Andrews v. City of Mentor, Ohio
Plaintiff: Trustee Charles M Andrews and Charles M Andrews
Defendant: City of Mentor, Ohio
Case Number: 1:2020cv00058
Filed: January 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2020 Filing 6 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Charles M Andrews. (Fisher, Kenneth)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 4/8/2020 at 01:30 PM at Chambers 16A. IMPORTANT: The parties are advised to carefully read this Order and to familiarize themselves with the deadlines imposed as not all deadlines are contained in the text of this docket entry. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 2/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting)(L,Ja)
February 10, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Package Issued by Courtroom Deputy. (L,Ja)
February 10, 2020 Filing 3 Attorney Appearance by Steven D. Strang and Joseph Szeman filed by on behalf of City of Mentor, Ohio. (Strang, Steven) Modified text on 2/12/2020 (S,SR).
January 10, 2020 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon City of Mentor, Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A)
January 10, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (Y,A)
January 10, 2020 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case, (Y,A)
January 10, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment, Compensatory Damages, Punitive Damages and Attorney Fees and Costs against City of Mentor, Ohio against Charles M Andrews. Filing fee paid $400, receipt number 0647-9718288. Filed by Charles M Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Mentor Cod. Ord. Chapter 1155, #4 Exhibit Mentor Cod. Ord. Chapter 1158, #5 Exhibit Mentor Cod. Ord. Section 1117.02, #6 Exhibit Mentor Ord. No. 11-O-24, #7 Exhibit Mentor 2011 Comprehensive Plan, #8 Exhibit Lake Cty. GIS Map, #9 Exhibit Lake Cty. GIS Surrounding Use Map, #10 Exhibit The Woodlands of Mentor Development Plat, #11 Exhibit Echo Hill Manor Subdivision Conceptual Plat (RVG District), #12 Exhibit Mentor Planning & Development Dept. Staff Report, #13 Exhibit Echo Hill Manor Subdivision Concept Plan (R-4 District)) (Fisher, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrews v. City of Mentor, Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustee Charles M Andrews
Represented By: Kenneth J. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles M Andrews
Represented By: Kenneth J. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Mentor, Ohio
Represented By: Steven D. Strang
Represented By: Joseph P. Szeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?