whichever is later by Value Drug Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Ex A) (Perel, Nelson) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Nelson Perel on behalf of Value Drug Company (aty to be noticed) (Perel, Nelson) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER granting DE #23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF; registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 8/13/2019. (Georgescu, Dora) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Francis Keneally on behalf of Prime Therapeutics LLC (aty to be noticed) (Keneally, Paul) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Bellco Drug Corp. identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Bellco Drug Corp.. (Asfendis, Paul) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Edward Asfendis on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Bellco Drug Corp. (aty to be noticed) (Asfendis, Paul) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Julian Park Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11735116. by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Park, Julian) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Adriana Riviere-Badell Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11731917. by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Riviere-Badell, Adriana) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 Amended MOTION to Remand to State Court , #19 MOTION to Expedite Amended Motion to Remand filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alana F. Montas, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7) (Montas, Alana) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cardinal Health Inc. (Mulry, Kevin) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Patrick Mulry on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Mulry, Kevin) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 25 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Montas, Alana) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 24 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, and the Complaint therein on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, Caremark Rx, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.X., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C., Walgreen Co.; Walgreen Eastern Co.; Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.; Rite Aid Corporation and Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. d/b/a Rite Aid Mid Atlantic Customer Support Center; Walmart Inc., Prime Therapeutics LLC, Navitus Holdings, LLC, Navitus Health Solutions, LLC, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., and Anda, Inc. by CVS Health Corporation, Caremark Rx, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Order Extending Time to Answer, Move of Otherwise Respond to Complaint and To Conduct Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) Conference)) (Naunton, Shawn) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11708364. by CVS Health Corporation, Caremark Rx, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - Md, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - Pa) (O'Croinin, Conor) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF RECUSAL: The Clerk of the Court is directed to reassign this case toanother Magistrate Judge in the ordinary course of business. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 7/29/2019. (Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson recused. Case randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke for all further. Motions referred to Steven I. Locke.) (Florio, Lisa) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 21 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, and the Complaint therein, on Consent, by Cardinal Health Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint and to Conduct Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) Conference) (Mulry, Kevin) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt Michael Mullen on behalf of John N. Kapoor (aty to be noticed) (Mullen, Kurt) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Expedite Amended Motion to Remand by The City of Auburn. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (Shkolnik, Hunter) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 18 Amended MOTION to Remand to State Court by The City of Auburn. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit 2017 NY Transfer Order, #5 Exhibit Auburn Transfer Order) (Shkolnik, Hunter) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. re #16 Notice(Other) Notice to Plaintiff of Filing Corrected Notice of Removal (Swette, Alexandria) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Corrected Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Swette, Alexandria) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (Swette, Alexandria) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Expedite Motion to Remand by The City of Auburn. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (Shkolnik, Hunter) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by The City of Auburn. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Shkolnik, Hunter) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Alana Fatima Montas on behalf of Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Montas, Alana) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendants are directed to show cause, in writing, on or before 7/24/2019, why this action-which originated in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Cayuga-should not be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 7/17/2019. (Gallagher, Erin) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 STATE COURT RECORD Received from Supreme Court of the State of NY, Cnty of Cayuga, E2019-0669; Received on 7/16/2016; Received Certified Clerks Minutes and Notice of Removal. (Ortiz, Grisel) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Gary Kobre on behalf of Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Kobre, Steven) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Menchel on behalf of Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Menchel, Matthew) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandria Elvira Swette on behalf of Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Swette, Alexandria) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Lawrence Penaro on behalf of Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (aty to be noticed) (Penaro, Steven) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
June 29, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Express Scripts Holding Company, Other Affiliate Cigna Corporation for Express Scripts, Inc.. (Swette, Alexandria) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
June 29, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts Holding Company identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation for Express Scripts Holding Company. (Swette, Alexandria) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
June 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, to Plaintiffs (Swette, Alexandria) [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Cayuga, case number E2019-0669. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYEDC-11621856) Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit) (Swette, Alexandria) Modified on 7/2/2019 (Rodin, Deanna). [Transferred from nyed on 10/7/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Auburn v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Holding Company
Represented By: Alexandria Elvira Swette
Represented By: Adriana Riviere-Badell
Represented By: Julian W. Park
Represented By: Alana F. Montas
Represented By: Matthew I. Menchel
Represented By: Steven G. Kobre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eveready Wholsale Drugs Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Phoebe Anne Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinray, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart D. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navitus Health Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Shea Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bellco Drug Corp.
Represented By: Paul Edward Asfendis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Paul Edward Asfendis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blenheim Pharmacal Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHODES TECHNOLOGIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PSS World Medical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Mulry
Represented By: Kevin P. Mulry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Penaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Therapeutics, LLC
Represented By: Paul Francis Keneally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami-Luken Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS, L.L.C.
Represented By: Conor B. O'Croinin
Represented By: Shawn Patrick Naunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTIMER SACKLER FAMILY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darby Group Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medical Distributors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Drug Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HBC Service Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navitus Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Shea Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Value Drug Company
Represented By: Nelson Perel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark Rx, L.L.C.
Represented By: Conor B. O'Croinin
Represented By: Shawn Patrick Naunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRX, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Penaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Conor B. O'Croinin
Represented By: Shawn Patrick Naunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discount Drug Mart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.
Represented By: Conor B. O'Croinin
Represented By: Shawn Patrick Naunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark LLC
Represented By: Conor B. O'Croinin
Represented By: Shawn Patrick Naunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAJ Distributors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein Medical Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Sackler Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Publix Supermarkets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Inc.
Represented By: Alexandria Elvira Swette
Represented By: Adriana Riviere-Badell
Represented By: Julian W. Park
Represented By: Alana F. Montas
Represented By: Matthew I. Menchel
Represented By: Steven G. Kobre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN N KAPOOR
Represented By: Kurt Michael Mullen
Represented By: Kurt M. Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Penaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The City of Auburn
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Represented By: Joseph L. Ciaccio
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Auburn
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Represented By: Joseph L. Ciaccio
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?