Village of Wappingers Falls, New York v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Village of Wappingers Falls, New York
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Noramco Inc, Actavis LLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Cephalon Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.,, Watson Laboratories Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Allergan PLC, Mallinckrodt LLC and Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019op45922
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 19 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Village of Wappingers Falls, New York. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/18/2020 filed on behalf of Village of Wappingers Falls, New York (Tate, Mark)
December 19, 2019 Filing 18 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Village of Wappingers Falls, New York. Mallinckrodt LLC waiver sent on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/18/2020 filed on behalf of Village of Wappingers Falls, New York (Tate, Mark)
December 19, 2019 Filing 17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Village of Wappingers Falls, New York. Mallinckrodt PLC waiver sent on 12/11/2019, answer due 2/10/2020 filed on behalf of Village of Wappingers Falls, New York (Tate, Mark)
December 12, 2019 Filing 16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Village of Wappingers Falls, New York. Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 12/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020 filed on behalf of Village of Wappingers Falls, New York (Tate, Mark)
December 12, 2019 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Village of Wappingers Falls, New York. Endo Health Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 12/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020 filed on behalf of Village of Wappingers Falls, New York (Tate, Mark)
December 12, 2019 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Village of Wappingers Falls, New York. Noramco Inc waiver sent on 12/9/2019, answer due 2/7/2020 filed on behalf of Village of Wappingers Falls, New York (Tate, Mark)
December 2, 2019 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Village of Wappingers Falls, New York. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 12/2/2019, answer due 1/31/2020 filed on behalf of Village of Wappingers Falls, New York (Tate, Mark)
December 2, 2019 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Village of Wappingers Falls, New York. Allergan PLC waiver sent on 11/25/2019, answer due 1/24/2020 filed on behalf of Village of Wappingers Falls, New York (Tate, Mark)
November 20, 2019 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Village of Wappingers Falls, New York. Cardinal Health Inc. waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of Village of Wappingers Falls, New York (Tate, Mark)
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Village of Wappingers Falls, New York. Watson Laboratories Inc. waiver sent on 11/11/2019, answer due 1/10/2020 filed on behalf of Village of Wappingers Falls, New York (Tate, Mark)
November 18, 2019 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Village of Wappingers Falls, New York. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 11/11/2019, answer due 1/10/2020 filed on behalf of Village of Wappingers Falls, New York (Tate, Mark)
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Village of Wappingers Falls, New York. Cephalon Inc. waiver sent on 11/11/2019, answer due 1/10/2020 filed on behalf of Village of Wappingers Falls, New York (Tate, Mark)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Village of Wappingers Falls, New York. Actavis Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 11/11/2019, answer due 1/10/2020 filed on behalf of Village of Wappingers Falls, New York (Tate, Mark)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Village of Wappingers Falls, New York. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 11/11/2019, answer due 1/10/2020 filed on behalf of Village of Wappingers Falls, New York (Tate, Mark)
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New York Southern. Case number 7:19-cv-08678. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 21, 2019 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Northern District of Ohio. (sjo) [Transferred from nysd on 10/31/2019.]
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Northern District of Ohio. (Signed by MDL Panel on 10/16/2019) (sjo) [Transferred from nysd on 10/31/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc) [Transferred from nysd on 10/31/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc) [Transferred from nysd on 10/31/2019.]
September 20, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc) [Transferred from nysd on 10/31/2019.]
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Document filed by Village of Wappingers Falls, New York.(Sultzer, Jason) [Transferred from nysd on 10/31/2019.]
September 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jason P. Sultzer to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the PDF attached for the Initial Pleading does not indicate what type of document is being filed (Complaint, Petition, Short Form Complaint, etc.). Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. ***DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS*** If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 9/24/2019. (pne) [Transferred from nysd on 10/31/2019.]
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Sultzer, Jason) [Transferred from nysd on 10/31/2019.]
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., n/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Actavis, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17621280)Document filed by The Village of Wappingers Falls, New York.(Sultzer, Jason) Modified on 9/19/2019 (pne). [Transferred from nysd on 10/31/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Village of Wappingers Falls, New York v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Wappingers Falls, New York
Represented By: Jason P. Sultzer
Represented By: Mark A. Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?