City of Pascagoula, Mississippi v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC f/k/a Allergan, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Anda, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., CVS RX Services, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Insys Therapeutics, Inc, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. n/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.,, ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. f/k/a WATSON PHARMA, INC.,, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Actavis Elizabeth, LLC, ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC, F/K/A/ ACTAVIS, INC., F/K/A WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Walmart, Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Actavis, LLC, The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., WALGREEN CO., Cephalon, Inc., CVS TN DISTRIBUTION, LLC, Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., f/k/a Watson Laboratories, Inc.-Salt Lake City, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Actavis Kadian, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Johnson & Johnson, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., f/k/a Watson Laboratories, Inc.-Florida, Actavis Totowa, LLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC,, KVK-Tech, Inc., SpecGX LLC, Noramco, Inc., Morris & Dickson Co., LLC., Mississippi CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. f/k/a Par Pharmaceutical Holdings, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., MALLINCKRODT PLC, and Allergan USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019op45934
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 37 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi. CVS Pharmacy, LLC waiver sent on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019 filed on behalf of The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi (Mestayer, Matthew)
December 19, 2019 Filing 36 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019 filed on behalf of The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi (Mestayer, Matthew)
December 17, 2019 Filing 35 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi. Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019; Anda, Inc. waiver sent on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019 filed on behalf of The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi (Mestayer, Matthew)
December 16, 2019 Filing 34 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi. WALGREEN CO. waiver sent on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019 filed on behalf of The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi (Mestayer, Matthew)
December 3, 2019 Filing 33 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi. Mallinckrodt LLC waiver sent on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019 filed on behalf of The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi (Mestayer, Matthew)
December 3, 2019 Filing 32 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi. SpecGX LLC waiver sent on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019 filed on behalf of The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi (Mestayer, Matthew)
December 3, 2019 Filing 31 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi. Walmart, Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. waiver sent on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019 filed on behalf of The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi (Mestayer, Matthew)
November 27, 2019 Filing 30 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi. Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. waiver sent on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019 filed on behalf of The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi (Mestayer, Matthew)
November 27, 2019 Filing 29 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi. Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. f/k/a Par Pharmaceutical Holdings, Inc. waiver sent on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019 filed on behalf of The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi (Mestayer, Matthew)
November 27, 2019 Filing 28 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi. Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019 filed on behalf of The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi (Mestayer, Matthew)
November 27, 2019 Filing 27 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi. Endo Health Solutions, Inc. waiver sent on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019 filed on behalf of The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi (Mestayer, Matthew)
November 26, 2019 Filing 26 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi. CVS RX Services, Inc. waiver sent on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019 filed on behalf of The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi (Mestayer, Matthew)
November 26, 2019 Filing 25 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi. CVS TN DISTRIBUTION, LLC waiver sent on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019 filed on behalf of The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi (Mestayer, Matthew)
November 26, 2019 Filing 24 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi. CVS Pharmacy, Inc. waiver sent on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019 filed on behalf of The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi (Mestayer, Matthew)
November 26, 2019 Filing 23 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi. Mississippi CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. waiver sent on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019 filed on behalf of The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi (Mestayer, Matthew)
November 25, 2019 Filing 22 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi. Noramco, Inc. waiver sent on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019 filed on behalf of The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi (Mestayer, Matthew)
November 22, 2019 Filing 21 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi. Allergan Sales, LLC waiver sent on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019 filed on behalf of The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi (Mestayer, Matthew)
November 22, 2019 Filing 20 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi. Allergan USA, Inc. waiver sent on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019 filed on behalf of The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi (Mestayer, Matthew)
November 22, 2019 Filing 19 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi. ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC, F/K/A/ ACTAVIS, INC., F/K/A WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. waiver sent on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019 filed on behalf of The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi (Mestayer, Matthew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 18 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi. AmerisourceBergen Corporation waiver sent on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019 filed on behalf of The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi (Mestayer, Matthew)
November 13, 2019 Filing 17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi. Cardinal Health, Inc. waiver sent on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019 filed on behalf of The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi (Mestayer, Matthew)
November 8, 2019 Filing 16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi. KVK-Tech, Inc. waiver sent on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019 filed on behalf of The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi (Mestayer, Matthew)
November 8, 2019 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi. Morris & Dickson Co., LLC. waiver sent on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019 filed on behalf of The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi (Mestayer, Matthew)
November 8, 2019 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi. TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019 filed on behalf of The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi (Mestayer, Matthew)
November 8, 2019 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi. Cephalon, Inc. waiver sent on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019 filed on behalf of The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi (Mestayer, Matthew)
November 8, 2019 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi. Watson Laboratories, Inc. waiver sent on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019 filed on behalf of The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi (Mestayer, Matthew)
November 8, 2019 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi. Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., f/k/a Watson Laboratories, Inc.-Florida waiver sent on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019 filed on behalf of The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi (Mestayer, Matthew)
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi. Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., f/k/a Watson Laboratories, Inc.-Salt Lake City waiver sent on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019 filed on behalf of The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi (Mestayer, Matthew)
November 8, 2019 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi. Actavis Totowa, LLC waiver sent on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019 filed on behalf of The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi (Mestayer, Matthew)
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi. Actavis South Atlantic LLC waiver sent on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019 filed on behalf of The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi (Mestayer, Matthew)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi. Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC waiver sent on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019 filed on behalf of The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi (Mestayer, Matthew)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi. Actavis Kadian, LLC waiver sent on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019 filed on behalf of The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi (Mestayer, Matthew)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi. Actavis Elizabeth, LLC waiver sent on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019 filed on behalf of The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi (Mestayer, Matthew)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi. ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. f/k/a WATSON PHARMA, INC., waiver sent on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019 filed on behalf of The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi (Mestayer, Matthew)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi. Actavis, LLC waiver sent on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019 filed on behalf of The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi (Mestayer, Matthew)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon All Defendants. (P,R)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9588121. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:17-md-02804. Filed by The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Mestayer, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Pascagoula, Mississippi v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC f/k/a Allergan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS RX Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. n/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. f/k/a WATSON PHARMA, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Elizabeth, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC, F/K/A/ ACTAVIS, INC., F/K/A WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis South Atlantic LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALGREEN CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS TN DISTRIBUTION, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., f/k/a Watson Laboratories, Inc.-Salt Lake City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Kadian, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., f/k/a Watson Laboratories, Inc.-Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Totowa, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVK-Tech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co., LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. f/k/a Par Pharmaceutical Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT PLC,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The City of Pascagoula, Mississippi
Represented By: Matthew G. Mestayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?