Westfield Insurance Company v. Pivec Mechanical, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Westfield Insurance Company
Defendant: Pivec Mechanical, LLC, Delmarva Surety Associates, Inc., Todd Pivec and RSC Insurance Brokerage, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00234
Filed: February 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James S Gwin
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 4/7/2020 granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Nicholas S. Salter for Westfield Insurance Company. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #12 ). (S,KM)
April 6, 2020 Filing 12 Motion for attorney Nicholas S. Salter to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-9903245, filed by Plaintiff Westfield Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Haggerty, John)
April 6, 2020 Filing 11 Motion for extension of time until 4/20/2020 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant RSC Insurance Brokerage, Inc.. Related document(s) #8 ,. (Hohenberger, Leah)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 4/6/2020 granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. RSC Insurance Brokerage, Inc. answer due 4/20/2020.(S,KM)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 4/3/2020 granting defendant's #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Pivec Mechanical, LLC answer due 4/20/2020.(S,KM)
April 2, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 04/20/2020 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Pivec Mechanical, LLC. (Silverman, Brent)
April 2, 2020 Filing 9 Attorney Appearance by Brent S. Silverman and Phillip A. Ciano filed by on behalf of Pivec Mechanical, LLC. (Silverman, Brent)
April 2, 2020 Filing 8 Motion for extension of time until 4/20/2020 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Delmarva Surety Associates, Inc. (Hohenberger, Leah)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 4/2/2020 granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Delmarva Surety Associates, Inc. answer due 4/20/2020.(S,KM)
February 18, 2020 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Westfield Insurance Company. Delmarva Surety Associates, Inc. waiver sent on 2/4/2020, answer due 4/6/2020 filed on behalf of Westfield Insurance Company (Haggerty, John)
February 18, 2020 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Westfield Insurance Company. RSC Insurance Brokerage, Inc. waiver sent on 2/4/2020, answer due 4/6/2020 filed on behalf of Westfield Insurance Company (Haggerty, John)
February 18, 2020 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Westfield Insurance Company. Todd Pivec waiver sent on 2/4/2020, answer due 4/6/2020 filed on behalf of Westfield Insurance Company (Haggerty, John)
February 18, 2020 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Westfield Insurance Company. Pivec Mechanical, LLC waiver sent on 2/4/2020, answer due 4/6/2020 filed on behalf of Westfield Insurance Company (Haggerty, John)
February 4, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Ohio Farmers Insurance Company for Westfield Insurance Company filed by Westfield Insurance Company. (Haggerty, John)
February 4, 2020 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Delmarva Surety Associates, Inc., Todd Pivec, Pivec Mechanical, LLC, RSC Insurance Brokerage, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A)
February 4, 2020 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case, (Y,A)
February 4, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (Y,A)
February 3, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Delmarva Surety Associates, Inc., Todd Pivec, Pivec Mechanical, LLC, RSC Insurance Brokerage, Inc. Filing fee paid $400, receipt number 0647-9762110. Filed by Westfield Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons) (Haggerty, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westfield Insurance Company v. Pivec Mechanical, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pivec Mechanical, LLC
Represented By: Phillip A. Ciano
Represented By: Brent S. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delmarva Surety Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Leah M. Hohenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Pivec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSC Insurance Brokerage, Inc.
Represented By: Leah M. Hohenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westfield Insurance Company
Represented By: John J. Haggerty
Represented By: Nicholas S. Salter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?