Van Leer v. University Contracting Company LLC d/b/a University Manor
Plaintiff: Amber Van Leer
Defendant: University Contracting Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00387
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Patricia A Gaughan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Filing 7 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Levine, Bradley)
February 27, 2020 Filing 6 Answer to Complaint #1 filed by University Contracting Company, LLC. (Kozimor, Michael)
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 Certified copy of state court documents received from the Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas. (J,FE)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference set on 4/29/2020 at 08:45 AM to be held telephonically by Hon. Patricia A. Gaughan. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 2/25/20. (D,Ma)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,MI)
February 20, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (L,MI)
February 20, 2020 Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case. (L,MI)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by University Contracting Company LLC. (Kozimor, Michael)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV 20 928106 Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number AOHNDC-9807305. Filed by University Contracting Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kozimor, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Leer v. University Contracting Company LLC d/b/a University Manor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University Contracting Company, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Kozimor
Represented By: James M. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Van Leer
Represented By: Stephan I. Voudris
Represented By: Bradley Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?