Travelers Property Casualty Company of America et al v. NRP Contractors LLC et al
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America and Commerce Park Place Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe, M G Fire Design, Inc., SA Insulation LLC, R. M. Riggle Enterprises, Inc., WDG Architecture PLLC, NRP Contractors LLC, R.M. Riggle Enterprisesinc. and Preferred Insulation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00251
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Filing 37 Answer to Cross-Claim filed by NRP Contractors LLC. Related document(s) #34 . (Pelini, Craig)
March 30, 2020 Filing 36 Answer of WDG Architecture to Cross-Claim of NRP Contractors LLC with Jury Demand, filed by WDG Architecture PLLC. Related document(s) #21 . (Emerson, Julian)
March 30, 2020 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by WDG Architecture PLLC. (Emerson, Julian)
March 30, 2020 Filing 34 Amended Answer to Complaint and , Crossclaim against NRP Contractors LLC., Preferred Insulation, Inc., R. M. Riggle Enterprises, Inc., SA Insulation LLC., WDG Architecture PLLC filed by M G Fire Design, Inc. (Ruscak, Joseph)
March 27, 2020 Filing 33 Answer to Crossclaim of NRP Contractors, LLC filed by M G Fire Design, Inc.. Related document(s) #21 . (Ruscak, Joseph)
March 26, 2020 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Commerce Park Place Holdings, LLC. (Evenchik, Aaron)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order In light of General Orders 2020-5 and 2020-5-1, the Court cancels all in-person and telephone Case Management and Status Conferences through May 1, 2020. In lieu of the CMCs and Status Conferences, the parties shall file enhanced Rule 26 Reports or Joint Status Reports as described herein. All existing deadlines on civil proceedings for discovery, amendments, mediations, special master duties and dispositive motions are extended sixty days. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 3/24/2020.
March 24, 2020 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Preferred Insulation, Inc.. (Masch, Clifford)
March 23, 2020 Filing 29 Answer to Crossclaim of NRP Contractors LLC filed by R. M. Riggle Enterprises, Inc.. Related document(s) #21 . (Connick, Thomas)
March 20, 2020 Filing 28 Answer to #21 NRP Contractors, LLC' Cross-Claim filed by Preferred Insulation, Inc. (Masch, Clifford)
March 20, 2020 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by NRP Contractors LLC. (Pelini, Craig)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Stipulated Motion for leave to plead (Related Doc #24 ). Defendant WDG Architecture PLLC shall move or plead on or before 4/10/2020. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 3/19/2020.(D, I)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #25 and #26 Plaintiffs' Motions for Extension of Time until 4/16/2020 to File Response to Defendant's Motion for a more definite statement. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 3/19/2020.(D, I)
March 18, 2020 Filing 26 Motion for extension of time of 30 days until 04/16/20 to file response/reply to #18 Motion for more definite statement filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Related document(s) #18 . (May, Douglas)
March 17, 2020 Filing 25 Motion for extension of time until April 16, 2020 to file response/reply to #18 Motion for more definite statement filed by Plaintiff Commerce Park Place Holdings, LLC. Related document(s) #18 . (Evenchik, Aaron)
March 13, 2020 Filing 24 Stipulated Motion for leave to Plead to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Defendant WDG Architecture PLLC. (Emerson, Julian)
March 11, 2020 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by M G Fire Design, Inc.. (Ruscak, Joseph)
March 11, 2020 Filing 22 Answer to Complaint (Related Doc #1 ) filed by M G Fire Design, Inc.. (Ruscak, Joseph)
March 9, 2020 Filing 21 Answer of Defendant NRP Contractors with, Crossclaim against M G Fire Design, Inc., Preferred Insulation, Inc., R. M. Riggle Enterprises, Inc., R.M. Riggle Enterprisesinc., SA Insulation LLC, WDG Architecture PLLC filed by NRP Contractors LLC. (Pelini, Craig)
March 9, 2020 Filing 20 Reply to #19 Motion to remand to State Court for violation of No-Local-Defendant Rule filed by R. M. Riggle Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A-Email of 2-18-20, #2 Appendix B-Declaration of Attorney Connick, #3 Appendix C-Email of 2-21-20, #4 Appendix D-Email of 2-24-20, #5 Appendix E-Email of 3-5-20) (Connick, Thomas)
March 5, 2020 Filing 19 Motion to remand to State Court for violation of No-Local-Defendant Rule, with memorandum in support filed by Plaintiff Commerce Park Place Holdings, LLC. (Evenchik, Aaron)
March 3, 2020 Filing 18 Motion for more definite statement filed by Defendant R. M. Riggle Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - AIA Document)(Connick, Thomas)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #15 Defendant R. M. Riggle Enterprises, Inc.'s Motion for extension of time until 3/09/2020 to File Response to Order to Show Cause. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 3/2/2020.(D, I)
February 28, 2020 Filing 17 Notice of Filing Affidavit of Citizenship on Behalf of Commerce Park Place Holdings LLC. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Evenchik, Aaron)
February 28, 2020 Filing 16 Attorney Appearance by Joseph M. Ruscak and Amy K. Herman filed by on behalf of M G Fire Design, Inc.. (Ruscak, Joseph)
February 28, 2020 Filing 15 Motion for extension of time until 03/09/2020 to File Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Defendant R. M. Riggle Enterprises, Inc.. Related document(s) #10 . (Connick, Thomas)
February 25, 2020 Filing 14 Summons issued to counsel for service upon M G Fire Design, Inc. (H,SP)
February 24, 2020 Filing 13 Praecipe for issuance of Alias Summons filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Complaint) (May, Douglas)
February 21, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Case Management Conference with telephonic conference to be held on 4/8/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Christopher A. Boyko. This Court requires the participation of lead counsel. Counsel for plaintiff is to set up the call by calling Chambers with all counsel on the line at 216-357-7151 or providing call-in information to all counsel and the Court. Parties shall be available by phone, if needed Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 2/21/2020. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 2/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties Planning Meeting, #2 Consent Package)(Y,A)
February 20, 2020 Filing 11 Answer to Complaint (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Preferred Insulation, Inc.. (Masch, Clifford)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order to Show Cause by 2/28/2020 why this matter should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. See Order for details. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 2/14/2020. (D, I)
February 12, 2020 Filing 9 Stipulated Motion for leave to Plead to Plaintiffs' Complaint within thirty days, on or before March 13, 2020 filed by Defendant WDG Architecture PLLC. (Emerson, Julian)
February 10, 2020 Filing 8 Certified copy of state court documents received from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas. Complete state court documents on file in the clerk's office total number of pages is 501. (J,FE)
February 10, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Company for Travelers Property Casualty Company of America filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (May, Douglas)
February 10, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Stipulation for leave to plead filed by NRP Contractors LLC. (Pelini, Craig)
February 10, 2020 Filing 5 Attorney Appearance by Craig G Pelini filed by on behalf of NRP Contractors LLC. (Pelini, Craig)
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by R. M. Riggle Enterprises, Inc.. (Connick, Thomas)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Stipulation for Leave to Plead filed by R. M. Riggle Enterprises, Inc.. (Connick, Thomas)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (Y,A)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV-20-927263 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $400, receipt number 0647-9767927. Filed by R. M. Riggle Enterprises, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Connick, Thomas)
February 5, 2020 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case, (Y,A)
February 5, 2020 Notice by Clerk that R.M. Riggle Enterprises, Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (Y,A)
February 5, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (Y,A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America et al v. NRP Contractors LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M G Fire Design, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph M. Ruscak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SA Insulation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. M. Riggle Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J. Connick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WDG Architecture PLLC
Represented By: Julian T. Emerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NRP Contractors LLC
Represented By: Craig G Pelini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.M. Riggle Enterprisesinc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preferred Insulation, Inc.
Represented By: James T. Dixon
Represented By: Clifford C. Masch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Aaron S. Evenchik
Represented By: Douglas J. May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commerce Park Place Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Aaron S. Evenchik
Represented By: Douglas J. May
Represented By: Jack P. Mills, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Brauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?