Tilley et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: K. B. Tilley and Mary Tilley
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Richard S. Sackler, Purdue Pharma L.P., Beverly Sackler, Mallinckrodt PLC, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Jonathon D. Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., RHODES TECHNOLOGIES, David A. Sackler, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Rhodes Technologies Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, Kathe A. Sackler, SpecGX LLC, Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, Purdue Pharma Inc. and Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Case Number: 1:2019op46166
Filed: December 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Filing 13 Notice Regarding Potential Nonpart Fault Under W. WV. Code 55-7-13d filed by McKesson Corporation. (Hobart, Geoffrey)
February 4, 2020 Filing 12 Notice Regarding Non-Party Fault Under W.Va. Code 55-7-13(d)(1)(2) filed by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. (Zerrusen, Sandra)
December 31, 2019 Filing 11 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of West Virginia Southern. Case number 2:19-cv-00566. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 18, 2019 Filing 10 TRANSFER ORDER, JUDICIAL PANEL ON MDL: certified copy from the Northern District of Ohio transferring this action to the USDC/NDOH for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. Signed by Karen K. Caldwell, Chair for the Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 12/18/2019. (cc: attys) (kew) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/31/2019.]
December 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTIFICATION FROM JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION re: Transfer Order MDL 2804. (kew) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/31/2019.]
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF HEARING SESSION set for 12/05/2019 and HEARING SESSION ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (ts) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/31/2019.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER #1 Complaint by McKesson Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Mary Tilley, K. B. Tilley. (Jessee, Russell) (Modified on 9/9/2019 to add party filers) (kew). [Transferred from wvsd on 12/31/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., SpecGx LLC, Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Rhodes Technologies, Rhodes Technologies Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mary Tilley, K. B. Tilley (Markins, Michael) (Modified on 9/4/2019 to add party filers) (kew). [Transferred from wvsd on 12/31/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF LAWSUIT AND REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS (Form 1A) by K.B. Tilley, Mary Tilley for Actavis Pharma, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, McKesson Corporation, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies, Rhodes Technologies Inc., Trust for the Benefit of the Raymond Sackler Family, Richard S. Sackler, Beverly Sackler, David A. Sackler, Jonathon D. Sackler, Kathe A. Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Theresa Sackler, SpecGx LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC with proposed Waiver of Service of Summons Form. (Attachments: #1 AmerisourceBergen, #2 Endo Health Solutions, #3 Endo Pharmaceuticals, #4 Ilene Sackler, #5 Mallinckrodt Enterprises, #6 McKesson, #7 P.F. Laboratories, #8 Par Pharma, #9 Purdue Frederick Company, #10 Purdue Pharma L.P., #11 Purdue Pharma Inc., #12 Rhodes Pharma., Inc., #13 Rhodes Pharam, L.P., #14 Rhodes Technologies, #15 Rhodes Technologies, Ins., #16 Sackler Family Trust, #17 Richard Sackler, #18 Beverly Sackler, #19 David Sackler, #20 Jonathan Sackler, #21 Kathe Sackler, #22 Mortimer Sackler, #23 Theresa Sackler, #24 SpecGX LLC, #25 Mallinckrodt, plc)(Adams, Benjamin) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/31/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Actavis Pharma, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Rhodes Pharaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., Rhodes Technologies, Rhodes Technologies Inc., Beverly Sackler, David A. Sackler, Jonathon D. Sackler, Kathe A. Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard S. Sackler, Theresa Sackler, SpecGx LLC, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Trust for the Benefit of the Raymond Sackler Family, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, #2 Summons as to Beverly Sackler, #3 Summons as to David A. Sackler, #4 Summons as to Endo Health Solutions Inc., #5 Summons as to Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #6 Summons as to Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, #7 Summons as to Jonathon D. Sackler, #8 Summons as to Kathe A. Sackler, #9 Summons as to Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, #10 Summons as to Mallinckrodt PLC, #11 Summons as to McKesson Corporation, #12 Summons as to Mortimer D.A. Sackler, #13 Summons as to Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #14 Summons as to Purdue Pharma L.P., #15 Summons as to Purdue Pharma, Inc., #16 Summons as to Rhodes Pharaceuticals L.P., #17 Summons as to Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., #18 Summons as to Rhodes Technologies Inc., #19 Summons as to Rhodes Technologies, #20 Summons as to Richard S. Sackler, #21 Summons as to SpecGx LLC, #22 Summons as to The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., #23 Summons as to The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., #24 Summons as to Theresa Sackler, #25 Summons as to Trust for the Benefit of the Raymond Sackler Family) (kew) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/31/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by K.B. Tilley, Mary Tilley for All Defendants, re: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Actavis, #2 AmerisourceBergen, #3 Endo Health Solutions, #4 Endo Pharmaceuticals, #5 Ilene Sackler, #6 Mallinckrodt Enterprises, #7 Mallinckrodt plc, #8 McKesson, #9 P.F. Laboratories, #10 Par Pharmaceuticals, #11 Purdue Fredrick Company, #12 Purdue Pharma, Inc., #13 Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #14 Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, LP, #15 Rhodes Technolgies Inc., #16 Rhodes Technologies, #17 Sackler Family Trust, #18 Beverly Sackler, #19 David A. Sackler, #20 Jonathan D. Sackler, #21 Kathe Sackler, #22 Mortimer Sackler, #23 Richard Sackler, #24 Theresa Sackler, #25 SpecGX LLC)(Adams, Benjamin) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/31/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mms) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/31/2019.]
August 2, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/31/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7338291. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mms) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/31/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tilley et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: John Joseph Meadows
Represented By: Russell D. Jessee
Represented By: Geoffrey E. Hobart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Michael P. Markins
Represented By: Jennifer Anne Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Represented By: Michael P. Markins
Represented By: Jennifer Anne Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathon D. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Erik W. Legg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHODES TECHNOLOGIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin M. Eddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Represented By: Erik W. Legg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Erik W. Legg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Gretchen M. Callas
Represented By: Alvin L. Emch
Represented By: Sandra K. Zerrusen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Keith J. George
Represented By: Stephen D. Annand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Represented By: Keith J. George
Represented By: Stephen D. Annand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Michael P. Markins
Represented By: Jennifer Anne Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. B. Tilley
Represented By: Timothy P. Lupardus
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Alexander D. McLaughlin
Represented By: L. Dante DiTrapano
Represented By: W. Stuart Calwell
Represented By: R. Booth Goodwin, II
Represented By: Benjamin D. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Tilley
Represented By: Timothy P. Lupardus
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Alexander D. McLaughlin
Represented By: L. Dante DiTrapano
Represented By: W. Stuart Calwell
Represented By: R. Booth Goodwin, II
Represented By: Benjamin D. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?