City of Rochester v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: The City of Rochester
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Kinray, LLC, Stuart D. Baker, Navitus Health Solutions, LLC, Bellco Drug Corp., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Anda Inc, PSS World Medical, Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Henry Schein Inc., Noramco Inc, Jonathan D. Sackler, Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Blenheim Pharmacal Inc., Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., Theresa Sackler, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis LLC, RHODES TECHNOLOGIES, David A. Sackler, Purdue Pharma Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Optum, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Prime Therapeutics, LLC, CaremarkPCS, L.L.C., MORTIMER SACKLER FAMILY, Darby Group Companies, Inc., SAJ Distributors, The Kroger Co., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., Miami Luken, Inc., American Medical Distributors, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Walgreen Co, Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Smith Drug Company, HBC Service Company, Navitus Holdings, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Value Drug Company, Cardinal Health, Inc., Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC, Cephalon Inc., Caremark Rx, L.L.C., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Kathe A. Sackler, West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., SpecGX LLC, JOHN KAPOOR, Sandoz Inc., Beverly Sackler, Richard S. Sackler, Discount Drug Mart, Inc., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., Insys Therapeutics Inc., WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC., Wal-Mart Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Caremark LLC, Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, Henry Schein Medical Systems, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc., Raymond Sackler Family, Rhodes Technologies Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Publix Supermarkets, Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Johnson & Johnson, Express Scripts Inc., Rite Aid Corp., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated and Eveready Wholesale Drugs Ltd
Case Number: 1:2019op45853
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 70 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) against Defendant Discount Drug Mart, Inc. filed by The City of Rochester. (Badala, Salvatore)
November 26, 2019 Filing 69 Attorney Appearance by Salvatore C. Badala filed by on behalf of The City of Rochester. (Badala, Salvatore)
November 26, 2019 Filing 68 Attorney Appearance by Hunter J. Shkolnik filed by on behalf of The City of Rochester. (Shkolnik, Hunter)
November 26, 2019 Filing 67 Attorney Appearance by Joseph L. Ciaccio filed by on behalf of The City of Rochester. (Ciaccio, Joseph)
November 26, 2019 Filing 66 Attorney Appearance by Shayna Erin Sacks filed by on behalf of The City of Rochester. (Sacks, Shayna)
October 17, 2019 Filing 65 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New York Western. Case number 6:19-cv-06490. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 2, 2019 Filing 64 CERTIFIED MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER ORDER to the Northern District of Ohio and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. Signed by Sarah S. Vance, Chair Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 10/2/19(TF) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
October 2, 2019 Filing 63 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER ORDER to the Northern District of Ohio and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. Signed by Sarah S. Vance, Chair Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 10/2/19. (TF) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 62 TEXT ORER: On 6/28/19, Defendants removed this case from state court. ECF No. #1 . In response, Plaintiff moved to remand the case back to state court. ECF No. #9 . Defendants replied by moving to temporarily stay the case pending a final decision from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (JPML) regarding whether the case will be transferred to the Opiate Multidistrict Litigation in the Northern District of Ohio. ECF Nos. #13 , #19 . After reviewing the parties' materials in support of and opposition to the motion to stay, the Court GRANTS Defendants' motion to stay. The Court finds that doing so promotes judicial economy and consistency and reduces the net hardship experienced by both parties. See In re Ivy, 901 F.2d 7, 9 (1990). If the case is not transferred, the Court will then consider Plaintiff's motion to remand. The parties are ordered to submit a joint status report within fourteen (14) days of the JPML's hearing currently scheduled for 9/26/19. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 9/23/19. (JO) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
September 13, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE by Express Scripts, Inc. re #13 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings of Supplemental Authority (Swette, Alexandria) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 60 TEXT ORDER: Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s unopposed #58 letter request for an Extension of Time is GRANTED. Defendant may answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint sixty (60) days following: (1) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand, or (2) a final decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on transfer of this action to the Opiate Multidistrict Litigation, whichever is later. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 9/5/19. (JO) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 59 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Wilkinson, Phoebe) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
September 5, 2019 E-Filing Notification: #58 Letter filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. This document contains a request for relief and should be filed as a motion. ACTION REQUIRED: Re-file document using the motion event. (TF) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 58 Letter filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. as to Jonathan D. Sackler, Richard S. Sackler, Saj Distributors, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Walgreen, Co., Johnson & Johnson, CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C. D/B/A CVS / Caremark, Kinray, LLC, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Wal-Mart Inc., Actavis LLC, Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Optum, Inc., The Kroger Co., PSS World Medical, Inc., John K. Kapoor, Morris & Dickson Co., LLC, Cardinal Health Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mortimer Sackler Family, Kathe A. Sackler, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Express Scripts, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Navitus Holdings, LLC, Express Scripts Holding Company, Smith Drug Company, Darby Group Companies, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, David A. Sackler, Value Drug Company, Anda, Inc., Rhodes Technologies Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Caremark, L.L.C., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., HBC Service Company, Noramco, Inc., Miami-Luken, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Prime Therapeutics LLC, Henry Schein Medical Systems, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Publix Supermarkets, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. N/K/A Hikma Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., D/B/A Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center, Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Rite Aid Corp., Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Navitus Health Solutions, LLC, Raymond Sackler Family, CaremarkPCS, L.L.C., Eveready Wholesale Drugs Ltd., Rochester Drug Cooperative, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Henry Schein, Inc., Rhodes Technologies, Actavis, Inc. F/K/A Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Discount Drug Mart, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Blenheim Pharmacal, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Caremark Rx, L.L.C., American Medical Distributors, Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., Stuart D. Baker, Bellco Drug Corp., Allergan PLC F/K/A Actavis PLC, Cephalon, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., SpecGx LLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Theresa Sackler, Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Beverly Sackler, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. requesting that the time for Mylan to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint, and to conduct the FRCP 26(f) planning conference be extended until sixty (60) days following: (1) this Courts ruling on any motion to remand, or (2) a final decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on transfer of this action to the multidistrict litigation for opioid-related actions, whichever is later. (Wilkinson, Phoebe) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 57 TEXT ORDER: Defendant John K. Kapoor's unopposed #56 Motion for an Extension of Time is GRANTED. Defendant may answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint sixty (60) days following: (1) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand, or (2) a final decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on transfer of this action to the Opiate Multidistrict Litigation, whichever is later. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 9/3/19. (JO) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by John K. Kapoor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Walker, Kacey) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 55 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Health Corporation. (Naunton, Shawn) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 54 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C. D/B/A CVS / Caremark identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C. D/B/A CVS / Caremark.. (Naunton, Shawn) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 53 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CaremarkPCS, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for CaremarkPCS, L.L.C... (Naunton, Shawn) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 52 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caremark Rx, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for Caremark Rx, L.L.C... (Naunton, Shawn) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 51 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caremark, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for Caremark, L.L.C... (Naunton, Shawn) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 50 STIPULATION regarding Service of the Summons and Complaint by CVS Health Corporation, Caremark Rx, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C. D/B/A CVS / Caremark, CaremarkPCS, L.L.C.. (Naunton, Shawn) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 49 TEXT ORDER: Defendant Value Drug Company's Unopposed Letter Request for an Extension of Time #48 is GRANTED. Defendant Value Drug Company may answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint and conduct the Rule 26(f) planning conference sixty (60) days following: (1) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand, or (2) a final decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on transfer of this action to the Opiate Multidistrict Litigation, whichever is later. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 8/21/2019. (MFM) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 48 Letter filed by Value Drug Company as to Jonathan D. Sackler, Richard S. Sackler, Saj Distributors, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Walgreen, Co., Johnson & Johnson, CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C. D/B/A CVS / Caremark, Kinray, LLC, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Wal-Mart Inc., Actavis LLC, Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Optum, Inc., The Kroger Co., PSS World Medical, Inc., John K. Kapoor, Morris & Dickson Co., LLC, Cardinal Health Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mortimer Sackler Family, Kathe A. Sackler, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Express Scripts, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Navitus Holdings, LLC, Express Scripts Holding Company, Smith Drug Company, Darby Group Companies, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, David A. Sackler, Value Drug Company, Anda, Inc., Rhodes Technologies Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Caremark, L.L.C., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., HBC Service Company, Noramco, Inc., Miami-Luken, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Prime Therapeutics LLC, Henry Schein Medical Systems, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Publix Supermarkets, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. N/K/A Hikma Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., D/B/A Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center, Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Rite Aid Corp., Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Navitus Health Solutions, LLC, Raymond Sackler Family, CaremarkPCS, L.L.C., Eveready Wholesale Drugs Ltd., Rochester Drug Cooperative, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Henry Schein, Inc., Rhodes Technologies, Actavis, Inc. F/K/A Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Discount Drug Mart, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Blenheim Pharmacal, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Caremark Rx, L.L.C., American Medical Distributors, Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., Stuart D. Baker, Bellco Drug Corp., Allergan PLC F/K/A Actavis PLC, Cephalon, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., SpecGx LLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Theresa Sackler, Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Beverly Sackler, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. VALUE DRUG COMPANY'S ("VLD") LETTER TO JUDGE GERACI DATED 8/20/19 requesting that the Court grant this application on consent and enter an order extending the time for VDC to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint and to conduct the Rule 26(f) planning conference until 60 days following: (1) a final decision by the JPML on transfer of this action to the Opiate MDL; or (2) this Courts ruling on Plaintiffs motion to remand, whichever is later).. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit [PROPOSED ORDE])(Graney, Charles) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Kacey Houston Walker on behalf of John K. Kapoor (Walker, Kacey) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 46 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexandria E. Swette, #2 Exhibit 1)(Swette, Alexandria) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 45 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Prime Therapeutics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Farrar, Jillian) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 44 DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING Defendants Express Scripts Holding Company and Express Scripts, Inc.,'s motions to admit Adriana Riviere-Badell and Julian W. Park pro hac vice. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 8/8/19. (JO)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Jillian Kay Farrar on behalf of Prime Therapeutics LLC (Farrar, Jillian) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION to appear pro hac vice by Julian Park ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0209-3543794.) by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Admission application)(Swette, Alexandria) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION to appear pro hac vice by Adriana Riviere-Badell ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0209-3543738.) by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Admission application)(Swette, Alexandria) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Edward Asfendis on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Bellco Drug Corp. (Asfendis, Paul) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew I. Menchel on behalf of Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (Menchel, Matthew) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven G. Kobre on behalf of Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (Kobre, Steven) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings filed by The City of Rochester. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- MDL Order Regarding Remands)(Kunkle, Tate) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by The City of Rochester. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- MDL Order Regarding Remands)(Kunkle, Tate) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Inc.. (Carlson, James) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by James W. Carlson on behalf of Wal-Mart Inc. (Carlson, James) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Navitus Health Solutions, LLC, Navitus Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dean Health Systems, Inc., Corporate Parent FPP, Inc., Corporate Parent SSM Health Care Corporation for Navitus Health Solutions, LLC, Navitus Holdings, LLC.. (Davis, Nicholas) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Shea Davis on behalf of Navitus Health Solutions, LLC, Navitus Holdings, LLC (Davis, Nicholas) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mylan Inc., Corporate Parent Mylan N.V. for Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc... (Wilkinson, Phoebe) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Phoebe A. Wilkinson on behalf of Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Wilkinson, Phoebe) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Value Drug Company. (Graney, Charles) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cardinal Health Inc.. (McRoberts, Franklin) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Franklin C. McRoberts on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc. (McRoberts, Franklin) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Medical Distributors, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Bellco Drug Corp. identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Bellco Drug Corp... (Asfendis, Paul) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 25 TEXT ORDER: On 7/30/19, Defendants CVS Health Corporation, Caremark Rx, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C., Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation and Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. d/b/a Rite Aid Mid Atlantic Customer Support Center, Walmart Inc., Prime Therapeutics LLC, Navitus Holdings, LLC, Navitus Health Solutions, LLC, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., and Anda, Inc., filed an unopposed #21 motion for an extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The Motion is hereby GRANTED, and the Moving Defendants may answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint and conduct the Rule 26(f) planning conference sixty (60) days following: (1) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand, or (2) a final decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litgation on transfer of this action to the Opiate Multidistrict Litigation, whichever is later. The Court acknowledges that the Moving Defendants only requested a thirty-day extension. The Court uses its discretion to extend the time to sixty days to keep the response deadline uniform for all Defendants. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 7/31/19. (JO) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Penaro, Steven) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OptumRX, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Other Affiliate OptumRx Holdings, LLC for OptumRX, Inc... (Penaro, Steven) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Optum, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Other Affiliate UnitedHealthCare Services, Inc. for Optum, Inc... (Penaro, Steven) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, and the Complaint therein on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, Caremark Rx, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.X., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C., Walgreen Co.; Walgreen Eastern Co.; Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.; Rite Aid Corporation and Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. d/b/a Rite Aid Mid Atlantic Customer Support Center; Walmart Inc., Prime Therapeutics LLC, Navitus Holdings, LLC, Navitus Health Solutions, LLC, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., and Anda, Inc. by CVS Health Corporation, Caremark Rx, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C. D/B/A CVS / Caremark, CaremarkPCS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Order Extending Time to Answer, Move of Otherwise Respond to Complaint and To Conduct Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) Conference))(Naunton, Shawn) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Swette, Alexandria) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Joinder for a Temporary Stay of Proceedings Pending Final Ruling by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation & Memorandum in Support regarding Dkt Nos.[13 & 14] by Value Drug Company.(Graney, Charles) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court (with attached Certificate of Service) filed by Value Drug Company. (Graney, Charles) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles E. Graney on behalf of Value Drug Company (Graney, Charles) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: On 7/26/19, Defendants Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Caremark Rx, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C. d/b/a CVS/Caremark, Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., Prime Therapeutics, LLC, Navitus Holdings, LLC, and Navitus Health Solutions, LLC, (the Moving Defendants) moved to stay all proceedings in this case pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's ruling on whether to transfer this case to the Opiate Multidistrict Litigation in the Northern District of Ohio. Plaintiff's response is due by 8/5/19, and the Moving Defendants may reply by 8/12/19. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 7/29/19. (JO) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: On 7/26/19, Defendants Cardinal Health Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Bellco Drug Corp., McKesson Corporation, and PSS World Medical, Inc., (the Distributor Defendants) filed a #12 motion for extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The Motion is hereby GRANTED, and the time for the Distributor Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint and to conduct the Ruled 26(f) planning conference is extended until sixty (60) days following: (1) this Courts ruling on any motion to remand, or (2) a final decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litgation on transfer of this action to the Opiate Multidistrict Litigation, whichever is later. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 7/29/19. (JO) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
July 29, 2019 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (CGJ) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #13 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings byExpress Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Swette, Alexandria) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc..(Swette, Alexandria) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, and the Complaint therein by American Medical Distributors, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Bellco Drug Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint and to Conduct Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) Conference)(Asfendis, Paul) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's #10 Motion to Expedite. Defendants' response to Plaintiff's #9 Motion to Remand is due by 7/29/19, and Plaintiff may reply by 8/5/19. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 7/19/19. (JO) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Expedite Motion to Remand by The City of Rochester. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kunkle, Tate) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by The City of Rochester. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Kunkle, Tate) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY LETTER re #6 Notice of Appearance filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc.. (TF) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Lawrence Penaro on behalf of Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Penaro, Steven) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandria E. Swette on behalf of Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (Swette, Alexandria) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Tate James Kunkle on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kunkle, Tate) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action notification emailed to the MDL (TF) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
July 1, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(TF) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TF) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr.. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil opening. (TF) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
June 29, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Express Scripts Holding Company, Other Affiliate Cigna Corporation for Express Scripts, Inc... (Cogan, Jonathan) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
June 29, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts Holding Company identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation for Express Scripts Holding Company.. (Cogan, Jonathan) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Cogan, Jonathan) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Express Scripts, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company from Supreme Court of the State of New York County of Monroe, case number E2019005178. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3504393), filed by Express Scripts, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Cogan, Jonathan) [Transferred from nywd on 10/17/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Rochester v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Holding Company
Represented By: Alexandria Elvira Swette
Represented By: Matthew I. Menchel
Represented By: Adriana Riviere-Badell
Represented By: Steven G. Kobre
Represented By: Julian W. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Phoebe Anne Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinray, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart D. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navitus Health Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Shea Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bellco Drug Corp.
Represented By: Paul Edward Asfendis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PSS World Medical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Paul Edward Asfendis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blenheim Pharmacal Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHODES TECHNOLOGIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Penaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Therapeutics, LLC
Represented By: Jillian K. Farrar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS, L.L.C.
Represented By: Shawn Patrick Naunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTIMER SACKLER FAMILY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darby Group Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAJ Distributors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami Luken, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medical Distributors, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Edward Asfendis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Drug Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HBC Service Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navitus Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Shea Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Value Drug Company
Represented By: Charles E. Graney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Franklin C. McRoberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark Rx, L.L.C.
Represented By: Shawn Patrick Naunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRX, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Penaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Shawn Patrick Naunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN KAPOOR
Represented By: Kacey E. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discount Drug Mart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.
Represented By: Shawn Patrick Naunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc.
Represented By: James W. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark LLC
Represented By: Shawn Patrick Naunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein Medical Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Sackler Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Publix Supermarkets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Inc.
Represented By: Alexandria Elvira Swette
Represented By: Matthew I. Menchel
Represented By: Adriana Riviere-Badell
Represented By: Steven G. Kobre
Represented By: Julian W. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Penaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eveready Wholesale Drugs Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The City of Rochester
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Joseph L. Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?