Board of County Commissioners of Jefferson County v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: Board of County Commissioners of Jefferson County
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., MD William Valuck, Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, The, Physicians Total Care Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc., Watson Pharmaceutcals, Inc., Actavis plc, Keysource Medical, Inc., Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Russell Portenoy, Actavis LLC, Allergan PLC, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Perry Fine, Walgreen Co., Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Cardinal Health Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Harvey Jenkins, Anda Inc, McKesson Corp., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, GCP Pharma LLC, Watson Pharma, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Purdue Pharma Inc. and Lynn Webster
Case Number: 1:2019op46170
Filed: December 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2019 Filing 61 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Oklahoma Western. Case number 5:19-cv-00721. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 18, 2019 Filing 60 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to District of Ohio for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Dan A Polster. Signed by Clerk of the Panel. (kmt) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
October 25, 2019 Filing 59 REPLY to Response to Motion re #52 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
October 18, 2019 Filing 58 RESPONSE to Motion re #52 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Board of County Commissioners of Jefferson County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Opioid MDL Dkt 130, #2 Exhibit 2-OOpioid MDL Dkt 232)(Court, Todd) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
October 10, 2019 Filing 57 ENTRY of Appearance by Don W Danz on behalf of Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc (Danz, Don) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
September 27, 2019 Filing 56 RESPONSE in Opposition re #43 MOTION to Expedite filed by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -126 Similar Case List)(Sparks, John) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
September 27, 2019 Filing 55 RESPONSE in Opposition re #42 MOTION to Remand filed by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Sparks, John) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
September 27, 2019 Filing 54 RESPONSE to Motion re #43 MOTION to Expedite filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
September 27, 2019 Filing 53 RESPONSE to Motion re #42 MOTION to Remand filed by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - OH Stmt of Interest, #2 Exhibit 2 - OH Order on Mtn to Remand)(Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
September 27, 2019 Filing 52 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Ada Stay Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Seminole Stay Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Osage Stay Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - Pawnee Stay Order, #5 Exhibit 5 - Delaware Stay Order, #6 Exhibit 6 - Order Granting Stay, #7 Exhibit 7 - CTO 107, #8 Exhibit 8 - Wis Stay Order, #9 Exhibit 9 - Cal Stay Order, #10 Exhibit 10 - Ky Stay Order, #11 Exhibit 11 - 6 Cty Transfer Order, #12 Exhibit 12 - 1 Cty Transfer Order, #13 Exhibit 13 - 7 Cty Transfer Order, #14 Exhibit 14 - 6 Cty Transfer Order, #15 Exhibit 15 - CTO 108, #16 Exhibit 16 - Alameda Stay Order, #17 Exhibit 17 - Portland Stay Order, #18 Exhibit 18 - EDVA Stay Order, #19 Exhibit 19 - WDVA Stay Order, #20 Exhibit 20 - Cal Stay Order, #21 Exhibit 21 - Ill Stay Order, #22 Exhibit 22 - Fla Deferral Order)(Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #50 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Sanford C Coats terminated. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/26/2019. (mb) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
September 25, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Sanford C. Coats by The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP. (Coats, Sanford) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #46 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12. Defendants shall file their answer or other responsive pleadings to Plaintiffs Complaint not later thanforty-five (45) days following the later of the final determination of any motion to remand or transfer of this action to the MDL Panel. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/17/2019. (mb) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY by Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy)(Burns, Joshua) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 47 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey A Curran on behalf of Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc (Curran, Jeffrey) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-District Court Order)(Quinn, Ashley) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 45 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Quinn, Ashley) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 44 ENTRY of Appearance by Ashley E Quinn on behalf of Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc (Quinn, Ashley) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION to Expedite by Board of County Commissioners of Jefferson County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Weber Cty. v. Purdue Pharma, L.P., #2 Exhibit 2 - Uintah Cty. v. Purdue Pharma, L.P., #3 Exhibit 3 - Town of Randolph v. Purdue Pharma L.P., #4 Exhibit 4 - Dinwiddie Cty, Va. v. Purdue Pharma, L.P., #5 Exhibit 5 - Illinois Public Risk Fund v. Purdue Pharma L.P.)(Court, Todd) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION to Remand by Board of County Commissioners of Jefferson County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Trotter v. Smith et al., #2 Exhibit 2 - Adams v. Wyeth)(Court, Todd) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #40 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Manufacturer Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Petition by sixty (60) days after the later of: 1) A decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation granting a motion to vacate aconditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action; or 2) This Courts ruling on any motion to remand this action. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 8/28/2019. (mb) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 40 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #36 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Petition 60 days following: 1) a decision by the JPML transferring this case to the Opiate MDL or granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action, or otherwise finally denying the transfer of this action; or 2) this Courts ruling on any motion to remand, whichever is later. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 8/22/2019. (mb) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #33 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition Under Rule 12. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 8/20/19. (kmt) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #22 Unopposed Joint Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 8/20/19. (kmt) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 36 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Riddles, D) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 35 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Riddles, D) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 34 ENTRY of Appearance by D Todd Riddles on behalf of Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc (Riddles, D) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 33 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Repond to Plaintiff's Petition Under Rule 12 by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc. (Sharpe, G) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 32 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation . (Huntsman, Susan) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 31 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by The Purdue Frederick Company . (Coats, Sanford) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 30 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Purdue Pharma Inc . (Coats, Sanford) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 29 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Purdue Pharma LP . (Coats, Sanford) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 28 ENTRY of Appearance by Evan H Way on behalf of The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP (Way, Evan) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 27 ENTRY of Appearance by Joshua D Burns on behalf of The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP (Burns, Joshua) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 26 ENTRY of Appearance by Sanford C Coats on behalf of The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP (Coats, Sanford) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 25 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc . (Merkley, Nicholas) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 24 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas V Merkley on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc (Merkley, Nicholas) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 23 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert G McCampbell on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc (McCampbell, Robert) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 22 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 21 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 20 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Health Solutions Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 19 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond E Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 Amerisource Bergen Drug Corp.'s Motion to Correct Caption and to Reflect Substitution of Party. The Court Clerk is directed to correct the docket to show that AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation is the party defendant, rather than AmerisourceBergen Corp. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 8/9/2019. (mb) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by McKesson Corp . (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 16 Receipt for Money Received from Board of County Commissioners of Jefferson County in the amount of $400.00, receipt number OKW500075502 regarding #1 Notice of Removal. (nv) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Corp (McBride, D) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Amend/Correct Caption to Reflect Substitution of Party by Amerisourcebergen Corp. (Huntsman, Susan) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Corp (Huntsman, Susan) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti for all further proceedings. Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti no longer assigned to case. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 8/8/19. (jw) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Honorable David L. Russell recused. Case reassigned to Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti for all further proceedings. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 8/8/19. (jw) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Harvard Drug Group LLC The . (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cardinal Health Inc . (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Harvard Drug Group LLC The (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT Notice of Removal by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summonses, #4 Exhibit 4 - Return of Service (Jenkins), #5 Exhibit 5 - Denial of Allegations (Valuck), #6 Exhibit 6 - Return of Service (Fine), #7 Exhibit 7 - Return of Service (Portenoy), #8 Exhibit 8 - Return of Service (Valuck), #9 Exhibit 9 - Return of Service (Webster), #10 Exhibit 10 - Appearance (AmerisourceBergen), #11 Exhibit 11 - Appearance (Quest), #12 Exhibit 12 - Motion for Enlargement (Quest), #13 Exhibit 13 - Appearance (McKesson), #14 Exhibit 14 - Motion for Enlargement (McKesson), #15 Exhibit 15 - Appearance (Cardinal), #16 Exhibit 16 - Order Granting Motion (CVS)(, #17 Exhibit 17 - Order Granting Motion (McKesson), #18 Exhibit 18 - Order Granting Motion (Quest), #19 Exhibit 19 - Motion for Enlargement (CVS), #20 Exhibit 20 - Motion for Extension (MFs), #21 Exhibit 21 - Order Granting Motion (MFs), #22 Exhibit 22 - Appearance (Anda), #23 Exhibit 23 - Motion for Enlargement (Anda), #24 Exhibit 24 - Order Granting Motion (Anda), #25 Exhibit 25 - LCvR7.1)(Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Stuart D Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael W Ridgeway on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc (Ridgeway, Michael) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Sparks, John) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by John H Sparks on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc (Sparks, John) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jefferson County District Court, case number CJ-19-1 filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - J&J and Janssen Service Packet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons; Anda, Inc., #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons; Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc, #5 Exhibit 5 - Summons; Cardinal Health, #6 Exhibit 6 - Summons; Cephalon, #7 Exhibit 7 - Summons; CVS Health Corp, #8 Exhibit 8 - Summons; CVS Pharmacy, #9 Exhibit 9 - Summons; Endo Pharmaceuticals, #10 Exhibit 10 - Summons; Endo Health Solutions, #11 Exhibit 11 - Summons; GCP Pharma, #12 Exhibit 12 - Summons; Jenkins, #13 Exhibit 13 - Summons; Insys Therapeutics, #14 Exhibit 14 - Summons; Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc, #15 Exhibit 15 - Summons; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc, #16 Exhibit 16 - Summons; Johnson & Johnson, #17 Exhibit 17 - Summons; Keysource Medical, #18 Exhibit 18 - Summons; Physicians Total Care, Inc, #19 Exhibit 19 - Summons; Purdue Pharma, #20 Exhibit 20 - Summons; Purdue Frederick Company, #21 Exhibit 21 - Summons; Walgreens Boots Alliance, #22 Exhibit 22 - Summons; William Valuck, #23 Exhibit 23 - Summons; Physicians Total Care, #24 Exhibit 24 - Summons; Watson Pharma, #25 Exhibit 25 - Summons; Watson Pharmaceuticals, #26 Exhibit 26 - Summons; Watson Laboratories, #27 Exhibit 27 - Summons; Walgreens Boots Alliance, #28 Exhibit 28 - Summons; Harvard Drug Group, #29 Exhibit 29 - Summons; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, #30 Exhibit 30 - Summons; Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, #31 Exhibit 31 - Summons; Russell Portenoy, #32 Exhibit 32 - Summons; Quest Pharmaceuticals, #33 Exhibit 33 - Summons; Purdue Pharma, #34 Exhibit 34 - Summons; Physicians Total Care, #35 Exhibit 35 - Summons; Perry Fine, #36 Exhibit 36 - Summons; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen, #37 Exhibit 37 - Summons; Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, #38 Exhibit 38 - Summons; Morris & Dickson Co, #39 Exhibit 39 - Summons; Webster, #40 Exhibit 40 - Summons; McKesson Corp, #41 Exhibit 41 - Summons; Mallinckrodt PLC, #42 Exhibit 43 - Summons; Actavis LLC, #43 Exhibit 43 - Summons; Actavis LLC, #44 Exhibit 44 - Summons; Actavis PLC, #45 Exhibit 45 - Summons; Actavis Pharma, #46 Exhibit 46 - Summons; Allergan PLC, #47 Exhibit 47 -Summons; AmerisouceBergen, #48 Exhibit 48 - Summons; Harvey Jenkins, #49 Exhibit 49 - Denial of Allegations, #50 Exhibit 50 - Summons Returned; William Valuck, #51 Exhibit 51 - Summons Returned; Russel Portenoy, #52 Exhibit 52 - Summons Returned; Perry Fine, #53 Exhibit 53 - Summons Returned; Lynn Webster, #54 Exhibit 54 - EoA for AmerisourceBergen, #55 Exhibit 55 - EoA Quest Pharmaceuticals, #56 Exhibit 56 - Quest Pharmacauticals Unopposed MEoT, #57 Exhibit 57 - EoA - McKesson Corp, #58 Exhibit 58 - EoA and MEoT McKesson, AmerisourceB, Harvard, Cardinal, #59 Exhibit 59 - EoA Cardinal Health, #60 Exhibit 60 - Order Granting MEot, Mtn to Sub Parties, #61 Exhibit 61 - Order Granting Quest's MEoT, #62 Exhibit 62 - CVS, Walgreens MEoT, #63 Exhibit 63 - Order Granting CVS, Walgreens MEoT, #64 Exhibit 64 - Manufacturer Defs MEoT, #65 Exhibit 65 - Order Granting Manufacturer MEoT, #66 Exhibit 66 - Anda Pharma, Anda Inc EoA, #67 Exhibit 67 - Anda Pharma, Anda Inc MEoT, #68 Exhibit 68 - Order Granting Anda MEoT, #69 Exhibit 69 - Docket Sheet - Jefferson County, #70 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of County Commissioners of Jefferson County v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Represented By: G. Calvin Sharpe
Represented By: Don W. Danz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: Michael W. Ridgeway
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD William Valuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Sanford C. Coats
Represented By: Joshua D. Burns
Represented By: Evan H. Way
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Alan Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Joe Michael Hampton
Represented By: Amy Jo Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, The
Represented By: Sanford C. Coats
Represented By: Joshua D. Burns
Represented By: Evan H. Way
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians Total Care Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V. Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceutcals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keysource Medical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V. Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Michael W. Ridgeway
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Raymond E. Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Portenoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V. Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Drug Group LLC The
Represented By: Ryan A. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: D. Todd Riddles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V. Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V. Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Fine
Represented By: Robert A. Bragalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: G. Calvin Sharpe
Represented By: Don W. Danz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By: G. Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Ryan A. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: G. Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Raymond E. Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Michael W. Ridgeway
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvey Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp.
Represented By: Stuart D. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: D. Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Susan E. Huntsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCP Pharma LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V. Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Represented By: G. Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Michael W. Ridgeway
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Sanford C. Coats
Represented By: Joshua D. Burns
Represented By: Evan H. Way
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Webster
Represented By: Robert A. Bragalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of County Commissioners of Jefferson County
Represented By: Todd A. Court
Represented By: Matthew J. Sill
Represented By: Tony G. Puckett
Represented By: Harrison C. Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?