County of Ocean, New Jersey v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: City of Trenton, New Jersey and County of Ocean, New Jersey
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Beverly Sackler, Walgreen Co, Richard S. Sackler, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 ENGAGED IN THE DISTRIBUTION OF OPIOIDS, Purdue Pharma L.P., Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Jane and John Does, Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Theresa Sackler, Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Russell Portenoy, Actavis LLC, RHODES TECHNOLOGIES, Rite Aid Corporation, Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Walgreens Eastern Co., American Academy of Pain Magangement, David A. Sackler, Stuart D. Baker, Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Perry Fine, Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100, American Pain Foundation, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Wal-Mart Stores East L.P., John N. Kapoor, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Allergan Finance LLC, CVS Health Corporation, Miami-Luken Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Walmart Inc., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Anda Inc, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 ENGAGED IN THE MANUFACTURING OF OPIOIDS, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Rhodes Technologies, Inc., Kathe A. Sackler, Noramco Inc, SpecGX LLC, Jonathan D. Sackler, H. D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company, Academy of Integrative Pain Management, Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Purdue Pharma Inc., Lynn Webster, Scott Fishman, The Kroger Co., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., Allergan USA, Inc. and The Purdue Fredrick Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019op46157
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 38 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New Jersey. Case number 3:19-cv-17138. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 19, 2019 Filing 37 Transfer Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the USDC for the Northern District of Ohio. (dm) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
December 2, 2019 Filing 36 BRIEF in Opposition filed by MCKESSON CORPORATION re #35 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Ocean County's Motion to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service)(HEWIT, RUSSELL) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
November 25, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #35 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Ocean County's Motion to Remand. Motion set for 12/16/2019 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
November 22, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Ocean County's Motion to Remand by CITY OF TRENTON, NJ. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in support of Trenton, New Jersey's Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Ocean County's Remand Motion, #2 Declaration Scolnick Declaration in Support, #3 Exhibit A - redline of McKesson notices of removal, #4 Exhibit B - Ocean County Motion_Memo to Vacate CTO-111, #5 Exhibit C - Trenton Brief re Vacate CTO-111)(SCOLNICK, JUDITH) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
November 14, 2019 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by COUNTY OF OCEAN, NEW JERSEY. TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. served on 11/8/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (GROSSMAN, MARC) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
October 21, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #32 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation. Motion set for 11/18/2019 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
October 21, 2019 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by COUNTY OF OCEAN, NEW JERSEY. (GROSSMAN, MARC) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
October 21, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., MCKESSON CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Certificate of Service)(HEWIT, RUSSELL) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
October 21, 2019 Filing 31 BRIEF in Opposition filed by MCKESSON CORPORATION re #28 MOTION to Remand to the Superior Court of New Jersey Law Division: Ocean County (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate of Service)(HEWIT, RUSSELL) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
October 21, 2019 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by COUNTY OF OCEAN, NEW JERSEY. (KASSAN, RANDI) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
October 4, 2019 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by H. D. SMITH WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY identifying AmeriSourceBergen Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (MUSKETT, EILEEN) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
October 3, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #28 MOTION to Remand to the Superior Court of New Jersey Law Division: Ocean County. Motion set for 11/4/2019 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
October 2, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Remand to the Superior Court of New Jersey Law Division: Ocean County by COUNTY OF OCEAN, NEW JERSEY. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit Dkt. No. 1, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(GROSSMAN, MARC) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by COUNTY OF OCEAN, NEW JERSEY. (GROSSMAN, MARC) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
September 19, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE by PURDUE PHARMA L.P., PURDUE PHARMA, INC. OF SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AND AUTOMATIC STAY OF PROCEEDINGS (MATTHEWS, STEPHEN) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
September 17, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by KURT MICHAEL MULLEN on behalf of JOHN N. KAPOOR (MULLEN, KURT) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER that Defendants shall have through and including 30 days after the later (i) of this Courts ruling on any motion to remand, should Plaintiff file one, or (ii) the final decision of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation regarding any transfer of this case to the multidistrict litigation In re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation, MDL No. 2804 (N.D. Ohio), to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 09/13/2019. (jmh) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
September 13, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC., WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., THE P.F. LABORATORIES, INC., RHODES PHARMACEUTICALS L.P., PAR PHARMACEUTICALS COMPANIES, INC., JOHN N. KAPOOR, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ABBOTT LABORATORIES, CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC., SPECGX LLC, CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, ACTAVIS LLC, RHODES TECHNOLOGIES, INC., AMERICAN PAIN FOUNDATION, WALGREENS EASTERN CO., INC., MALLINCKRODT PLC, STUART D. BAKER, WALGREEN, CO., WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP, RITE AID CORPORATION, PURDUE PHARMA L.P., RHODES PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, WATSON LABORATORIES, INC., RHODES TECHNOLOGIES, WALMART INC., MCKESSON CORPORATION, CEPHALON, INC., H. D. SMITH WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY, ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., PURDUE PHARMA, INC., ALLERGAN USA INC., ANDA, INC., AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., ALLERGAN PLC, ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/13/2019. (eaj) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
September 13, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #22 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by NORAMCO, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/25/2019. (jem) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
September 13, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #18 Application for Extension of Time filed by Russell Hewit, Esq. on 9/11/2019 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. For future reference, when using the event motion, you must file a Notice of Motion along with the other documents required by the rules of this Court. The Clerks office has terminated the calendar event created by this filing and will forward this request to chambers. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jem) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 23 Letter from McKesson Corporation re #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Respond to Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Supplement to Letter Requesting Extension of Time (corrected), #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order (corrected))(HEWIT, RUSSELL) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 22 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Noramco, Inc... (PENARO, STEVEN) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN L. PENARO on behalf of NORAMCO, INC. (PENARO, STEVEN) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN JOSEPH HAGGERTY on behalf of H. D. SMITH WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY (HAGGERTY, JOHN) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by EILEEN O. MUSKETT on behalf of H. D. SMITH WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY (MUSKETT, EILEEN) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Respond to Complaint by ABBOTT LABORATORIES, ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC., ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC, ALLERGAN PLC, ALLERGAN USA INC., AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, ANDA, INC., STUART D. BAKER, CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., CEPHALON, INC., CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., H. D. SMITH WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY, INSYS THERAPEUTICS, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHN N. KAPOOR, ILENE SACKLER LEFCOURT, MALLINCKRODT LLC, MALLINCKRODT PLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, NORAMCO, INC., ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICALS COMPANIES, INC., PURDUE PHARMA L.P., PURDUE PHARMA, INC., RHODES PHARMACEUTICALS L.P., RHODES PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., RHODES TECHNOLOGIES, RHODES TECHNOLOGIES, INC., RITE AID CORPORATION, BEVERLY SACKLER, DAVID A. SACKLER, JONATHAN D. SACKLER, KATHE A. SACKLER, MORTIMER D.A. SACKLER, RICHARD S. SACKLER, THERESA SACKLER, SPECGX LLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., THE P.F. LABORATORIES, INC., THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., TRUST FOR THE BENEFIT OF MEMBERS OF THE RAYMOND SACKLER FAMILY, WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC., WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP, WALGREEN, CO., WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE, INC., WALGREENS EASTERN CO., INC., WALMART INC., WATSON LABORATORIES, INC., WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (City of Trenton Stipulation and Order for Ext of Time), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(HEWIT, RUSSELL) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
September 10, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by COUNTY OF OCEAN, NEW JERSEY. (GROSSMAN, MARC) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by COUNTY OF OCEAN, NEW JERSEY. (GROSSMAN, MARC) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by COUNTY OF OCEAN, NEW JERSEY. ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC. served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (GROSSMAN, MARC) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by COUNTY OF OCEAN, NEW JERSEY. ABBOTT LABORATORIES served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (GROSSMAN, MARC) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by COUNTY OF OCEAN, NEW JERSEY. (GROSSMAN, MARC) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by COUNTY OF OCEAN, NEW JERSEY. (GROSSMAN, MARC) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by COUNTY OF OCEAN, NEW JERSEY. (GROSSMAN, MARC) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by COUNTY OF OCEAN, NEW JERSEY. RHODES TECHNOLOGIES served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (GROSSMAN, MARC) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by COUNTY OF OCEAN, NEW JERSEY. THE P.F. LABORATORIES, INC. served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (GROSSMAN, MARC) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by COUNTY OF OCEAN, NEW JERSEY. PURDUE PHARMA, INC. served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (GROSSMAN, MARC) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by COUNTY OF OCEAN, NEW JERSEY. PURDUE PHARMA L.P. served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (GROSSMAN, MARC) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by COUNTY OF OCEAN, NEW JERSEY. THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC. served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (GROSSMAN, MARC) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by COUNTY OF OCEAN, NEW JERSEY. (GROSSMAN, MARC) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to McKesson Corporation and all Joining Defendants.. (HEWIT, RUSSELL) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN HAHN on behalf of MCKESSON CORPORATION (HAHN, STEVEN) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman no longer assigned to case. (jjc, ) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (eaj) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MCKESSON CORPORATION. (HEWIT, RUSSELL) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MCKESSON CORPORATION from Superior Court of New Jersey, case number OCN-L-1474-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9915993), filed by MCKESSON CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Appendix A to Civil Cover Sheet: Attorney Contact Information, #5 Certificate of Service)(HEWIT, RUSSELL) [Transferred from njd on 12/30/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Ocean, New Jersey v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 ENGAGED IN THE DISTRIBUTION OF OPIOIDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane and John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Portenoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHODES TECHNOLOGIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Eastern Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Academy of Pain Magangement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart D. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Pain Foundation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Russell Lyle Hewit
Represented By: Steven Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John N. Kapoor
Represented By: Kurt M. Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami-Luken Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 ENGAGED IN THE MANUFACTURING OF OPIOIDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Penaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company
Represented By: Eileen O. Muskett
Represented By: John J. Haggerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Academy of Integrative Pain Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Fredrick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Trenton, New Jersey
Represented By: Judith S. Scolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Ocean, New Jersey
Represented By: Marc D. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?