United States of America v. $19,725.00 U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $19,725.00 U.S. Currency
Interested Party: William Ruiz
Case Number: 1:2020cv00151
Filed: January 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER of Forfeiture. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 3/23/2020. (L,Ja)
March 11, 2020 Filing 5 Motion for forfeiture of property Re: $19,725.00 in U.S. Currency filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Forfeiture)(DeBaggis, Henry)
March 10, 2020 Filing 4 Warrant of Arrest in Rem Returned Executed. Served on $19,725.00 U.S. Currency on 1/22/2020, filed on behalf of United States of America (L,MI)
February 3, 2020 Filing 3 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon William Ruiz on 1/27/2020, filed on behalf of United States of America Related document(s) #1 . (L,MI)
January 22, 2020 Service by Clerk. Notice and Complaint addressed to William Ruiz placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70151660000011648318. (B,R)
January 22, 2020 Filing 2 Warrant of Arrest in Rem for $19,725.00 issued on 1/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Process Receipt and Return) (B,R)
January 22, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (B,R)
January 22, 2020 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case, (B,R)
January 22, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint in Forfeiture against $19,725.00 U.S. Currency Seized on October 24, 2017, by Homeland Security Investigations. Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Praecipe, #3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem, #4 CBP Process and Return TD90, #5 Notice to Potential Claimant) (DeBaggis, Henry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $19,725.00 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $19,725.00 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: William Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Henry F. DeBaggis, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?