Rockwall County v. CVS Health Corporation
Plaintiff: Rockwall County
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Holdings Cooperative U.A., Purdue Pharma L.P., Cupric Holdings Co. Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, The Purdue Frederick Company, Watson Laboratories Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Europe B.V., Allergan PLC, Cardinal Health Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Amerisource Bergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, AbbVie Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P., Walgreen Co., CVS TN DISTRIBUTION, LLC, Dr Nicolas Padron, Cephalon Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Richard Andrews, Walmart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Teva Ltd, Actavis Pharma, Inc f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., McKesson, CVS Health Corporation, TEVA USA, Knoll Pharmaceutical Company, Insys Manufacturing LLC, SpecGX LLC, McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Purdue Pharma Inc., Cardinal Health 414, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Theodore E. Okechuku, Actavis plc, Activis Inc and Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019op45859
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] denying Plaintiff's Motion for leave to File Motion Seeking Suggestion of Remand to the JPML(Related Doc #41 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 4/8/20.(P,R)
April 2, 2020 Filing 41 Motion for leave to File Motion Seeking Suggestion of Remand to the JPML filed by Plaintiff Rockwall County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion Seeking Suggestion of Remand, #2 Exhibit 1 - Original Petition, #3 Exhibit 2 - Motion for Remand, #4 Exhibit 3 - Am. Omnibus Mem., #5 Exhibit 4 - Motion to Reopen Administratively Closed Case, #6 Exhibit 5 - Motion to Vacate CTO 102, #7 Exhibit 6 - In re Texas Opioid Litigation Opinion, #8 Exhibit 7 - Ltr re Selective Remands, #9 Exhibit 8 - Johnson County Order Granting Remand, #10 Exhibit 9 - City of Boston Order on Motion to Remand, #11 Exhibit 10 - City of Worcester Order and Memorandum on Pl.'s Emergency Motion to Remand, #12 Exhibit 11 - Opp. to Mot. for Entry of Order Establishing Common Benefits Fund, #13 Exhibit 12 - Pl.'s Supp. Submission Re Continuing Litigation, #14 Proposed Order Suggestion of Remand)(McCarley, Matthew)
October 18, 2019 Filing 40 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Texas Southern. Case number 4:19-cv-02181. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 3, 2019 Interdistrict transfer to Northern District of Ohio. Case transferred electronically. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
October 2, 2019 Filing 39 JPML TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to Northern District of Ohio to be included in MDL Docket No. 2804. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
September 17, 2019 Filing 38 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY by Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Reed, Noelle) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying #35 Motion to Reopen Administratively Closed Case. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition to #35 MOTION to Reopen Administratively Closed Case and For Leave to File Motion, And Incorporated Memorandum in Support, filed by CVS Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Torian, Mark) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION to Reopen Administratively Closed Case and For Leave to File Motion, And Incorporated Memorandum in Support by Rockwall County, Tx, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Appendix)(McCarley, Matthew) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying as moot #32 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move to Dismiss, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 33 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., filed.(Simon, Joel) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Time to Answer, Move to Dismiss, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Knoll Pharmaceutical Company, Abbvie Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wilkes, John) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
July 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-captioned case shall be ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. The parties are granted leave to move to reinstate the case on the Court's active docket after termination of the MDL 2804 proceedings. A copy of this Order shall be attached as an exhibit to any motion to reinstate. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Move to Dismiss Plaintiffs Petition. The deadline for the Retail Pharmacy Defendants to move to dismiss or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Petition is hereby extended to the later of 5 days following: (1) entry of an order by the Joint Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the Opioid MDL (Case No. 2804); or (2) this Court's ruling on a motion to remand. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX LLC, Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Mallinckrodt plc as Corporate Parent, filed.(McCleary, Roger) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., filed.(Smyser, Craig) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma, L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., filed.(Reed, Noelle) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Manufacturer Defendants to move to dismiss or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Original Petition is hereby extended to the later of sixty days following: (1) entry of an order by the Joint Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the Opioid MDL (Case No. 2804); or (2) this Court's ruling on a motion to remand. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Walmart Inc., filed.(Durfee, Laura) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Cephalon, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., filed.(Patterson, Nancy) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Allergan Finance LLC, filed.(Hill, Jack) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by CVS Health Corporation, filed.(Torian, Mark) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Cardinal Health, Cardinal Health 110 LLC, Cardinal Health 200 LLC, Cardinal Health 414 LLC, filed.(Mengis, Michael) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Endo International plc as Corporate Parent, filed.(Sibiski, Hannah) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., filed.(Griffin, Asher) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of Emergency Motion for Extension of Time to Move to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition re: #3 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Move to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition by CVS Health Corporation, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Torian, Mark) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM Support of Plaintiff Rockwall Countys Motion to Remand and in Opposition to Supplemental Notice of Removal re: #16 MOTION for Leave to File Forty-Page Amended Omnibus Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand and in Opposition to Supplemental Notice of Removal, #10 MOTION to Remand by Rockwall County, Tx, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Order)(McCarley, Matthew) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Forty-Page Amended Omnibus Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand and in Opposition to Supplemental Notice of Removal by Rockwall County, Tx, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McCarley, Matthew) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time To Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Original Petition by Abbott Laboratories, Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma, L.P., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., The Purdue Frederick Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Collins, Aaron) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY in Support of #3 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Move to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition, filed by CVS Health Corporation. (Torian, Mark) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #12 Notice (Other) , filed by Rockwall County, Tx. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(McCarley, Matthew) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE Supplemental Notice in Support of Removal re: #1 Notice of Removal by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Simon, Joel) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand re: #10 MOTION to Remand by Rockwall County, Tx, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(McCarley, Matthew) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand by Rockwall County, Tx, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McCarley, Matthew) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Move to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4). Telephone conference is cancelled for 6/21/2019 [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron M. Collins on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., filed. (Collins, Aaron) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER re: #3 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Move to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition, filed.(Torian, Mark) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond by Abbott Laboratories, Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma, L.P., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., The Purdue Frederick Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Collins, Aaron) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition to #3 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Move to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition, filed by Rockwall County, Tx. (McCarley, Matthew) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Telephone Conference set for 6/21/2019 at 03:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan(Signed by Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Move to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition by CVS Health Corporation, filed. (Torian, Mark) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/1/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 439th District Court, case number 1-19-0503 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22628620) filed by CVS Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Torian, Mark) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rockwall County v. CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Represented By: Joel Cameron Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: Alper T. Ertas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Aaron M. Collins
Represented By: Asher Benjamin Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Holdings Cooperative U.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Noelle M. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cupric Holdings Co. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Roger L. McCleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: David Keith Isaak
Represented By: Kristin Elizabeth Adler
Represented By: Tyler G Doyle
Represented By: Crystal Noel Robles
Represented By: Razvan Ungureanu
Represented By: Craig Smyser
Represented By: Michelle Shamblin Stratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Represented By: Roger L. McCleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 200, LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Mengis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company
Represented By: Noelle M. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: Nancy Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals Europe B.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Michael W. Mengis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisource Bergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Aaron M. Collins
Represented By: Asher Benjamin Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Hannah DeMarco Sibiski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Nancy Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AbbVie Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P.
Represented By: Noelle M. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Joel Cameron Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS TN DISTRIBUTION, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Nicolas Padron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Represented By: Nancy Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Hannah DeMarco Sibiski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Aaron M. Collins
Represented By: Asher Benjamin Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Laura Jane Durfee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 110, LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Mengis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Mark E. Torian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knoll Pharmaceutical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Manufacturing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Represented By: Roger L. McCleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
Represented By: David Keith Isaak
Represented By: Kristin Elizabeth Adler
Represented By: Tyler G Doyle
Represented By: Crystal Noel Robles
Represented By: Razvan Ungureanu
Represented By: Craig Smyser
Represented By: Michelle Shamblin Stratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Asher Benjamin Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Represented By: Nancy Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Noelle M. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 414, LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Mengis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore E. Okechuku
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Activis Inc
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rockwall County
Represented By: Kenda Culpepper
Represented By: Matthew R. McCarley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?