County of Burlington v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: County of Burlington
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc., Beverly Sackler, Walgreen Co, Richard S. Sackler, THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PAIN MANAGEMENT, Purdue Pharma L.P., Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Jane and John Does, Watson Laboratories Inc., Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Allergan PLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., THE ACADEMY OF INTEGRATIVE PAIN MANAGEMENT, Cardinal Health Inc., Theresa Sackler, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, RHODES TECHNOLOGIES, Rite Aid Corporation, TEVA PHARMACEUTCAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., Walgreens Eastern Co., DAVID A. SACKLER, Stuart D. Baker, Cephalon Inc., THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., Perry Fine, Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., American Pain Foundation, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Wal-Mart Stores East L.P., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Allergan Finance LLC, CVS Health Corporation, Miami-Luken Inc, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan U.S.A., Inc., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., ABBOTT LABORATRIES, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Rhodes Technologies, Inc., Kathe A. Sackler, Noramco Inc, SpecGX LLC, Jonathan D. Sackler, Russell Portenoy, Amerisource Bergen Drug Corporation, Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, Walmart Inc., JOHN N KAPOOR, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100, Purdue Pharma Inc., Lynn Webster, Scott Fishman, The Kroger Co., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P. and Anda Inc
Case Number: 1:2019op45928
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 32 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New Jersey. Case number 1:19-cv-13684. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the District of Ohio Northern. (dd, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 30 Letter from Peter L. Korn. (KORN, PETER) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER L. KORN on behalf of CVS HEALTH CORPORATION (KORN, PETER) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.]
September 26, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #27 Second MOTION to Remand to State Court. Motion set for 10/21/2019 before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.]
September 25, 2019 Filing 28 Letter from K. O'Brien re #27 Second MOTION to Remand to State Court. (O'BRIEN, KEVIN) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.]
September 25, 2019 Filing 27 Second MOTION to Remand to State Court by COUNTY OF BURLINGTON. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit)(MAGEE, GABRIEL) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.]
September 24, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #25 MOTION to Sever . Motion set for 10/21/2019 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 26 Exhibit to #25 Motion to Sever by COUNTY OF BURLINGTON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(MAGEE, GABRIEL) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.]
September 24, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Motion #25 submitted by GABRIEL CLAY MAGEE on 9/23/2019 contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE SIGNATURE PAGE ONLY WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE using event EXHIBIT TO DOCUMENT found under OTHER DOCUMENTS and link the submission to the motion. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (rss, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Sever by COUNTY OF BURLINGTON. (Attachments: #1 Memo, #2 Order)(MAGEE, GABRIEL) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.]
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Dismissing without prejudice #13 Motion to Stay, #16 Motion to Remand and #19 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 9/19/2019. (rss, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.]
September 19, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE by PURDUE PHARMA INC., PURDUE PHARMA L.P. OF SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AND AUTOMATIC STAY OF PROCEEDINGS (MATTHEWS, STEPHEN) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by AMERISOURCE BERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., MCKESSON CORPORATION re #19 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(HEWIT, RUSSELL) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #19 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MAGEE, GABRIEL) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Support filed by COUNTY OF BURLINGTON re #16 First MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(MAGEE, GABRIEL) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #19 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation. Motion set for 8/19/2019 before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by AMERISOURCE BERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., MCKESSON CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Text of Proposed Order, #23 Certificate of Service)(HEWIT, RUSSELL) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 18 BRIEF in Opposition filed by MCKESSON CORPORATION re #16 First MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate of Service)(HEWIT, RUSSELL) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by INSYS THERAPUETICS, INC. of Bankruptcy Filing and Stay Order (WILSON, BENJAMIN) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #16 First MOTION to Remand to State Court. Motion set for 8/5/2019 before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 16 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by COUNTY OF BURLINGTON. (MAGEE, GABRIEL) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER Staying discovery obligations only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 6/24/2019. (rss, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Stay re #4 Notice (Other) . Motion set for 7/15/2019 before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER by MCKESSON CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HEWIT, RUSSELL) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay re #4 Notice (Other) by COUNTY OF BURLINGTON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order)(MAGEE, GABRIEL) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER -- The Court having received plaintiff's June 19, 2019 letter [Doc. No. 9]; and good cause existing for the entry of this Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the initial conference scheduled on July 10, 2019 is POSTPONED. If necessary, the conference will be rescheduled after plaintiff's and defendants' expected forthcoming motions are decided. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 6/20/19. (Schneider, Joel) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted by COUNTY OF BURLINGTON as to WALGREENS EASTERN CO., INC.. (O'BRIEN, KEVIN) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on HD Smith Wholesale Drug Co. on 5/31/2019, filed by COUNTY OF BURLINGTON. (O'BRIEN, KEVIN) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.]
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from KEVIN P O'BRIEN, ESQ.. (O'BRIEN, KEVIN) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.]
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER by MCKESSON CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HEWIT, RUSSELL) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN HAHN on behalf of MCKESSON CORPORATION (HAHN, STEVEN) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC., ABBOTT LABORATRIES has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/3/2019. (rss, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Abbott Laboratories and Abbott Laboratories Inc... (BOYLE, PATRICK) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ANDA, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/1/2019. (rss, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Anda, Inc... (MARSCHEAN, NICOLE) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by INSYS THERAPUETICS, INC. of Bankruptcy Filing and Imposition of Automatic Stay (WILSON, BENJAMIN) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.]
June 13, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.]
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Initial Conference set for 7/10/2019 09:30 AM in Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 6/13/2019. (cry, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MCKESSON CORPORATION. (HEWIT, RUSSELL) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MCKESSON CORPORATION from Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division: Burlington County, case number BUR-L-000952-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9738864), filed by MCKESSON CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A to Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Certificate of Service)(HEWIT, RUSSELL) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Burlington v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
Represented By: Thomas John Herten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Represented By: Dennis J. Drasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Represented By: Dennis J. Drasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PAIN MANAGEMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Stephen C. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick J. Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Tanya Christine Rolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Richard Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane and John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: Harvey Bartle, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE ACADEMY OF INTEGRATIVE PAIN MANAGEMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Eric A. Inglis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Represented By: Dennis J. Drasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Thomas John Herten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Represented By: Harvey Bartle, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHODES TECHNOLOGIES
Represented By: Tanya Christine Rolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTCAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
Represented By: Harvey Bartle, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Eastern Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID A. SACKLER
Represented By: Dennis J. Drasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart D. Baker
Represented By: Patrick D. Bonner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Stephen C. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Fine
Represented By: Peter L. Korn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Del Medico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Pain Foundation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Russell Lyle Hewit
Represented By: Steven Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Del Medico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Represented By: Dennis J. Drasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Peter L. Korn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami-Luken Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Thomas John Herten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Harvey Bartle, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen C. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABBOTT LABORATRIES
Represented By: Patrick J. Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Represented By: Dennis J. Drasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Tanya Christine Rolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A. Sackler
Represented By: Dennis J. Drasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Sackler
Represented By: Dennis J. Drasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Portenoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisource Bergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Shannon E. McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Represented By: Dennis J. Drasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN N KAPOOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Stephen C. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Represented By: Tanya Christine Rolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Represented By: Nicole Michele Marschean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Burlington
Represented By: Gabriel C. Magee
Represented By: Tobias L. Millrood
Represented By: Kevin Patrick O'Brien
Represented By: Harris L. Pogust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?