Johnson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Lauri A. Johnson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv00156
Filed: January 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: George J Limbert
Referring Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Filing 9 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by personal service executed upon the U.S. Attorney on 2/4/2020; by FedEx upon Commissioner of Social Security on 2/6/2020 and upon U.S. Attorney General on 2/6/2020 filed on behalf of Lauri A. Johnson. Related document(s) #8 . (O,K)
January 29, 2020 Filing 8 Original Summonses, Complaints, and Magistrate Consent Forms issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (S,AA)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order: Defendant is to file a certified copy of the transcript of the administrative proceedings and answer within 60 days from the date of service of the complaint; within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and answer, plaintiff must file a brief; within 30 days of the filing of plaintiff's brief, defendant may file a brief in support of the Commissioner's decision; if plaintiff chooses to respond to defendant's brief, plaintiff shall file a reply brief within 14 days from the filing of defendant's brief; further, plaintiff's counsel shall immediately fax or email the U.S. Attorney's Office, Northern District of Ohio, the case name, case number, and plaintiff's social security number, and shall file a certificate, confirming that such notice has been sent. Signed by Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert on 1/29/2020. (S,AA)
January 28, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (S,AA)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order: granting plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #2 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert on 1/28/2020.(S,AA)
January 23, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate Confirming Notification of Case Information filed by Lauri A. Johnson. (Meadows, Mary)
January 23, 2020 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 1/23/2020. (L,MI)
January 23, 2020 Filing 3 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (L,MI)
January 23, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (L,MI)
January 23, 2020 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (L,MI)
January 23, 2020 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Lauri A. Johnson. Related document(s) #1 . (Meadows, Mary)
January 23, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint Appeal of Social Security Denial against Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Lauri A. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 USM-285, #6 USM-285, #7 USM-285) (Meadows, Mary).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauri A. Johnson
Represented By: Mary T. Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Lisa Johnson
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?