Blevins v. May
Petitioner: Jean Blevins
Respondent: Warden Harold May
Case Number: 1:2020cv00023
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Referring Judge: James R Knepp
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Writ (2254) #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) filed by Harold May. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record (Exhibits 1-37 Bookmarked), #2 Volume(s) Transcript of Jury Trial- Vol. I, #3 Volume(s) Transcript of Jury Trial- Vol. II, #4 Volume(s) Transcript of Jury Trial- Vol. III, #5 Volume(s) Transcript of Jury Trial- Vol. IV, #6 Volume(s) Transcript of Jury Trial- Vol. V, #7 Volume(s) Transcript of Jury Trial & Sentencing- Vol. VI)(Rosenberg, Hilda)
February 24, 2020 Copy of Notice of Electronic Filing (Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer) mailed to Jean Blevins, #701-053, P.O. Box 8107, Mansfield, OH 44901 on 2/24/2020. (S,JM)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Respondent's #6 Motion for Extension of Time until 3/25/2020 to Answer. Respondent's answer now due 3/25/2020. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp II on 2/24/2020. (S,JM)
February 21, 2020 Filing 6 Motion for extension of time until March 25, 2020 to answer Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Respondent Harold May. (Rosenberg, Hilda)
February 3, 2020 LAST NOTICE: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. In order to complete our final transition to NextGen, CM/ECF will be offline starting at 12:00 noon on Friday, February 7, 2020, through 11:59 p.m. Sunday, February 9, 2020. Pursuant to General Order 2020-02, we have established an email box, nextgenfilings@ohnd.uscourts.gov, for submitting documents to be filed during this period.Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. Step one was to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your OHND e-filing account in the NextGen CM/ECF system on or after February 10, 2020. # Linking Instructions. You will be unable to e-file until the accounts are linked. If you have any additional questions, please call the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI)
January 30, 2020 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet, Supplement to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) filed by Harold May. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(R,Ke)
January 28, 2020 Filing 4 Attorney Appearance by Hilda Rosenberg filed by on behalf of Harold May. (Rosenberg, Hilda)
January 10, 2020 Copy of #3 mailed to Jean Blevins, #701-053, P.O. Box 8107, Mansfield, OH 44901, and Warden Harold May, 1001 Olivesburg Road, Mansfield, OH 44905 (including #1 ), with email copies to Ohio Attorney General's Office on 1/10/2020. (S,JM)
January 10, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Respondent shall file an answer to the petition within forty-five (45) days from the date of this Order. The answer shall comply with Rule 5 of the Rules Governing 2254 Cases, and shall address all legal issues raised in the petition. Petitioner shall have thirty (30) days from the filing of Respondent's answer to respond by filing a reply. Respondent is granted leave of fifteen (15) days from the filing of Petitioner's reply to respond thereto by filing a sur-reply. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp II on 1/10/2020. (S,JM)
January 10, 2020 IMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI)
January 8, 2020 Copy of Automatic Reference of Administrative Action mailed to Jean Blevins #701-053 at P.O. Box 8107 Mansfield, OH 44901 on 1/8/2020 and Harold May, Warden, 1001 Olivesburg Road, Mansfield, OH 44905 on 1/8/2020. (L,Ja)
January 8, 2020 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 1/8/2020. (L,Ja)
January 7, 2020 Remark by Clerk: This case was assigned and processed without the filing of a Civil Cover Sheet, which is required by Local Rule 3.13(a)., Copy of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254), #2 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order and a blank civil cover sheet mailed to Jean Blevins at P.O. Box 8107 Mansfield, OH 44901 on 1/7/20. Related document(s) #1 , #2 . (Y,A)
January 7, 2020 Filing 2 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (Y,A)
January 7, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (Y,A)
January 7, 2020 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case, (Y,A)
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 Petition under 28 USC 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a person in state custody. Filing fee paid. $5. Receipt # 14660120210. Filed by Jean Blevins. (Y,A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blevins v. May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Harold May
Represented By: Hilda Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jean Blevins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?