Moss v. Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: PEGGY MOSS
Defendant: Endo International plc, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mylan Technologies, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., ALLEGAN PLC, Actavis Pharma, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, MYLAN LABORATORIES INC. and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA
Case Number: 1:2019op46182
Filed: December 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2019 Filing 12 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Pennsylvania Eastern. Case number 2:19-cv-03611. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 31, 2019 Original record transferred to the Northern District of Ohio via interdistrict transfer system. (md) [Transferred from paed on 12/31/2019.]
December 18, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFIED COPY OF TRANSFER ORDER THAT the actions listed on Schedule A are transferred to the Northern District of Ohio and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (rf, ) [Transferred from paed on 12/31/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT CLERK OF COURT SHALL PLACE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IN SUSPENSE PENDING A DECISION FROM THE PANEL. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 8/27/19. 8/28/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) [Transferred from paed on 12/31/2019.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court with Memorandum of Law filed by MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (REEFER, JASON) [Transferred from paed on 12/31/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by ACTAVIS PHARMA, with Defenses, Jury Demand, Certificate of Service. (HENRY, TERRY) Modified on 8/28/2019 (md). [Transferred from paed on 12/31/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by MYLAN LABORATORIES INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN TECHNOLOGIES, INC., Affirmative Defenses, Jury Demand, Certificate of Service.(REEFER, JASON) Modified on 8/23/2019 (md). [Transferred from paed on 12/31/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC., ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..(TOLIN, ADAM) [Transferred from paed on 12/31/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC., ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Affirmative Defenses, Jury Demand, Certificate of Service.(TOLIN, ADAM) Modified on 8/20/2019 (md). [Transferred from paed on 12/31/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by PEGGY MOSS.MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL) [Transferred from paed on 12/31/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD for ACTAVIS PHARMA. by ACTAVIS PHARMA.(rf, ) [Transferred from paed on 12/31/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER AND DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, JURY TRIAL DEMAND, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ACTAVIS PHARMA.(rf, ) [Transferred from paed on 12/31/2019.]
August 8, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (sg, ) [Transferred from paed on 12/31/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, case number 190800512. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 201874) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, EXHIBITS. (Attachments: #1 EXHIBIT A, #2 EXHIBIT B, #3 EXHIBIT C, #4 CIVIL COVER SHEET, #5 DESIGNATION FORM, #6 TRACK FORM)(sg, ) [Transferred from paed on 12/31/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moss v. Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo International plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Jason M. Reefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Jason M. Reefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Adam S. Tolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEGAN PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma
Represented By: Terry Matthew Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Adam S. Tolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN LABORATORIES INC.
Represented By: Jason M. Reefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEGGY MOSS
Represented By: Michael M. Weinkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?